Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-04887
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2021
Last checked: Monday Jun 27, 2022 5:30 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
FRANK MONTES SR
Represented By
YVONNE FLAHERTY
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
3 3 16 pgs order Order Fri 01/20 10:37 AM
ORDER. For any plaintiff failing to submit a census form by February 8, 2023, his/her case will be dismissed with prejudice, in light of repeated failures to comply. (Pretrial Order No. 18 / Pretrial Order No. 81 and this Order). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/18/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 12/29 8:56 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (FLAHERTY, YVONNE)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/29 8:55 AM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6602919.), filed by FRANK MONTES SR. (FLAHERTY, YVONNE)
Related: [-]