New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Gary R Brown
Referred: Steven Tiscione
Case #: 2:22-cv-00001
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jan 01, 2022
Terminated:Jan 13, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Jun 30, 2022 4:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Nationwide Credit, Inc.
Plaintiff
Asher Bakhishi Nazar
Represented By
Uri Horowitz
Horowitz Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, January 13, 2022
order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/13 8:50 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: In light of the settlement in principle this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to its reinstatement should the settlement not be consummated. Barring any further requests for an extension within 90 days of this order, this dismissal shall deemed with prejudice.Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/13/2022. (McMorrow, Karen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 01/12 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Plaintiff and Defendant Nationwide Credit, Inc. by Asher Bakhishi Nazar (Horowitz, Uri)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/07 3:30 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Asher Bakhishi Nazar. Nationwide Credit, Inc. waiver sent on 1/7/2022, answer due 3/8/2022. (Horowitz, Uri)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
order Order to Show Cause Wed 01/05 1:02 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. To assist the Court in its review of standing in this action, plaintiff is directed to respond via letter filed on ECF within 7 days of the date of this order, as follows: 1. Does plaintiff claim any concrete, particularized injury in fact from the statutory violations alleged herein? If so, please set forth such injury/injuries with particularity. 2. If plaintiff is not claiming any such concrete injury, in light of the Supreme Court's decision in Transunion LLC v. Ramirez , Slip Op. No. 20-297, 2021 WL 2599472 (U.S. June 25, 2021), counsel shall provide any authority or basis for plaintiff to assert standing in this action, or indicate whether the action should be dismissed. Defendants shall file any response thereto within 5 days of the filing by plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/5/2022. c/ecf (Cowan, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 01/04 3:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Nationwide Credit, Inc.. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 01/04 3:39 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 01/04 3:35 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Tue 01/04 3:30 PM
Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint, Exhibit A, Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons), initially filed as against Plaintiff. Re-entered Document Entry No. 1 as against Defendant. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/04 3:38 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 01, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 01/02 12:11 AM
COMPLAINT against Nationwide Credit, Inc. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Asher Bakhishi Nazar. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Nationwide Credit, Inc.
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 01/04 3:29 PM
FILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number ANYEDC-15154353 (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]