LaShanae Littles v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Kenly Kiya Kato |
Case #: | 5:21-cv-02146 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 27, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 02, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 25, 2022 1:46 AM PDT |
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mead Johnson and Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LaShanae Littles
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 25, 2022 | ||
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Thu 04/28 12:34 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Northern District of Illinois, 1:22-cv-01994 filed 4/25/2022. (iv) |
||
Friday, April 22, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc. identifying Abbott Laboratories as Corporate Parent. (Brecht, Celeste) |
|
25 | 25
![]() CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc., (Brecht, Celeste) |
|
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses to the Complaint filed by Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc..(Brecht, Celeste) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3026, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Illinois and assigned to Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Case transferred electronically. (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, February 02, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to Stay Proceedings20 , (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, January 26, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
![]() STIPULATION to Stay Case pending motion to transfer related cases for consolidated proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407 filed by Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc..(Brecht, Celeste) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, January 21, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
![]() STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) |
|
18 | 18
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff LaShanae Littles. upon Mead Johnson Nutrition Company waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Melanie A. Ayerh. (Dixon, Deborah) |
|
17 | 17
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff LaShanae Littles. upon Mead Johnson and Company LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Melanie A. Ayerh. (Dixon, Deborah) |
|
Thursday, January 20, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony J Anscombe counsel for Defendants Mead Johnson Nutrition Company, Mead Johnson and Company LLC. Adding Anthony J. Anscombe as counsel of record for Mead Johnson & Company, LLC and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Mead Johnson & Company, LLC and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Attorney Anthony J Anscombe added to party Mead Johnson Nutrition Company(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony J Anscombe added to party Mead Johnson and Company LLC(pty:dft))(Anscombe, Anthony) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Melanie Atswei Ayerh counsel for Defendants Mead Johnson Nutrition Company, Mead Johnson and Company LLC. Adding Melanie A. Ayerh as counsel of record for Mead Johnson & Company, LLC and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Mead Johnson & Company, LLC and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Attorney Melanie Atswei Ayerh added to party Mead Johnson Nutrition Company(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie Atswei Ayerh added to party Mead Johnson and Company LLC(pty:dft))(Ayerh, Melanie) |
|
Wednesday, January 19, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other)13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, January 18, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE OF MOTION TO TRANSFER RELATED CASES FOR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1407 filed by Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc..(Brecht, Celeste) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, January 13, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:21-cv-00481 JGB(KKx). Case transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:21-cv-02146 JGB(KKx). Signed by Judge Jesus G. Bernal (rn) |
|
Thursday, December 30, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) |
|
Wednesday, December 29, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (car) |
|
9 | 9
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Mead Johnson and Company LLC. (car) |
|
8 | 8
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (car) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (car) |
|
Monday, December 27, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff LaShanae Littles, identifying Abbott Laboratories, Inc.; Mead Johnson & Company, LLC and/or Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Dixon, Deborah) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff LaShanae Littles. (Dixon, Deborah) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LaShanae Littles. (Dixon, Deborah) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32533439 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff LaShanae Littles. (Attorney Deborah S Dixon added to party LaShanae Littles(pty:pla))(Dixon, Deborah) |