New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Case #: 1:21-cv-11014
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2021
Terminated:Mar 31, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jun 20, 2022 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
The Blinc Group Inc.
Plaintiff
Pure Laboratories, LLC
5909 5909 NW 18th Dr.
Gainesville, FL 32653
Represented By
Ira Stephen Sacks
Ira S Sacks
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, March 31, 2022
11 11 2 pgs misc AO 120 Form Trademark - Case Terminated - Submitted Thu 03/31 10:52 AM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 3/30/2022 in a court action filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (tp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
10 10 1 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/30 1:00 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) All Parties. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Sacks, Ira)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
9 9 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Thu 03/03 5:10 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Pure Laboratories, LLC..(Sacks, Ira)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/12 9:17 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Blinc Group Inc. waiver sent on 1/7/2022, answer due 3/8/2022. Document filed by Pure Laboratories, LLC..(Sacks, Ira)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 27, 2021
6 6 misc AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney Mon 12/27 6:36 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sacks, Ira)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 12/27 3:09 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Blinc Group Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 12/27 3:02 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ira Stephen Sacks. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit AO 120 Form/AO 121 Form Mon 12/27 3:05 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Ira Stephen Sacks to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 12/27 3:06 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 12/27 3:06 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 12/27 3:07 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/22 5:31 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE BLINC GROUP INC., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Pure Laboratories, LLC..(Sacks, Ira)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/22 5:16 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pure Laboratories, LLC..(Sacks, Ira)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 12/22 5:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sacks, Ira)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/22 5:10 PM
COMPLAINT against THE BLINC GROUP INC.,. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25505833)Document filed by Pure Laboratories, LLC..(Sacks, Ira)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A