Original Case: 6:21-cv-06660

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-03140
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2021
Terminated:May 04, 2022
Last checked: Thursday May 05, 2022 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Chrysler Capital
Defendant
Marina Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ram
Defendant - Appellee
Shawn Allgood, Head of Chrysler Captial and Auto Relationships
Represented By
Shawn Allgood
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
John Gabriele, President Marina Chrysler Jeep Dodge Mitsubishi
Represented By
John Gabriele
-
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Billie Lynn Holt
Represented By
Billie Lynn Holt
-
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2022 4:31 AM EDT
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Billie Lynn Holt, FILED. [3235440] 21-3140 [Entered: 12/29/2021 02:53 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED
2 2 4 pgs DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 12/07/2021, RECEIVED.[3235450] 21-3140 [Entered: 12/29/2021 02:57 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/08/2021, RECEIVED.[3235456] 21-3140 [Entered: 12/29/2021 02:58 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3235457] 21-3140 [Entered: 12/29/2021 02:59 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 3 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED
5 5 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3235469] 21-3140 [Entered: 12/29/2021 03:02 PM]
Related: [-]