California Northern District Court
Case #: 5:21-mj-72017
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 22, 2021 11:31 PM PST
Defendant
Tony Nguyen (1)
Represented By
Robert Michael Carlin
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Stephen James Meyer
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Feb 14 2022
ORDER REQUIRING A DEFENDANT TO APPEAR IN THE DISTRICT WHERE CHARGES ARE PENDING AND TRANSFERRING BAIL as to Tony Nguyen. Defendant committed to District of USDC, Massachusetts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/14/22. (cfe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2022)

Docket last updated: 12/22/2021 11:49 PM PST
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cfe, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Set Hearing as to Defendant Tony Nguyen : Initial Appearance set for 12/21/2021 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (cfe, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Correcting One of Three Hearings in2 as to Defendant Tony Nguyen. Status Re: Identity/Removal Hearing set for 12/22/2021 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (cfe, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 Notice of Proceedings on Out-of-District Criminal Charges Pursuant to Rules 5(c)(2) and (3) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure as to Tony Nguyen (1). (cfe, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Initial Appearance, ID of Counsel and Arraigned NOT GUILTY as to Tony Nguyen (1) held on 12/21/2021 as to Tony Nguyen. Defendant waived his personal appearance & consented to proceed by video conference. All parties appeared by Zoom video conference. DPPA advisement. Govt's Counsel will be agreeable to release Defendant on Bond with viable sureties/co-signers. The Court directs entry of the following Order : Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, the Court advised government counsel of the government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny, and that the failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Attorney Appointment, Detention and Status Re: ID Removal Hearing set for 12/22/2021 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Plaintiff's Attorney: Stephen Meyer. Defendant's Attorney: Robert Carlin (prov. apptd). Pretrial Officer: Elba Romero. Recorded in Zoom: 1:17-1:34pm (17mins). Defendant Present: Yes. Defendant in Custody: Yes. (cfe, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]