FREEMAN et al v. HERRING NETWORKS, INC. et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Beryl A Howell |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-03354 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Dec 23, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 21, 2022 4:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
RUDOLPH GIULIANI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RUBY FREEMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WANDREA MOSS
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
CHARLES HERRING
Terminated: 05/11/2022
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT HERRING
Terminated: 05/11/2022
|
|
Defendant
HERRING NETWORKS, INC.
Terminated: 05/11/2022
|
|
Defendant
CHANEL RION
Terminated: 05/11/2022
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
160 | 160
appeal
Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
Thu 04/18 11:08 AM
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 4/17/2024 MINUTE Order,159 MEMORANDUM OPINION,158 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; USCA Case Number 24-07021 (mg) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 04/17 10:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless), DIRECTING, in view of this Court's159 Memorandum Opinion and158 Order denying defendant's147 Renewed Motion for Judgment As a Matter of Law, or in the alternative, for a New Trial and/or to Alter or Amend the Final Judgment, the Clerk of the Court to close this case. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 17, 2024. (lcbah4) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
159 | 159
order
.Order
Mon 04/15 3:16 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding defendant's147 Renewed Motion for Judgment As a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 15, 2024. (lcbah4) |
|
158 | 158
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Order on Motion for Judgment NOV Order on Motion for New Trial Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
Mon 04/15 3:13 PM
ORDER DENYING defendant's147 Renewed Motion for Judgment As a Matter of Law. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 15, 2024. (lcbah4) |