Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Cathy Bissoon
Case #: 2:21-cv-01883
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:623 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Dec 28, 2021
Terminated:Sep 11, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jun 26, 2022 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
GENERAL CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By
Trisha A. Gill
Litchfield Cavo LLP
contact info
Kyle Alan Peterson
Litchfield Cavo LLP
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL WAMPLER
Plaintiff
DONALD KAVERTA
Represented By
David A. Colecchia
Law Care
contact info
Plaintiff
CAMMY KEENER
Represented By
David A. Colecchia
Law Care
contact info
Plaintiff
JAISON ZELLO
Represented By
David A. Colecchia
Law Care
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, February 29, 2024
50 50 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Thu 02/29 12:27 PM
Errata re 48 Order for Administrative Case Closing1 Complaint,49 Motion to Dismiss by CAMMY KEENER, DONALD KVARTA, JAISON ZELLO. Reason for Correction: File the settlement as a Motion and not a Notice. (Colecchia, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
49 49 motion Dismiss Wed 02/28 1:25 PM
MOTION to Dismiss re 48 Order for Administrative Case Closing1 Complaint, by CAMMY KEENER, DONALD KVARTA, JAISON ZELLO. (Colecchia, David)
Related: [-]