Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-00141

Washington Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Whitman L Holt
Case #: 2:21-ap-80057
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2021
Terminated:Oct 04, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
3E Properties
Represented By
3E Properties
contact info
Defendant
Jody Easterday
Represented By
Jody Easterday
contact info
Defendant
Estate of Gale A. Easterday (Deceased)
Represented By
Estate of Gale A. Easterday (Deceased)
contact info
Defendant
KAREN L EASTERDAY
631 BELL FLOWER
MESA, WA 99343
Represented By
KAREN L EASTERDAY
contact info
Defendant
Cody A. Easterday
Represented By
Cody A. Easterday
contact info
Defendant
Debby Easterday
Represented By
Debby Easterday
contact info
Plaintiff
Easterday Farms
5235 N Industrial Way
Pasco, WA 99301
Represented By
Thomas A Buford
Bush Kornfeld LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
court Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 10/04 2:30 PM
ADVERSARY Proceeding 2:21-ap-80057 Closed. (JRG)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
31 31 misc Stipulation - ONLY use if no Order is needed Fri 09/30 2:25 PM
STIPULATION. Signed by Michelle Green on behalf of 3E Properties, Russell D. Garrett on behalf of Jody Easterday, Timothy J. Conway on behalf of the Estate of Gale A. Easterday and Karen L. Easterday, and Jeffrey C. Misley on behalf of Cody A. Easterday and Debby Easterday and the filer.. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Plan Administrator (Durbin, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2022
30 30 order Stipulated Order Fri 04/22 4:28 PM
STIPULATED Standstill Order Related [+]. (TLJ)
Related: [-] Order28
29 29 misc Received Unsigned Order Fri 04/22 9:00 AM
ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Conway, Timothy. Related [+]
Related: [-] 28
Friday, March 25, 2022
28 28 6 pgs order Order - Generic (sua sponte) Fri 03/25 3:49 PM
SCHEDULING and Abatement Order. The Hearing date for the Preliminary Injunction and Discovery is set for 4/18/2022 at 11:00 AM at Tower Bldg, 2nd Floor Courtroom, 402 East Yakima Avenue, Yakima, WA (with a telephonic option). (TLJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
27 27 court Minute Entry Fri 03/18 12:09 PM
MINUTE Entry Re: Various motions including those under main case 21-00141 and adversary proceeding 22-80008 21-80050 HELD. This scheduling conference is being held in abeyance. See minute entry in main case 21-00141 1499 for more information. Appearances: Richard M. Pachulski, Thomas A. Buford, Jeffrey Dulberg, Jeffrey Dulberg, Paul Labov and Jason Rosell, attorneys for the debtor; Jim Perkins, attorney for the US Trustee; Christopher Durbin, Weiru Fang and Michael Klein, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Alan Smith, attorney for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Michelle Green, attorney for 3E Properties; Jeffrey D. Cawdrey, attorney for Canyon Farm II, LLC; William Brunnquell, attorney for CHS, Inc.; Michael Stewart, attorney for CHS Capital, LLC; Shawn Rediger, attorney for AgDirect and Farm Credit Services of America PCA; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Daniel Steinberg and Russell Garrett, attorneys for Debby Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Oren Haker, attorney for Farmland Reserve, Inc.; Paul Larson, attorney for PHI Financial Services, Inc.; Michael Johnson and Bruce Medeiros, attorneys for Rabo AgriFinance, LLC; Jennifer K. Faubion and John Rizzardi, attorneys for Segale Properties LLC; Burke Jackowich, attorney for Washington Trust Bank; Clyde Allen Hamstreet, CEO of Easterday Farms Related [+]. (NNU) Modified on 3/18/2022 (NNU)
Related: [-] Notice of Scheduling Conference2 , Minutes of Proceedings 21
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
26 26 97 pgs answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Tue 03/15 4:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM. Filed by Jeffrey C Misley on behalf of Cody A. Easterday, Debby Easterday against EASTERDAY FARMS.. Filed by Jeffrey C Misley on behalf of Cody A. Easterday, Debby Easterday. (Misley, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
25 25 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Tue 03/15 3:55 PM
ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM. Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY against Plaintiff Easterday Farms Related [+].. Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY. (Conway, Timothy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint1 Complaint
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/15 1:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint. Filed by Michelle Green on behalf of 3E Properties. (Green, Michelle)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Tue 03/15 12:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM. Filed by Daniel L Steinberg on behalf of Jody Easterday against Plaintiff.. Filed by Daniel L Steinberg on behalf of Jody Easterday. (Steinberg, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Lis Pendens
Friday, March 04, 2022
22 22 misc Notification of [insert text for document title] Fri 03/04 8:54 AM
NOTIFICATION of Extension of Stipulated Standstill Order to March 10, 2022 Related [+]. Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of 3E Properties, KAREN L EASTERDAY, Cody A. Easterday, Debby Easterday, Jody Easterday, Easterday Farms, Estate of Gale A. Easterday (Deceased) (Conway, Timothy)
Related: [-] Order on Stipulated Motion19
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
21 21 court Minute Entry - Hearing Continued Wed 03/02 10:01 AM
MINUTE Entry Re: Scheduling Conference. NOT HELD. Per parties' request, hearing continued to 03/16/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. Related [+]. (NNU)
Related: [-] Notice of Scheduling Conference2 , Minutes of Proceedings 18 , Notification of20
Friday, February 25, 2022
20 20 misc Notification of [insert text for document title] Fri 02/25 11:22 AM
NOTIFICATION of Extension of Stipulated Standstill Order Related [+]. Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of 3E Properties, KAREN L EASTERDAY, Cody A. Easterday, Debby Easterday, Jody Easterday, Easterday Farms, Estate of Gale A. Easterday (Deceased) (Conway, Timothy)
Related: [-] Order on Stipulated Motion19
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
19 19 order Stipulated Motion Wed 02/16 7:35 AM
STIPULATED Standstill Order Related [+]. (TLJ)
Related: [-] 15
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
18 18 court Minute Entry - Hearing Continued Tue 02/15 5:00 PM
MINUTE Entry Re Scheduling Conference. NOT HELD. Per joint motion for entry of a stipulated standstill order (order to follow), this matter is being continued to 03/03/2022 at 01:30 PM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. Related [+]. (NNU)
Related: [-] Notice of Scheduling Conference2 , STIPULATED Motion15
17 17 misc Received Unsigned Order Tue 02/15 12:00 PM
ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Conway, Timothy. Related [+]
Related: [-] 15
Friday, February 11, 2022
16 16 misc Received Unsigned Order Fri 02/11 2:00 PM
ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Conway, Timothy. Related [+]
Related: [-] 15
15 15 motion Stipulated Motion - ONLY use if Order to be Submitted Fri 02/11 12:38 PM
STIPULATED Motion for Entry of a Stipulated Standstill Order. Signed by Thomas A. Buford for Easterday Farms, Jeffrey C. Misley for Cody and Debby Easterday; Michelle A. Green for 3E Properties and the filer... Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of 3E Properties, KAREN L EASTERDAY, Cody A. Easterday, Debby Easterday, Jody Easterday, Easterday Farms, Estate of Gale A. Easterday (Deceased) (Conway, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
14 14 court Minute Entry Wed 02/09 4:49 PM
MINUTE Entry Re Scheduling Conference. This matter is rescheduled to 2/16/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 (changed from 1:30PM to be heard with the underlying case Easterday Ranches Inc 21-00141 . Related [+]. (NNU)
Related: [-] Notice of Scheduling Conference2
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance Wed 02/02 9:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance. Filed by Ava L. Schoen on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY, Estate of Gale A. Easterday (Deceased). (Schoen, Ava)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Notice of Appearance Wed 02/02 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance. Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY, Estate of Gale A. Easterday (Deceased). (Conway, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
11 11 order Enlarge Time to File Reaffirmation Agreement Thu 01/27 2:22 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Enlarge Time to File Responsive Pleading Related [+]. Time Enlarged to 2/15/2022. (TLJ)
Related: [-] 1 ,9
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
10 10 misc Received Unsigned Order Tue 01/25 3:15 PM
ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Garrett, Russell. Related [+]
Related: [-] 9
9 9 motion Enlarge Time Tue 01/25 2:58 PM
MOTION to Enlarge Time to File Responsive Pleading to 2 15-2022 Filed by Russell D Garrett on behalf of Jody Easterday. (Garrett, Russell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Thursday, January 13, 2022
8 8 misc Acceptance of Service Thu 01/13 3:47 PM
ACCEPTANCE of Service . Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Farms Related [+]. (Buford, Thomas)
Related: [-] Complaint1 , Summons Issued3
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance Thu 01/13 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance. Filed by Michelle Green on behalf of 3E Properties (Green, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
6 6 misc Mediation - Certificate of Compliance with LBR 9019-2 Wed 12/29 3:39 PM
CERTIFICATE of Compliance with LBR 9019-2 (Mediation). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Farms. (Buford, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
5 5 misc Request to Add Additional Email Address to Existing Party (text entry) Tue 12/28 3:50 PM
REQUEST to Add Additional Email Address to Existing Party, rkeeton@bskd.com.. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Farms (Keeton, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Certificate of Service Tue 12/28 1:37 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Farms Related [+]. (Buford, Thomas)
Related: [-] Complaint1 , Summons Issued3
Monday, December 27, 2021
3 3 1 pgs misc Summons Issued Mon 12/27 3:28 PM
SUMMONS Issued. (TLJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Mon 12/27 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Written Report due: 2/11/2022. Scheduling Conference scheduled 2/16/2022 at 01:30 PM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. (TLJ)
Related: [-]
1 1 83 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/27 12:45 PM
Adversary case 21-80057 COMPLAINT. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (91 (Declaratory judgment)) (Buford, Thomas)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 12/27 4:35 PM
RECEIPT of Complaint([LINK 21-80057 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A7908276. Fee amount 350.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Complaint1
court Add Judge Mon 12/27 3:24 PM
Judge Whitman L Holt added to case. (TLJ)
Related: [-]