California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:21-mj-04618
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2021
Terminated:Dec 23, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Dec 25, 2021 11:18 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Francisco Anaya Nagel
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jose Luis Diaz-Chavarin (1)
Terminated: 12/23/2021
Represented By
Robert Kim Schwarz
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/25/2021 11:21 PM PST
Thursday, November 25, 2021
Arrest of Jose Luis Diaz-Chavarin (no document attached) (mme)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 26, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Luis Diaz-Chavarin.(mme)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jose Luis Diaz-Chavarin: Initial Appearance set for 11/26/2021 before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (no document attached) (mme)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Initial Appearance as to Jose Luis Diaz-Chavarin held on 11/26/2021. Oral proffer re counsel accepted; Court appointed Attorney Robert Kim Schwarz (N/A) for Jose Luis Diaz-Chavarin. Preliminary Hearing set for 12/9/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Arraignment set for 12/23/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Govt oral motion for detention (RF). Detention Hearing - RF set for 11/30/2021 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Rule 5f advisement provided, order to follow.(Interpreter Edith Monroy). (CD# 11/26/2021 MDD 215-304). (Plaintiff Attorney Badih Mouannes, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Sara Peloquin, FD). (dls)
Related: [-]
4 4 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Jose Luis Diaz-Chavarin (no document attached) (dls)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORAL MOTION to Detain by USA as to Jose Luis Diaz-Chavarin. (no document attached) (dls)
Related: [-]