California Northern District Court
Judge:Alex G Tse
Case #: 3:21-cv-10040
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2021
Last checked: Monday Jun 27, 2022 2:39 AM PDT
Defendant
Gretchen Rivera
Represented By
Lubna Khan Jahangiri
Jahangiri Law Group, Apc
contact info
Mediator
Patricia Prince
Prince Law & Mediation 775 E. Blithdale Ave., #130
Mill Valley, CA 94941
Plaintiff
Unified Accounting & Tax, LLP
Represented By
Seth Wesley Wiener
Law Offices Of Seth W. Wiener
contact info

GPO Sep 16 2022
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse re 34 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2022)

Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
39 39 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Wed 12/21 10:35 AM
STIPULATION for Dismissal of Action filed by Unified Accounting & Tax, LLP. (Wiener, Seth)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 11/18 5:13 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting 37 stipulation to extend fact discovery cutoff. (agtlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
37 37 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 11/11 4:15 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY filed by Gretchen Rivera. (Jahangiri, Lubna)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
36 36 2 pgs order Order on Discovery Letter Brief Fri 09/16 5:59 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse re 34 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
35 35 oth_sup Declaration in Support Tue 08/09 11:22 AM
Declaration of LUBNA JAHANGIRI in Support of34 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Defendant's Position filed byGretchen Rivera. Related [+] (Jahangiri, Lubna)
Related: [-] 34
Monday, August 08, 2022
34 34 motion Discovery Letter Brief Mon 08/08 6:30 PM
Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Unified Accounting & Tax, LLP. (Wiener, Seth)
Related: [-]
33 33 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 08/08 4:24 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. The Court sets the following schedule: Initial Disclosures: March 25, 2022 Deadline to Amend the Pleadings: August 29, 2022 Close of Fact Discove1y: December 31, 2022 Initial Expe1i Disclosures: January 16, 2023 Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: February 6, 2023 Close of Expe1i Discove1y: February 20, 2023 Deadline for Filing Dispositive Motions: March 1, 2023 Final Pretrial Conference: June 2, 2023 at 10:00 AM Trial Date: June 20, 2023 (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
32 32 misc Proposed Order Fri 08/05 5:36 AM
[Proposed] Case Management Order by Unified Accounting & Tax, LLP. (Wiener, Seth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
adr Certification of ADR Session Wed 08/03 7:41 AM
Certification of ADR Session by Mediator Patricia Prince: I hereby certify that the parties in this matter held a Mediation session on June 23, 2022. The case did not settle. Further facilitated discussions are not expected. Mediation is complete. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (af, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
minutes Case Management Conference - Further Tue 07/26 6:35 PM
Minute Entry for further case management conference held on 7/22/2022 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. The parties shall meet and confer, then submit a revised case schedule proposal on or before 8/5/2022. Digital Recording Time: 2:04 - 2:17. Plaintiff Attorney: Seth Wesley Wiener. Defendant Attorney: Lubna Khan Jahangiri. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/22/2022)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Thu 07/21 6:54 PM
CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The further case management conference, which is set for 2:00 PM on 7/22/2022 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse, will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/agt] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceed ings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (File d on 7/21/2022)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
28 28 misc Joint Case Management Statement Thu 07/14 7:13 AM
FURTHER JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Unified Accounting & Tax, LLP. (Wiener, Seth)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
27 27 20 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 06/17 10:43 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 24 Stipulation. (agtlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
26 26 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 06/03 10:02 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Redlined filed by Unified Accounting & Tax, LLP. (Wiener, Seth)
Related: [-]
order Order on Stipulation Fri 06/03 9:45 AM
The stipulated proposed protective order 24 will not be considered until the parties comply with Part VII.C of my civil standing order, which requires them to file either (i) a statement in which they confirm that the proposed protective order does not differ in any respect from the model order, or (ii) a redline comparing the proposed protective order with the model order, along with an explanation of any changes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse on 6/3/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (agtlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
24 24 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 06/02 4:09 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Unified Accounting & Tax, LLP. (Wiener, Seth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 04/25 8:49 AM
Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 6/23/2022 01:30 PM via Zoom. (af, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation selecting Mediation Fri 04/15 12:59 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting 16 stipulation selecting mediation. (agtlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2022
22 22 adr ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator Fri 04/08 10:11 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Patricia Prince as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Tue 04/05 4:54 PM
CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The parties are hereby notified that the further case management conference is rescheduled to 7/22/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. An updated joint case management conference statement must be filed by 7/15/2022. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/agt] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/05 4:50 PM
Minute Entry for initial case management conference held on 4/1/2022 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. This matter is referred to the Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution Department for mediation; and the mediation session shall occur no later than July 1, 2022. The parties shall be limited to two depositions each prior to engaging in the mediation session. A further case management conference is set for 7/24/2022 at 2:00 PM. Digital Recording Time: 1:59 - 2:07. Plaintiff Attorney: Seth Wesley Wiener. Defendant Attorney: Rachel Norby. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/1/2022)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Mediation Wed 04/06 9:12 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Thu 03/31 10:53 AM
CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The initial case management conference, which is set for 4/1/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/agt] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 13, 2022
18 18 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Sun 03/13 6:16 AM
NOTICE by Gretchen Rivera CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Jahangiri, Lubna)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 12, 2022
17 17 10 pgs misc Joint Case Management Statement Sat 03/12 4:22 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Unified Accounting & Tax, LLP. (Wiener, Seth)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs motion Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation Sat 03/12 4:20 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Unified Accounting & Tax, LLP filed by Unified Accounting & Tax, LLP. (Wiener, Seth)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Sat 03/12 4:18 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wiener, Seth)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/11 10:58 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND byGretchen Rivera. (Jahangiri, Lubna)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 02/11 10:56 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gretchen Rivera.. (Jahangiri, Lubna)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/11 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lubna Khan Jahangiri (Jahangiri, Lubna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Tue 01/25 5:01 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse denying 9 Administrative Motion Regarding Extraterritorial Service on Defendant Gretchen Rivera. The Court is unable to advance payment of, and/or accept reimbursement for, costs of service as proposed by plaintiff. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (agtlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
10 10 47 pgs misc Errata Tue 01/11 9:45 AM
PLAINTIFF UNIFIED ACCOUNTING & TAX, LLPS NOTICE OF ERRATA TO ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GRETCHEN RIVERA filed by Unified Accounting & Tax, LLP. (Wiener, Seth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
9 9 2 pgs motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Tue 01/04 8:39 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Extraterritorial Service on Defendant Gretchen Rivera filed by Unified Accounting & Tax, LLP. Responses due by 1/10/2022.(Wiener, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 58 pgs Declaration of Seth W. Wiener,
Att: 2 1 pgs Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
8 8 2 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 12/29 12:46 PM
Summons Issued as to Gretchen Rivera. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 12/29 11:01 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 12/29 9:52 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by UNIFIED ACCOUNTING & TAX, LLP.. (Wiener, Seth)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 12/29 8:35 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by UNIFIED ACCOUNTING & TAX, LLP identifying Other Affiliate Harold Kinoshita for UNIFIED ACCOUNTING & TAX, LLP. (Wiener, Seth)
Related: [-]
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/12/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 12/29 1:51 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by UNIFIED ACCOUNTING & TAX, LLP (Wiener, Seth)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Proposed Summons Wed 12/29 1:50 AM
Proposed Summons. (Wiener, Seth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/29 1:48 AM
COMPLAINT against GRETCHEN RIVERA ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16757080.). Filed by UNIFIED ACCOUNTING & TAX, LLP.(Wiener, Seth) Modified on 12/29/2021 (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 12/29 8:19 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents .Please re-file in its entirety. Re:3 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by UNIFIED ACCOUNTING & TAX, LLP (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 12/29 8:23 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/12/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]