Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-04920
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2021
Terminated:Feb 16, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 28, 2022 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER REESMAN
Represented By
YVONNE FLAHERTY
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 16, 2023
4 4 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 02/16 3:58 PM
ORDER - The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets only, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/16/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
3 3 16 pgs order Order Fri 01/20 10:41 AM
ORDER. For any plaintiff failing to submit a census form by February 8, 2023, his/her case will be dismissed with prejudice, in light of repeated failures to comply. (Pretrial Order No. 18 / Pretrial Order No. 81 and this Order). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/18/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 30, 2021
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 12/30 8:46 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (FLAHERTY, YVONNE)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/30 8:45 AM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6605057.), filed by CHRISTOPHER REESMAN. (FLAHERTY, YVONNE)
Related: [-]