Minnesota District Court
Case #: 0:22-mc-00999
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, December 30, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 12/30 12:17 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Bard D Borkon (237322) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9977657. Address to email certificate:missy.shea@bowmanandbrooke.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Borkon, Bard) Processed on 12/30/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/28 3:01 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Develyn J Mistriotti (0403684) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9973455. Address to email certificate:sklove@locklaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Mistriotti, Develyn)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/28 4:23 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Joseph G Schmitt (0231447) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9973921. Address to email certificate:kschmidt@nilanjohnson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Schmitt, Joseph)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/28 8:34 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Catrina Eom Smith (0403229) in the amount of $20, receipt number BMNDC-9974127. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Smith, Catrina)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 24, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sat 12/24 2:45 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Thomas J Nolan, Jr (0221399) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9968121. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Nolan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/22 1:17 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Paula Ann Meyer (0395595) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9966343. Address to email certificate:sue.watson@bowmanandbrooke.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Meyer, Paula) Processed on 12/22/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/21 11:59 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Brian Melendez (0223633) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9963741. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Melendez, Brian) Processed on 12/21/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 12/20 8:37 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Patrick D J Mahlberg (388028) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9962578. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Mahlberg, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/19 9:09 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Elizabeth R Odette (0340698) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9957411. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Odette, Elizabeth) Processed on 12/19/2022 (JGK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/15 10:39 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Alex Herman (0398386) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9952065. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Herman, Alex) Processed on 12/15/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/14 6:37 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Christopher J Harayda (0390333) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9951164. Address to email certificate:cj.harayda@stinson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Harayda, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 12/13 10:19 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Michele R Fisher (303069) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9946800. Address to email certificate:masong-morfaw@nka.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Fisher, Michele)Processed on 12/13/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 12/13 1:29 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Dean B Thomson (0141045) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9947734. Address to email certificate:hhawkinson@fwhtlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Thomson, Dean) Processed on 12/13/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 12/13 2:27 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Marc D Fink (0343407) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9948074. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Fink, Marc) Processed on 12/13/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/12 10:46 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jennifer J. Crancer (0396959) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9944777. Address to email certificate:tbarclay@chestnutcambronne.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Crancer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Fri 12/09 10:06 AM
Certificate of Good Standing Paid Anthony R Zeuli. Payment made in the amount of $20.00, receipt number AMNDC-9934368. Processed 12/9/22 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/07 12:41 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Sarah Vandelist (0400801) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9936668. Address to email certificate:mimi.christie@faegredrinker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Vandelist, Sarah)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/07 5:17 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Aaron P Knoll (0393066) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9937601. Address to email certificate:jkammueller@greeneespel.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Knoll, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 12/06 12:43 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kathryn Bjorklund (0400798) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9934240. Address to email certificate:jmoran@masseygail.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Bjorklund, Kathryn)Processed on 12/6/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/05 8:11 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Dion Farganis (399219) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9929819. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Farganis, Dion) Processed on 12/5/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 12/02 12:18 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jacob Robert Rusch (391892) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9927822. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Rusch, Jacob)Processed on 12/2/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 12/02 12:20 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Zackary S. Kaylor (0400854) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9927852. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kaylor, Zackary) Processed on 12/2/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 12/02 1:15 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for David A Davenport (285109) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9928251. Address to email certificate:barb@bcdavenport.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Davenport, David) Processed on 12/2/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 12/02 1:27 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Alex M. Hagstrom (0397320) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9928315. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Hagstrom, Alex) Processed on 12/2/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/01 10:04 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Michael S Poncin (0296417) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9923681. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Poncin, Michael) Processed on 12/1/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/30 1:17 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Clark T Whitmore (181699) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9921160. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Whitmore, Clark) Processed on 11/30/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/30 1:43 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Lukas Boehning (0401165) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9921316. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Boehning, Lukas) Processed on 11/30/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/30 2:49 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jason M. Reed (0395877) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9921757. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing Related [+] Processed on 11/30/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-] ed, Jason
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/30 3:41 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Nathaniel Moore (0399004) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9922123. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Moore, Nathaniel) Processed on 11/30/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/30 3:44 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Charles Gokey (0402225) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9922146. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Gokey, Charles) Processed on 11/30/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/30 3:46 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jeffrey Sullivan Gleason (0396190) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9922145. Address to email certificate:jcornelius@robinskaplan.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Gleason, Jeffrey)Processed on 11/30/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/30 3:55 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jamie R. Kurtz (0391792) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9922193. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kurtz, Jamie) Processed on 11/30/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Sun 12/04 5:32 PM
Certificate of Good Standing Paid Heidi J. Bassett. Payment made in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9922073. Processed 12/4/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/29 10:15 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jacob T Schutz (0395648) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9917588. Address to email certificate:kadams@pswlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Schutz, Jacob) Processed on 11/29/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/29 12:49 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for T Joseph Snodgrass (231071) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9918434. Address to email certificate:bfriesen@snodgrass-law.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Snodgrass, T)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/28 10:38 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Bryan L. Bleichner (0326689) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9914562. Address to email certificate:rlee@chestnutcambronne.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Bleichner, Bryan) Processed on 11/28/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/28 10:40 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Philip Joseph Krzeski (0403291) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9914573. Address to email certificate:rlee@chestnutcambronne.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Krzeski, Philip) Processed on 11/28/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/23 9:51 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Elizabeth Joan Slama Johnson (0402023) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9910810. Address to email certificate:jen.veldhuizen@faegredrinker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Slama Johnson, Elizabeth) Processed on 11/23/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/22 10:49 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Barak J Babcock (0290646) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9907752. Address to email certificate:Stefanie.chapman@fedex.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Babcock, Barak) Processed on 11/22/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/22 2:53 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Lauren Clements (0399187) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9909064. Address to email certificate:pkindt@littler.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Clements, Lauren) Processed on 11/22/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/22 3:14 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jeremy D Sosna (0290233) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9909179. Address to email certificate:pkindt@littler.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Sosna, Jeremy) Processed on 11/22/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 11/18 1:11 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Anna Rick (0401065) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9900064. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Rick, Anna) Processed on 11/18/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 11/18 4:20 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Mark J Carpenter (252189) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9900889. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Carpenter, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/16 8:52 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Daniel J Connolly (0197427) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9893361. Address to email certificate:jen.veldhuizen@faegredrinker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Connolly, Daniel) Processed on 11/16/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/16 1:30 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Michael A Bryant (218583) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9894529. Address to email certificate:tucker@minnesotapersonalinjury.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Bryant, Michael) Processed on 11/16/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/16 4:05 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Sally Mermelstein (0329411) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9895314. Address to email certificate:vflores@kantorlaw.net. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Mermelstein, Sally)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/14 10:35 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kyle Nelson (0401882) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9887185. Address to email certificate:BRyan@RobinsKaplan.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Nelson, Kyle) Processed on 11/14/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/08 10:50 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Erik Lindstedt (401848) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9878409. Address to email certificate:elindstedt@nixonpeabody.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Lindstedt, Erik) Processed on 11/8/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/08 1:47 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Nathan P Brennan (0389954) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9879172. Address to email certificate:kharrington@ashcroftlawfirm.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Brennan, Nathan) Processed on 11/8/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 11/04 10:48 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Mickey L Stevens (0398549) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9872949. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Stevens, Mickey) Processed on 11/4/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 11/03 11:12 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Brian J Linnerooth (0400162) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9870325. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Linnerooth, Brian)Processed on 11/3/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 11/03 11:48 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Benjamin C Sorenson (0391542) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9870513. Address to email certificate:ajohnson@yostbaill.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Sorenson, Benjamin) Processed on 11/3/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 11/03 3:01 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Lukas Dustin Jonathon Toft (395984) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9871367. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Toft, Lukas) Processed on 11/3/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 11/03 3:07 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Elizabeth A Patton (391431) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9871405. Address to email certificate:1. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Patton, Elizabeth) Processed on 11/3/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/02 10:26 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Amy Slusser Conners (0387375) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9867707. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Conners, Amy) Processed on 11/2/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/01 11:03 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Tammy M Reno (0327773) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9864690. Address to email certificate:cmadden@nilanjohnson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing Related [+] Processed on 11/1/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-] no, Tammy
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/01 10:44 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kelly P. Magnus (0397569) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9867114. Address to email certificate:kjuricko@nilanjohnson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Magnus, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/31 2:06 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Benjamin F Gallagher (167253) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9862462. Address to email certificate:tara@gallagherlawus.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Gallagher, Benjamin) Processed on 10/31/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/31 2:55 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Susan M Coler (0217621) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9862800. Address to email certificate:lockwood@halunenlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Coler, Susan) Processed on 10/31/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/28 10:16 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Matthew L McMullen (0393270) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9857638. Address to email certificate:mmcmullen@hmglawfirm.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(McMullen, Matthew) Processed on 10/28/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/28 10:32 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Natalie I. Uhlemann (392148) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9857727. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Uhlemann, Natalie) Processed on 10/28/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/26 11:28 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Marc D Fink (0343407) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9852140. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Fink, Marc) Processed on 10/26/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/25 2:40 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Scott M Rusert (231113) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9850120. Address to email certificate:kjuricko@nilanjohnson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Rusert, Scott) Processed on 10/25/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/25 7:37 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Daniel C Hedlund (258337) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9851220. Address to email certificate:djakubauskiene@gustafsongluek.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Hedlund, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/24 2:49 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kate Middleton (0399881) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9847844. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Middleton, Kate) Processed on 10/24/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/24 3:31 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for William Thomas Wheeler (0400805) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9848038. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Wheeler, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/19 1:21 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kacie Phillips (0399980) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9838513. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Phillips, Kacie) Processed on 10/19/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/18 10:42 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Laura N Maupin (0324942) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9832282. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Maupin, Laura) Processed on 10/18/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/18 11:33 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Robert David Hahn (0401262) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9832796. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Hahn, Robert) Processed on 10/18/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/18 11:48 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Craig S Davis (0148192) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9832911. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Davis, Craig) Processed on 10/18/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/17 4:27 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Gina K Janeiro (345337) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9830849. Address to email certificate:Jennifer.Holmes@jacksonlewis.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Janeiro, Gina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/13 10:49 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Melissa Hodge (0400800) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9821065. Address to email certificate:nbartz@fredlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Hodge, Melissa) Processed on 10/13/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/13 10:59 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for John D Sear (222252) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9821129. Address to email certificate:deborah.daninger@nelsonmullins.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Sear, John) Processed on 10/13/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/13 4:41 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Griffen Jacob Thorne (306152) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9823087. Address to email certificate:griffen@harrisbricken.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Thorne, Griffen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/12 10:25 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Matthew R. Eslick (0388494) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9817811. Address to email certificate:thorvig@parkerdk.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Eslick, Matthew) Processed on 10/12/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 10, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/10 9:03 AM
FEE FOR (2) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Dan J Gendreau (0264088) in the amount of $40, receipt number AMNDC-9812581. Address to email certificate:rwulff@donnalaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Gendreau, Dan)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/10 10:13 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Andrew Glasnovich (0398366) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9812620. Address to email certificate:jess.rehbein@stinson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Glasnovich, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/07 9:05 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Nathaniel Forbes Smith (397276) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9810081. Address to email certificate:lockwood@halunenlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Smith, Nathaniel) Processed on 10/7/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/07 11:50 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Deborah Autrey (0399996) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9810713. Address to email certificate:kjuricko@nilanjohnson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Autrey, Deborah) Processed on 10/7/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/07 2:54 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Anthony W. Finnell, Jr (0398817) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9811503. Address to email certificate:darcy.boehme@faegredrinker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Finnell, Anthony) Processed on 10/7/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/06 10:26 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Erik G Swenson (0288445) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9807645. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Swenson, Erik) Processed on 10/6/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/06 10:29 AM
FILED IN ERROR: FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Gerald Charles Pierre Robinson (0212787) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9807649. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Robinson, Gerald) Modified text on 10/6/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/06 10:34 AM
FILED IN ERROR: FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Gerald Charles Pierre Robinson (0212787) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9807692. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Robinson, Gerald) Modified text on 10/6/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/06 10:37 AM
FILED IN ERROR: FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Gerald Charles Pierre Robinson (0212787) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9807710. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Robinson, Gerald) Modified text on 10/6/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/05 7:34 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Thomas J Lyons, Jr (0249646) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9803986. Address to email certificate:andi@consumerjusticecenter.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Lyons, Thomas) Processed on 10/5/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/05 9:38 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Brent A Lorentz (386865) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9804318. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Lorentz, Brent) Processed on 10/5/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/05 3:49 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Hans W Lodge (0397012) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9806020. Address to email certificate:hlodge@bm.net. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Lodge, Hans) Processed on 10/5/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/04 10:16 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Philip Joseph Krzeski (0403291) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9801363. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Krzeski, Philip) Processed on 10/4/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/04 11:07 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Melissa S. Weiner (387900) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9801285. Address to email certificate:kadams@pswlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Weiner, Melissa) Processed on 10/4/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/04 11:59 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Pamela Abbate-Dattilo (0389889) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9801843. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Abbate-Dattilo, Pamela) Processed on 10/4/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/04 5:04 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Bryan L. Bleichner (0326689) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9803678. Address to email certificate:rlee@chestnutcambronne.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Bleichner, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/03 11:20 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Carli D Pearson (0389689) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9798620. Address to email certificate:katie.holmes@lewisbrisbois.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Pearson, Carli) Processed on 10/3/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/03 11:39 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Karen Hanson Riebel (0219770) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9798734. Address to email certificate:atajagbusi@locklaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Riebel, Karen) Processed on 10/3/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/03 11:44 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kate M. Baxter-Kauf (0392037) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9798787. Address to email certificate:atajagbusi@locklaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Baxter-Kauf, Kate)Processed on 10/3/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/03 11:47 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Maureen Kane Berg (033344X) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9798833. Address to email certificate:atajagbusi@locklaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Berg, Maureen) Processed on 10/3/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/03 2:57 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Scott W Johnston (0247558) in the amount of $20, receipt number BMNDC-9799681. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Johnston, Scott) Processed on 10/3/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 02, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sun 10/02 12:29 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kathryn Bjorklund (0400798) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9797381. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Bjorklund, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/30 9:59 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jeffrey Sullivan Gleason (0396190) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9794577. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Gleason, Jeffrey) Processed on 9/30/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/30 10:04 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jamie R. Kurtz (0391792) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9794592. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kurtz, Jamie) Processed on 9/30/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Wed 09/28 1:12 PM
Certificate of Good Standing Paid William Walker. Payment made in the amount of $20.00, receipt number AMNDC-9776301. Processed 9/28/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 09/27 2:53 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Andrew Mark Malzahn (0397571) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9786772. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Malzahn, Andrew) Processed on 9/27/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 09/27 3:29 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Teresa M Thompson (0248940) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9786935. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Thompson, Teresa) Processed on 9/27/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/23 3:55 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Raymond James Trueblood-Konz (0391236) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9780314. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Trueblood-Konz, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/22 10:33 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for David G Hellmuth (229131) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9775505. Address to email certificate:msauer@hjlawfirm.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Hellmuth, David) Processed on 9/22/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/21 11:52 AM
FILED IN ERROR: FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Peter Joel Radakovich (6321344) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9772805. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Radakovich, Peter) Modified text on 9/21/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/21 2:47 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Phillip J Ashfield (0388990) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9773586. Address to email certificate:jess.rehbein@stinson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Ashfield, Phillip) Processed on 9/21/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 09/20 10:16 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Gerald Charles Pierre Robinson (0212787) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9769566. Address to email certificate:lockwood@halunenlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Robinson, Gerald) Processed on 9/20/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/19 9:55 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Elizabeth M Sorenson Brotten (0387148) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9766866. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth) Processed on 9/19/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/19 10:41 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Craig S Krummen (0259081) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9767104. Address to email certificate:solbergm@gtlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Krummen, Craig) Processed on 9/19/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/19 1:14 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Trevor Carolan (0396412) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9767607. Address to email certificate:trevor.carolan@bowmanandbrooke.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Carolan, Trevor) Processed on 9/19/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/16 8:10 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for J Derek Vandenburgh (224145) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9763812. Address to email certificate:kjohnston@carlsoncaspers.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Vandenburgh, J) Processed on 9/16/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/16 1:20 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Gregory John Myers (0287398) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9765025. Address to email certificate:segirard@locklaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Myers, Gregory)Processed on 9/16/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 09/13 10:53 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Christopher P Renz (0313415) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9755197. Address to email certificate:rlee@chestnutcambronne.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing Related [+] Processed on 9/13/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-] nz, Christopher
Monday, September 12, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/12 9:47 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Nathaniel Moore (0399004) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9751606. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Moore, Nathaniel) Processed on 9/12/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/12 10:15 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Charles Gokey (0402225) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9751761. Address to email certificate:bstevens@robinskaplan.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Gokey, Charles) Processed on 9/12/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/12 11:23 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Zachary Scott Erickson (0401216) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9752228. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Erickson, Zachary) Processed on 9/12/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/09 11:31 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for M Gregory Simpson (204560) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9748834. Address to email certificate:aditty@meagher.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Simpson, M) Processed on 9/9/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/08 9:51 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Carl F Engstrom (396298) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9745648. Address to email certificate:lburtch@engstromlee.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Engstrom, Carl) Processed on 9/8/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/08 2:42 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Brandie L Morgenroth (396155) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9746827. Address to email certificate:cmadden@nilanjohnson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Morgenroth, Brandie) Processed on 9/8/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/07 12:17 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Michael M Krauss (342002) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9743656. Address to email certificate:zac.fisher@gtlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Krauss, Michael) Processed on 9/7/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/02 9:46 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for William Thomson (0396743) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9737882. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Thomson, William) Processed on 9/2/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/01 8:11 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Damon L Ward (0221442) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9735186. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Ward, Damon) Processed on 9/1/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/01 8:48 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Emily Meaghan Clayton (0400380) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9735278. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Clayton, Emily) Processed on 9/1/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/01 1:32 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Ariana Kiener (0402365) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9736222. Address to email certificate:jgionnette@bm.net. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kiener, Ariana) Processed on 9/1/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/01 2:28 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Mark E Czuchry (293672) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9736458. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Czuchry, Mark) Processed on 9/1/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/31 8:05 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Hannah Mae Leiendecker (0401234) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9732210. Address to email certificate:mimi.christie@faegredrinker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Leiendecker, Hannah) Processed on 8/31/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/31 9:35 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kerry L Bundy (0266917) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9732514. Address to email certificate:jane.thompson@faegredrinker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Bundy, Kerry) Processed on 8/31/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/31 9:45 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Lauren W. Linderman (0398446) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9732560. Address to email certificate:jane.thompson@faegredrinker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Linderman, Lauren) Processed on 8/31/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Tue 08/30 9:25 AM
Certificate of Good Standing Paid Patrick D. Newman. Payment made in the amount of $20.00, receipt number AMNDC-9717257. Processed 8/30/22 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/30 9:37 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Molly Littman (398449) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9730200. Address to email certificate:solbergm@gtlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Littman, Molly) Processed on 8/30/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/30 1:17 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Nathan A Brennaman (0331776) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9730984. Address to email certificate:katie.daubenmeyer@faegredrinker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Brennaman, Nathan) Processed on 8/30/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/29 8:27 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Brian C Gudmundson (336695) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9727480. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Gudmundson, Brian) Processed on 8/29/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Thu 08/25 2:18 PM
Certificate of Good Standing Paid Gregory Schwartz. Payment made in the amount of $20.00, receipt number AMNDC-9717619. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Gregory Schwartz) Processed on 8/25/2022 (KMO). (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/24 9:37 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Beth Louise LaCanne (0397023) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9717277. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(LaCanne, Beth) Processed on 8/24/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/24 2:02 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Sheila Niaz (401884) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9718314. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Niaz, Sheila) Processed on 8/24/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/24 2:09 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kimberly S Holmes (0394886) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9718358. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Holmes, Kimberly) Processed on 8/24/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/23 10:32 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Alyssa Marie Goehring (6612319) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9715014. Address to email certificate:katie.holmes@lewisbrisbois.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Goehring, Alyssa) Processed on 8/23/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/23 11:18 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Paul McGrath (393264) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9715269. Address to email certificate:paul@disabilitypartners.net. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(McGrath, Paul) Processed on 8/23/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Tue 08/23 4:56 PM
Certificate of Good Standing Paid Elizabeth Joan Slama Johnson. Payment made in the amount of $20, receipt number BMNDC-9711500. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(McGrath, Paul) Processed on 8/23/2022 (JGK). (JGK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 08/18 2:19 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Adam Edward Szymanski (0397704) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9707372. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Szymanski, Adam) Processed on 8/18/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/17 8:37 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Todd A Noteboom (240047) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9702702. Address to email certificate:tammy.krause@stinson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Noteboom, Todd) Processed on 8/17/2022 (JGK)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/17 1:14 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for John G Albanese (0395882) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9703892. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Albanese, John) Processed on 8/17/2022 (JGK)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/17 2:38 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jessica J Theisen (0340376) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9704280. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Theisen, Jessica) Processed on 8/17/2022 (JGK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/16 2:09 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Todd A Noteboom (240047) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9701684. Address to email certificate:lisa.parks@stinson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Noteboom, Todd) Processed on 8/16/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/16 2:11 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Marla Butler (0397937) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9701669. Address to email certificate:tracey.nero@thompsonhine.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Butler, Marla) Processed on 8/16/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/15 1:29 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Logan J Drew (0389449) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9698613. Address to email certificate:spoppen@robinskaplan.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Drew, Logan) Processed on 8/15/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 08/12 10:10 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Megan Elizabeth Shutte (0399862) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9694765. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Shutte, Megan) Processed on 8/12/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 08/12 11:19 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Aaron D Van Oort (0315539) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9695127. Address to email certificate:kristen.mcgrew@faegredrinker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Van Oort, Aaron) Processed on 8/12/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 08/11 1:39 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Christopher P Renz (0313415) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9693020. Address to email certificate:rlee@chestnutcambronne.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing Related [+] Processed on 8/11/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-] nz, Christopher
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 08/11 1:46 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jeffrey D. Bores (227699) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9693044. Address to email certificate:rlee@chestnutcambronne.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Bores, Jeffrey) Processed on 8/11/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 08/11 1:47 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Daniel J Millea (0245963) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9693053. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Millea, Daniel) Processed on 8/11/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/09 9:10 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Erik Lindstedt (0401848) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9686302. Address to email certificate:eriklindstedt@live.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Lindstedt, Erik) Processed on 8/9/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/09 9:20 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Christine R M Kain (387663) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9686353. Address to email certificate:christine.kain@faegredrinker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kain, Christine) Processed on 8/9/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/08 10:30 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Aidan Isabella Zielske (0402882) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9683574. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Zielske, Aidan) Processed on 8/8/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 08/05 9:18 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for O. Joseph Balthazor, Jr (399093) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9680824. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Balthazor, O.)Processed on 8/5/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 08/04 9:25 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for C J Schoenwetter (025115X) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9678410. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Schoenwetter, C) Processed on 8/4/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/03 1:49 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Patrick P Jarosch (0395445) in the amount of $20, receipt number BMNDC-9676818. Address to email certificate:btaylor@ghlaw-llp.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Jarosch, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/02 2:15 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Eric Donald Olson (0398964) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9674381. Address to email certificate:cheryl.pedrolie@bowmanandbrooke.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Olson, Eric) Processed on 8/2/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 07/29 3:37 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Elizabeth J Roff (0388880) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9667916. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Roff, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 07/27 11:31 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Steven C Moore (252463) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9661199. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Moore, Steven) Processed on 7/27/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 07/27 12:13 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Marc Prokosch (0354028) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9661413. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Prokosch, Marc) Processed on 7/27/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 07/27 3:24 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Susan M Coler (217621) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9662327. Address to email certificate:lockwood@halunenlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Coler, Susan) Processed on 7/27/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 07/26 10:36 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Seth Zawila (0400304) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9657165. Address to email certificate:szawila@gmail.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Zawila, Seth) Processed on 7/26/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 07/22 2:10 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Clayton Carlson (0401182) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9652300. Address to email certificate:tiffany.gau@maslon.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Carlson, Clayton) Processed on 7/22/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 07/22 2:13 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Melissa R Muro LaMere (0393295) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9652303. Address to email certificate:brenda.gusaas@maslon.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Muro LaMere, Melissa) Processed on 7/22/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 07/22 2:19 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for William Z Pentelovitch (85078) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9652326. Address to email certificate:brenda.gusaas@maslon.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Pentelovitch, William) Processed on 7/22/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 07/21 10:58 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kyle E Hart (0159025) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9648876. Address to email certificate:dsolfield@fwhtlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Hart, Kyle) Processed on 7/21/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 07/21 11:03 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Richard G Jensen (18990X) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9648901. Address to email certificate:dsolfield@fwhtlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Jensen, Richard) Processed on 7/21/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 07/21 3:42 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Thomas J Nolan, Jr (0221399) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9650076. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Nolan, Thomas) Processed on 7/21/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 07/20 1:37 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Stephanie M Laws (0396174) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9646927. Address to email certificate:paula.rothstein@maslon.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Laws, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 07/20 3:32 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Nathaniel John Ajouri (0401144) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9647580. Address to email certificate:paula.rothstein@maslon.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Ajouri, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 07/19 2:42 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kevin R Coan (29357X) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9644272. Address to email certificate:hzopelis@hinshawlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Coan, Kevin) Processed on 7/19/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 07/19 2:47 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Joseph Alan Pull (0386968) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9644280. Address to email certificate:thorvig@parkerdk.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Pull, Joseph) Processed on 7/19/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 07/19 2:59 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Cicely R Miltich (0392902) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9644338. Address to email certificate:donna.dye@lathropgpm.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Miltich, Cicely) Processed on 7/19/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 07/19 9:06 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Raina Borrelli (392127) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9645152. Address to email certificate:minr@turkestrauss.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Borrelli, Raina)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 16, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sat 07/16 11:03 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Marc D Fink (0343407) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9639356. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Fink, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 07/15 9:57 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Daniel R Kelly (247674) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9636739. Address to email certificate:bglander@felhaber.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kelly, Daniel) Processed on 7/15/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 07/15 3:12 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Bartholomew B Torvik (335289) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9638298. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Torvik, Bartholomew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 07/14 9:09 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Daniel J. Supalla (0387064) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9634355. Address to email certificate:kjuricko@nilanjohnson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Supalla, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 07/12 11:41 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Daniel J Connolly (0197427) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9629121. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Connolly, Daniel) Processed on 7/12/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 07/12 1:30 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jesse H Kibort (328595) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9629655. Address to email certificate:thorvig@parkerdk.com328595. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kibort, Jesse) Processed on 7/12/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 07/11 11:17 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Daniel E Gustafson (202241) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9626031. Address to email certificate:dmundahl@gustafsongluek.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Gustafson, Daniel) Processed on 7/11/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 07/11 11:20 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Catherine Sung-Yun K. Smith (0353723) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9626100. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Smith, Catherine Sung-Yun) Processed on 7/11/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 07/11 11:23 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Daniel J Nordin (0392393) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9626119. Address to email certificate:dmundahl@gustafsongluek.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Nordin, Daniel) Processed on 7/11/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 07/11 11:29 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Anthony Stauber (0401093) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9626154. Address to email certificate:dmundahl@gustafsongluek.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Stauber, Anthony) Processed on 7/11/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 07/11 1:03 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for David Gomez (0401234) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9626721. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Gomez, David) Processed on 7/11/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Fri 07/08 10:56 AM
Certificate of Good Standing Paid Matthew Goggin. Payment made in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9602342. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing. Processed on 7/8/2022 (KMO). (JGK)
Related: [-]
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Fri 07/08 4:02 PM
Certificate of Good Standing Paid Bryan L. Bleichner. Payment made in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9620417. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing. Processed on 7/8/2022. (JGK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 07/06 9:41 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Ben D Kappelman (0395122) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9617761. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kappelman, Ben) Processed on 7/6/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 07/05 10:29 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Paul Applebaum (223098) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9615398. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Applebaum, Paul) Processed on 7/5/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 07/05 11:05 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Lukas Boehning (0401165) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9615642. Address to email certificate:lboehning@fredlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Boehning, Lukas) Processed on 7/5/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 07/05 11:29 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jonathan W Dettmann (265032) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9615720. Address to email certificate:pam.jarnberg@faegredrinker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Dettmann, Jonathan) Processed on 7/5/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 07/05 2:54 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jason D Friedman (0399808) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9616510. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Friedman, Jason) Processed on 7/5/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 07/01 2:50 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Molly Littman (398449) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9613388. Address to email certificate:littmanm@gtlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Littman, Molly) Processed on 7/1/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 06/30 9:53 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Adam John Kress (0397289) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9607851. Address to email certificate:akress@johnsonbecker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kress, Adam) Processed on 6/30/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 06/30 9:55 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kenneth W Pearson (016088X) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9607857. Address to email certificate:akress@johnsonbecker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Pearson, Kenneth) Processed on 6/30/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 06/30 9:57 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Michael K Johnson (0258696) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9607869. Address to email certificate:akress@johnsonbecker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Johnson, Michael) Processed on 6/30/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 06/29 2:52 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Conrad A Gosen (0395381) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9606507. Address to email certificate:riebe@fr.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Gosen, Conrad) Processed on 6/29/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 06/29 3:06 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Luke Hasskamp (0395167) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9606636. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Hasskamp, Luke) Processed on 6/29/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 06/29 3:30 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Rachel Kristine Tack (399529) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9606763. Address to email certificate:josephine.lu@zimmreed.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Tack, Rachel) Processed on 6/29/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 06/29 3:59 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jason P Johnston (391206) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9606895. Address to email certificate:josephine.lu@zimmreed.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Johnston, Jason) Processed on 6/29/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 06/27 11:13 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Drew Horwood (0402506) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9599421. Address to email certificate:maryann.villa@faegredrinker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Horwood, Drew) Processed on 6/27/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 06/27 1:34 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Ryan Malone (395795) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9600072. Address to email certificate:thorvig@parkerdk.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Malone, Ryan) Processed on 6/27/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 06/27 1:53 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Joseph A Herriges (390350) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9599718. Address to email certificate:riebe@fr.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Herriges, Joseph) Processed on 6/27/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 06/27 2:02 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Adam John Kress (0397289) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9600282. Address to email certificate:akress@johnsonbecker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kress, Adam)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 06/27 2:21 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Karen Diane Olson (254605) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9600389. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Olson, Karen)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 06/27 5:10 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Abou Amara, Jr (0401146) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9601285. Address to email certificate:cnoble@gustafsongluek.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Amara, Abou)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 06/22 11:15 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Aylix Jensen (0398588) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9589619. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Jensen, Aylix)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 06/21 12:49 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Brandie L Morgenroth (396155) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9586446. Address to email certificate:cmadden@nilanjohnson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Morgenroth, Brandie)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 06/21 3:12 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Marjan A Batchelor (341361) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9587351. Address to email certificate:mbatchelor@mayerbrown.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Batchelor, Marjan)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 19, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sun 06/19 6:43 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Angela Bortel (0387231) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9583454. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Bortel, Angela)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 06/17 9:45 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for John A Sullivan (0396730) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9581052. Address to email certificate:camey@bestlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Sullivan, John) Processed on 6/17/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 06/17 3:04 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kyle Nelson (401882) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9582463. Address to email certificate:holly.campbell@lewisbrisbois.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Nelson, Kyle) Processed on 6/17/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 06/17 4:22 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Joseph T Dixon, III (0283903) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9582779. Address to email certificate:dsynowczynski@fredlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Dixon, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 06/14 9:55 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Michael S Poncin (296417) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9571790. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Poncin, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 06/14 12:20 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kimberly S Holmes (0394886) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9572339. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Holmes, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 06/10 9:08 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Daniel Bihrle (0401570) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9565962. Address to email certificate:prabago@littler.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Bihrle, Daniel) Processed on 6/10/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 06/09 4:00 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Claire B. Deason (0390570) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9565063. Address to email certificate:prabago@littler.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Deason, Claire) Processed on 6/9/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 06/08 9:20 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Matthew Tews (0392033) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9560381. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Tews, Matthew) Processed on 6/8/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 06/08 2:15 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Matthew L Woods (0205278) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9561726. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Woods, Matthew) Processed on 6/8/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 06/07 10:06 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Joshua Poertner (0401056) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9557422. Address to email certificate:mpl.lssteam2@stinson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Poertner, Joshua) Processed on 6/7/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 06/07 4:35 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Melanie April Johnson (0400814) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9559487. Address to email certificate:knelson@nka.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Johnson, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 06/03 12:16 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Marla Butler (0397937) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9552154. Address to email certificate:tracey.nero@thompsonhine.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Butler, Marla) Processed on 6/3/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 06/01 10:51 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Elizabeth A Patton (00391431) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9545425. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Patton, Elizabeth)Processed on 6/1/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 06/01 10:54 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Andrew S Hansen (0285894) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9545451. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Hansen, Andrew) Processed on 6/1/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 06/01 10:56 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Lukas Dustin Jonathon Toft (0395984) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9545468. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Toft, Lukas) Processed on 6/1/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 05/31 4:35 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Gregory B Lawrence (0394967) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9543759. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Lawrence, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 05/24 9:35 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Bradley R Armstrong (0393524) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9530820. Address to email certificate:maureen.montpetit@lawmoss.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Armstrong, Bradley) Processed on 5/24/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 05/23 12:44 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Erik A Ahlgren (191814) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9528911. Address to email certificate:lisa@ahlgrenlaw.net. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Ahlgren, Erik)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 05/23 3:23 PM
FILED IN ERROR - FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Daniel J Cragg (389888) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9529736. Address to email certificate:dmcloone@ecklandblando.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Cragg, Daniel) Modified text on 5/23/2022 (JGK)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 05/20 12:32 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kerry L Bundy (0266917) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9525635. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Bundy, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 05/19 9:33 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Bryan J Huntington (0395762) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9521807. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Huntington, Bryan) Processed on 5/19/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 05/19 4:43 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for James A Godwin (392020) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9524099. Address to email certificate:barb@godwindold.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Godwin, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 05/18 9:56 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Rick A Dold (0394847) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9519069. Address to email certificate:rick@godwindold.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Dold, Rick) Processed on 5/18/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 05/17 2:19 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Melissa S. Weiner (0387900) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9517234. Address to email certificate:kadams@pswlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Weiner, Melissa) Processed on 5/17/2022 (DDB)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 05/17 3:14 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Hans W Lodge (0397012) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9517561. Address to email certificate:jsarvady@bm.net. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Lodge, Hans) Processed on 5/17/2022 (DDB)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 05/16 11:35 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jesse H Kibort (328595) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9513186. Address to email certificate:thorvig@parkerdk.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kibort, Jesse) Processed on 5/16/2022 (DDB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 05/12 9:33 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Thomas R. Pack (0398897) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9506970. Address to email certificate:parkerb@gtlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Pack, Thomas) Processed on 5/12/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 05/12 11:16 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for David Dormont (0252207) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9507417. Address to email certificate:sburke@@mmwr.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Dormont, David) Processed on 5/12/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Thu 05/12 3:00 PM
Certificate of Good Standing Paid Courtney Nicole Baga. Payment made in the amount of $20.00, receipt number AMNDC-9502865. (KMO) NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Lodge, Hans) Processed on 5/12/2022 (KMO). Modified text on 5/12/2022 (JGK). Processed on 5/12/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 05/11 2:02 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Judah Druck (0397764) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9505427. Address to email certificate:kathy.burns@maslon.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Druck, Judah) Processed on 5/11/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 05/10 12:15 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Andrew D Parker (195042) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9502502. Address to email certificate:thorvig@parkerdk.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Parker, Andrew)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 05/10 10:23 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Maximilian Hall (0400088) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9504058. Address to email certificate:maxfhall@gmail.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Hall, Maximilian)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 05/06 10:03 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Ashley R. Thronson (0395947) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9495861. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Thronson, Ashley) Processed on 5/6/2022 (DDB)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 05/06 10:26 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Teresa M Thompson (0248940) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9495963. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Thompson, Teresa) Processed on 5/6/2022 (DDB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 05/03 10:54 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Tina Syring-Petrocchi (0157053) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9486842. Address to email certificate:megan.froelke@lewisbrisbois.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Syring-Petrocchi, Tina) Processed on 5/3/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 05/03 11:04 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Carli D Pearson (0389689) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9486882. Address to email certificate:megan.froelke@lewisbrisbois.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Pearson, Carli) Processed on 5/3/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 05/03 11:08 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Richard G Morgan (0157053) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9486916. Address to email certificate:megan.froelke@lewisbrisbois.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Morgan, Richard) Processed on 5/3/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 05/03 11:51 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kyle Nelson (0401882) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9487394. Address to email certificate:megan.froelke@lewisbrisbois.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Nelson, Kyle) Processed on 5/3/2022 (KMO)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 05/02 3:46 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for David R Merritt (0393062) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9484651. Address to email certificate:shelley.beety@faegredrinker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Merritt, David) Processed on 5/2/2022 (DDB)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 04/29 4:32 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Aaron W. Pederson (0386953) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9481064. Address to email certificate:rfirner@carlsoncaspers.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Pederson, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 04/28 4:27 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Ryan L Kaess (29505x) in the amount of $20, receipt number BMNDC-9478229. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kaess, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 04/27 3:30 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Anthony W. Finnell, Jr (0398817) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9474966. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Finnell, Anthony)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 04/27 3:50 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kayla Marie Kienzle (399975) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9475113. Address to email certificate:masong-morfaw@nka.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kienzle, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 04/26 8:46 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kelly R. Oeltjenbruns (0400395) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9469812. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Oeltjenbruns, Kelly) Processed on 4/26/2022 (DDB)
Related: [-]
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Tue 04/26 12:30 PM
Certificate of Good Standing Paid Bryan L. Bleichner. Payment made in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9464066. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Oeltjenbruns, Kelly) Processed on 4/26/2022. (JGK)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 04/22 3:08 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Steven C Moore (252463) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9465543. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Moore, Steven) Processed on 4/22/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 04/22 3:13 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for David A Brandis (0392103) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9465569. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Brandis, David) Processed on 4/22/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 04/21 10:11 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Elliot R Ginsburg (0391156) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9461938. Address to email certificate:bjbertram@yourfranchiselawyer.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Ginsburg, Elliot) Processed on 4/21/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 04/19 12:12 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Ronald J Rasley (0182801) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9456840. Address to email certificate:dthen@blattnercompany.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Rasley, Ronald) Processed on 4/19/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 04/19 3:45 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Nicholas S Kuhlmann (33750X) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9458029. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kuhlmann, Nicholas) Processed on 4/19/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 04/18 9:07 AM
FILED IN ERROR - FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Paul A Kinne (1021493) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9452808. Address to email certificate:rcampbell@gtwlawyers.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kinne, Paul) Modified text on 4/18/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 04/18 2:47 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Michael A Stephani (390262) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9454257. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Stephani, Michael) Processed on 4/18/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 04/18 3:34 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Alyssa Schaefer (0402198) in the amount of $20, receipt number BMNDC-9454452. Address to email certificate:schaefer.alyssa@dorsey.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Schaefer, Alyssa) Processed on 4/18/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Fri 04/15 8:51 AM
Certificate of Good Standing Paid Matthew L McMullen. Payment made in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9438235. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing. Processed on 4/15/2022 (JGK)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 04/15 10:35 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Vince C Reuter (390874) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9450459. Address to email certificate:dmcloone@ecklandblando.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing Related [+] Processed on 4/15/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-] uter, Vince
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 04/15 11:20 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Sonia L Miller-Van Oort (278087) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9450702. Address to email certificate:valeriej@sapientialaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Miller-Van Oort, Sonia) Processed on 4/15/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Mon 04/11 8:58 AM
Certificate of Good Standing Paid Lida Bannink. Payment made in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9426999. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing. Processed on 4/11/2022. (JGK)
Related: [-]
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Mon 04/11 9:01 AM
Certificate of Good Standing Paid David J S Madgett. Payment made in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9429725. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing. Processed on 4/11/2022. (JGK)
Related: [-]
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Mon 04/11 9:05 AM
Certificate of Good Standing Paid Lauren Allison D'Cruz. Payment made in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9434580. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing. Processed on 4/11/2022. (JGK)
Related: [-]
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Mon 04/11 9:10 AM
Certificate of Good Standing Paid Bert Black. Payment made in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9434588. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing. Processed on 4/11/2022 (JGK)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 10, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sun 04/10 5:13 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Byrne J. Decker (0402552) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9436453. Address to email certificate:susan.norton@ogletree.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Decker, Byrne) Processed on 4/11/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 04/08 1:49 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jenna Dakroub (0401650) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9434970. Address to email certificate:casemanagers@pricelawgroup.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 04/06 11:06 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Hans W Lodge (0397012) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9429017. Address to email certificate:jsarvady@bm.net. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Lodge, Hans) Processed on 4/6/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 04/06 12:05 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kronsky Kennon Sherer (0311479) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9429265. Address to email certificate:Kronsky.Sherer@hnbllc.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Sherer, Kronsky) Processed on 4/6/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 04/05 8:30 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Thomas J Lyons, Jr (249646) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9425614. Address to email certificate:andi@consumerjusticecenter.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Lyons, Thomas) Processed on 4/5/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 04/05 10:37 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Todd A Noteboom (0240047) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9426013. Address to email certificate:jaci.mueller@stinson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Noteboom, Todd) Processed on 4/5/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 04/04 11:29 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kelly A Lelo (330838) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9423488. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Lelo, Kelly) Processed on 4/4/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 03, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sun 04/03 4:39 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Doowon R Chung (0397413) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9422538. Address to email certificate:terry.conn@faegredrinker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Chung, Doowon)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 04/01 10:04 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Susan M Coler (0217621) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9420411. Address to email certificate:lockwood@halunenlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Coler, Susan) Processed on 4/1/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 04/01 7:42 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Raina Borrelli (392127) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9422434. Address to email certificate:minr@turkestrauss.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Borrelli, Raina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 03/31 1:42 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Ellen A Brinkman (0386578) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9418666. Address to email certificate:kjuricko@nilanjohnson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Brinkman, Ellen) Processed on 3/31/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/29 9:49 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Patrick D Newman (395864) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9412948. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Newman, Patrick) Processed on 3/29/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/29 10:33 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jason J Stover (30573X) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9413189. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Stover, Jason) Processed on 3/29/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/29 11:50 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Thomas R. Pack (0398897) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9413559. Address to email certificate:parkerb@gtlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Pack, Thomas) Processed on 3/29/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/29 12:14 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Michael Boulette (0390962) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9413617. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Boulette, Michael) Processed on 3/29/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/29 12:15 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Nicole E Narotzky (0329885) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9413667. Address to email certificate:parkerb@gtlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Narotzky, Nicole) Processed on 3/29/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 03/28 10:40 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for T Joseph Snodgrass (231071) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9410286. Address to email certificate:bfriesen@snodgrass-law.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Snodgrass, T) Processed on 3/28/2022 (DDB)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 03/25 2:54 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Clayton D Halunen (219721) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9408094. Address to email certificate:lockwood@halunenlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Coler, Susan) Modified text and Processed on 3/25/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 03/25 3:02 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Raechel J. Bimmerle (0400466) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9408124. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Bimmerle, Raechel) Processed on 3/25/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 03/24 12:39 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Richard C Landon (392306) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9404835. Address to email certificate:kristina.procai@lathropgpm.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Landon, Richard) Processed on 3/24/2022 (DDB)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 03/24 2:57 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Margaret Ann Santos (0389206) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9405363. Address to email certificate:hzopelis@hinshawlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Santos, Margaret) Processed on 3/24/2022 (DDB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 03/23 12:56 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Erin E Westbrook (0393072) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9402515. Address to email certificate:shannon.albright@saul.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Westbrook, Erin) Processed on 3/23/2022 (DDB). Processed on 3/23/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 03/23 1:29 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Christopher P Parrington (34090X) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9402623. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Parrington, Christopher) Processed on 3/23/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 03/23 2:10 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Molly Littman (398449) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9402795. Address to email certificate:solbergm@gtlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Littman, Molly) Processed on 3/23/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/22 8:44 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Erik Lindstedt (0401848) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9398737. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Lindstedt, Erik) Processed on 3/22/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/22 10:19 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for E Michelle Drake (0387366) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9399160. Address to email certificate:jhibray@bm.net. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Drake, E) Processed on 3/22/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/22 10:20 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for John G Albanese (0395882) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9399185. Address to email certificate:jhibray@Bm.net. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Albanese, John) Processed on 3/22/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/22 10:23 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Ariana Kiener (0402365) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9399192. Address to email certificate:jhibray@bm.net. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kiener, Ariana) Processed on 3/22/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/22 1:44 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for James C Snyder, Sr (183374) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9400028. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Snyder, James) Processed on 3/22/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/22 3:09 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Margaret S Brownell (307324) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9400497. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Brownell, Margaret) Processed on 3/22/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/22 3:18 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for William Z Pentelovitch (85078) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9400589. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Brownell, Margaret) Processed on 3/22/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 03/21 9:15 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Mary Pheng (0398500) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9396268. Address to email certificate:marypheng@gmail.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Pheng, Mary) Processed on 3/21/2022 (DDB)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 03/21 4:38 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Adine S Momoh (0390085) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9398092. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Momoh, Adine)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 19, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sat 03/19 8:18 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Katherine Ruth Jensen Scott (402146) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9395841. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Scott, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 03/18 1:33 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Scott E Korzenowski (27155x) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9394710. Address to email certificate:sstorbakken@dadygardner.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Korzenowski, Scott) Processed on 3/18/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 17, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 03/17 10:29 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Forrest Tahdooahnippah (391459) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9391138. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Tahdooahnippah, Forrest)Processed on 3/17/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 03/17 3:50 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Ted David Hartman (0399740) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9392760. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Hartman, Ted) Processed on 3/17/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 03/16 10:06 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for David A Goodwin (0386715) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9388581. Address to email certificate:djakubauskiene@gustafsongluek.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Goodwin, David)Processed on 3/16/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 03/16 10:10 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Ling Shan Wang (399447) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9388593. Address to email certificate:djakubauskiene@gustafsongluek.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Wang, Ling) Processed on 3/16/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 03/16 12:09 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Chelsea Eveline Vilchis (0402156) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9389129. Address to email certificate:cmadden@nilanjohnson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Vilchis, Chelsea) Processed on 3/16/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/15 5:40 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Timothy P Griffin (0285717) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9387983. Address to email certificate:mpl.lssteam1@stinson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Griffin, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 03/11 12:02 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Bridget A Brine (022778X) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9380473. Address to email certificate:cpaul@courts.az.gov. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Brine, Bridget) Processed on 3/11/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 03/09 2:42 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Patrick M O'Donnell (190883) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9374901. Address to email certificate:pam.clark@spoelawyers.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(O'Donnell, Patrick) Processed on 3/9/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/08 5:57 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Lee Myron Orwig (0388161) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9368839. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Orwig, Lee) Processed on 3/8/2022 (DDB)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/08 9:37 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Teresa J Nelson (0269736) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9369253. Address to email certificate:hmundt@aclu-mn.org. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Nelson, Teresa) Processed on 3/8/2022 (DDB)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/08 2:13 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Matthew R McBride (0261981) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9370459. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(McBride, Matthew)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/08 2:38 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for James A Lodoen (173605) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9370603. Address to email certificate:sgavin@spencerfane.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Lodoen, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 03/07 10:54 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Adam John Kress (0397289) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9367006. Address to email certificate:akress@johnsonbecker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kress, Adam) Processed on 3/7/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 03/07 10:55 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kenneth W Pearson (016088X) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9367011. Address to email certificate:akress@johnsonbecker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kress, Adam) Modified text on 3/7/2022 (JGK). Processed on 3/7/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 03/04 2:00 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Bryan J Huntington (0395762) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9365144. Address to email certificate:rwulff@larkinhoffman.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Huntington, Bryan) Processed on 3/4/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 03/04 2:04 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Gary A Van Cleve (156310) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9365177. Address to email certificate:rwulff@larkinhoffman.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Van Cleve, Gary) Processed on 3/4/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 03/04 2:44 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Mark R Bradford (0335940) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9365318. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Bradford, Mark) Processed on 3/4/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Wed 03/02 2:34 PM
Certificate of Good Standing Paid Phillip F Fishman. Payment made in the amount of $20.00, receipt number AMNDC-0000226. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Fishman, Phillip) Processed on 3/2/2022 (ABR). Modified text on 3/2/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 03/01 4:39 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Matthew Beyer (0402438) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9358017. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Beyer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 02/23 9:08 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Robert K Shelquist (021310X) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9345377. Address to email certificate:bgilles@locklaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Shelquist, Robert) Processed on 2/23/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 02/22 8:35 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Christine M Mennen (322349) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9341964. Address to email certificate:cmadden@nilanjohnson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Mennen, Christine) Processed on 2/22/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 02/22 8:39 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for John J Wackman (251884) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9341985. Address to email certificate:cmadden@nilanjohnson.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Wackman, John) Processed on 2/22/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 02/22 10:27 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Stacey L Drentlaw (285201) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9342485. Address to email certificate:ldorn@taftlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Drentlaw, Stacey) Processed on 2/22/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 02/16 7:12 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Damon L Ward (221442) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9336000. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Ward, Damon)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 02/14 11:30 AM
FILED IN ERROR - FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Eric L. Yaffe (0387566) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9328643. Address to email certificate:angelina.mejia@lathropgpm.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Yaffe, Eric) Modified text on 2/14/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 02/14 12:26 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for C J Schoenwetter (025115X) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9329021. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Schoenwetter, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 02/11 7:30 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Erin L McCann (0387835) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9323870. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(McCann, Erin) Processed on 2/11/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 02/11 8:59 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Nathan A Brennaman (0331776) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9324031. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Brennaman, Nathan) Processed on 2/11/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 10, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 02/10 4:36 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Adam John Kress (0397289) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9323418. Address to email certificate:akress@johnsonbecker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kress, Adam)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 02/10 4:44 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Michael K Johnson (0258696) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9323433. Address to email certificate:akress@johnsonbecker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Johnson, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 02/10 4:52 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Kenneth W Pearson (016088X) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9323458. Address to email certificate:akress@johnsonbecker.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Pearson, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 02/09 10:21 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Michael G Davey (0388285) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9318494. Address to email certificate:mike@fullcircle.mn. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Davey, Michael) Processed on 2/9/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Thu 03/03 9:07 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID Eric L Newmark. Payment made in the amount of $20.00, receipt number AMNDC-9312483. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing. (Eric Newmark) Processed on 3/3/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 02/04 9:00 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for David E Scouton (305510) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9309604. Address to email certificate:blr@trialgroupnorth.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Scouton, David) Processed on 2/4/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 02/04 9:07 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Peter J Raukar (0342968) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9309627. Address to email certificate:blr@trialgroupnorth.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Raukar, Peter) Processed on 2/4/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 02/04 9:12 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Matthew R Thibodeau (279742) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9309656. Address to email certificate:blr@trialgroupnorth.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Thibodeau, Matthew) Processed on 2/4/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 02/04 9:50 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for David D Coyle (396431) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9309965. Address to email certificate:wendy@pritzkerlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Coyle, David) Processed on 2/4/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 02/04 9:57 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Raymond James Trueblood-Konz (0391236) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9310016. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Trueblood-Konz, Raymond) Processed on 2/4/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 02/04 3:13 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Rachel Dougherty (0399947) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9311512. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Dougherty, Rachel) Processed on 2/4/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 02/04 4:54 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Joel T Wiegert (0306149) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9311937. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Wiegert, Joel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 02/02 7:51 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Nadia Mezic (0402757) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9303299. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Mezic, Nadia) Processed on 2/2/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 02/02 9:39 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for William L Walker, Jr (0300883) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9303653. Address to email certificate:Walker@walkerjustice.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Walker, William) Processed on 2/2/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 02/02 3:45 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Daniel A Haws (193501) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9305627. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Haws, Daniel) Processed on 2/2/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 28, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 01/28 2:32 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Michele R Fisher (303069) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9294577. Address to email certificate:crued@nka.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Fisher, Michele) Processed on 1/28/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 01/27 11:09 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Thomas R. Pack (0398897) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9290392. Address to email certificate:parkerb@gtlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Pack, Thomas) Processed on 1/27/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 01/25 1:11 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for J D Haas (164173) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9285325. Address to email certificate:jerspamer@jdhaas.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Haas, J D) Processed on 1/25/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 22, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sat 01/22 9:31 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Test Mndtest (TEST) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9280634. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Mndtest, Test) Processed on 1/22/2022 (JGK)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 01/21 8:53 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for David C Kim (0328662) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9278086. Address to email certificate:mmurphy@gislason.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kim, David) Processed on 1/21/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 01/21 11:01 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for JaneAnne Murray (0394887) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9278554. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Murray, JaneAnne) Processed on 1/21/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 01/21 3:45 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Lora Mitchell Friedemann (259615) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9279972. Address to email certificate:kmhanson@fredlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Friedemann, Lora) Processed on 1/21/2022 (JGK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 01/20 2:53 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for E Michelle Drake (0387366) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9276864. Address to email certificate:jhibray@bm.net. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Drake, E)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 01/20 2:55 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Joseph Hashmall (0392610) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9276896. Address to email certificate:jhibray@bm.net. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Hashmall, Joseph)
Related: [-]
notice Certificate of Good Standing Fee Paid Thu 01/20 3:53 PM
Certificate of Good Standing Paid Sarah A. Horstmann. Payment made in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9264560. Processed on 1/20/2022. (JGK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 01/18 4:54 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Bryan J Huntington (395762) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9272094. Address to email certificate:daniel.pionke@wicourts.gov. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Huntington, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 15, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sat 01/15 10:24 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Test Mndtest (TEST) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9269109. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Mndtest, Test) Processed on 1/15/2022 (JGK)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 01/14 9:36 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Daniel E Gustafson (202241) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9266705. Address to email certificate:smoen@gustafsongluek.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Gustafson, Daniel) Processed on 1/14/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 01/14 9:39 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Amanda M Williams (341691) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9266754. Address to email certificate:smoen@gustafsongluek.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Williams, Amanda) Processed on 1/14/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 01/14 9:43 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Daniel J Nordin (392393) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9266784. Address to email certificate:smoen@gustafsongluek.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Nordin, Daniel) Processed on 1/14/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 01/14 9:54 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Karla M Gluek (238399) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9266865. Address to email certificate:smoen@gustafsongluek.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Gluek, Karla) Processed on 1/14/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 01/14 12:08 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Lisa A Crum (302600) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9267321. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Crum, Lisa) Processed on 1/14/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 01/14 4:51 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jacob Robert Rusch (391892) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9268674. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Rusch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 01/14 4:54 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Zackary S. Kaylor (0400854) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9268731. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Kaylor, Zackary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
15 15 misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 01/13 12:43 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Lukas Boehning (0401165) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9264562. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Boehning, Lukas)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 01/13 12:26 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Grant Daniel Goerke (0395226) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9264500. Address to email certificate:Rduffy@littler.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Goerke, Grant) Processed on 1/13/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
13 13 misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 01/12 9:22 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Marc Prokosch (0354028) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9261565. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Prokosch, Marc) Processed on 1/12/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
12 12 misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 01/11 4:17 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Jenna Dakroub (0401650) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9260753. Address to email certificate:casemanagers@pricelawgroup.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 01/11 8:57 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Marc D Fink (0343407) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9258862. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Fink, Marc) Processed on 1/11/2022 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
10 10 misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 01/07 4:08 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Brian J Linnerooth (0400162) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9254784. Address to email certificate:blinnerooth@bestlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Linnerooth, Brian)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 01/07 3:18 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for David J S Madgett (0390494) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9254596. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Madgett, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
8 8 misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 01/06 4:39 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Vanessa J Szalapski (0396739) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9252320. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Szalapski, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 01/06 11:38 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Eric S Johnson (0389334) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9251216. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Johnson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
6 6 misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 01/05 3:26 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Michael M Krauss (0342002) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9249128. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Krauss, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 01/04 4:20 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Haynes Hansen (0399102) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9246952. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Hansen, Haynes) Processed on 1/4/2022 (JGK)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 01/04 11:19 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Raymond James Trueblood-Konz (0391236) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9245439. Address to email certificate:caleb@pritzkerlaw.com. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Trueblood-Konz, Raymond)Processed on 1/4/2022 (JGK)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
3 3 misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 01/03 3:07 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Sarah Vandelist (0400801) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9243196. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Vandelist, Sarah)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 01/03 2:09 PM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Michael A Bryant (218583) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9242980. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Bryant, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 01/03 11:02 AM
FEE FOR (1) CERTIFICATE(S) OF GOOD STANDING PAID for Hans W Lodge (0397012) in the amount of $20, receipt number AMNDC-9242325. Address to email certificate:jsarvady@bm.net. NOTE: Your certificate(s) will be emailed to you or to the designated email after verification and processing.(Lodge, Hans)
Related: [-]