Arizona District Court
Judge:Diane J Humetewa
Case #: 3:21-cv-08277
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause26:7426 IRS: Wrongful Levy for Taxes
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2021
Terminated:Jun 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 25, 2022 1:53 AM MST
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Amy Talburt Matchison
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Gardner
Bishop, corporation sole and her successors P.O. Box 2038
Dewey, AZ 86327
Represented By
Gregory A Robinson
Farley Robinson & Larsen
contact info
Plaintiff
Society of Apostolic Church Ministries
P.O. Box 2038
Dewey, AZ 86327
Represented By
Gregory A Robinson
Farley Robinson & Larsen
contact info

GPO Jan 05 2022
ORDER denying the 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ORDERED that within 21 days of this Order, Plaintiffs must pay the required filing fee and a licensed attorney shall appear on behalf of the Society of Apostolic Church Ministries and Bishop Elizabeth Gardner, Corporation Sole. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiffs fail to comply, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action, without prejudice, without further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/4/2022. (LFIG)
GPO Feb 22 2024
ORDER that the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment 37 is GRANTED. There being no just reason for delay, the Clerk of Court is kindly directed to enter judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b) in the Government's favor on Plaintiff's wrongful levy claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in light of Plaintiffs' remaining claim for quiet title, the parties are directed to comply with Paragraph 9 of the Rule 16 Scheduling Order (Doc. 29 at 5) regarding notice of readiness for pretrial conference. Upon a joint request, the parties may also seek a referral from the Court for a settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/22/2024. (KLG)
GPO Jun 11 2024
J Humetewa on 6/11/2024. re: 24-1765 as to 54 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (KLG)ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration 52 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Government's Motion for Reconsideration 49 is GRANTED. Summary judgment should have been granted in favor of the Government on Plaintiffs' quiet title claim. The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to enter judgment in the Government's favor on Plaintiffs' last remaining claim to quiet title and terminate this action. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane

Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
62 62 appeal Notice of Appeal - Amended Wed 06/26 11:37 AM
AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re:59 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,60 Clerks Judgment by Society of Apostolic Church Ministries. **Redocketed by Clerk using correct event for case management purposes re: 24-1765 as to54 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (KLG)
Related: [-]
61 61 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/25 12:13 PM
NOTICE re: Amended Notice of Appeal by Society of Apostolic Church Ministries . (Robinson, Gregory)
Related: [-]