New Jersey District Court
Judge:Madeline Cox Arleo
Referred: Andre M Espinosa
Case #: 2:22-cv-00008
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2022
Re-opened:Jul 11, 2022
Terminated:Jul 11, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jul 02, 2022 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
CELENTANO, STADTMAUER & WALENTOWICZ, LLP
Represented By
ANDREW MICHAEL SCHWARTZ
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
LAWRENCE J. BARTEL, III
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Plaintiff
DEBORAH ZUCKERBROD
Represented By
YAAKOV SAKS
Stein Saks, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, July 11, 2022
12 12 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 07/11 11:13 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that the Clerk of the Court shall reopen the case and make a new and separate docket entry reading "CIVIL CASE REOPENED"; that this matter be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and without costs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2).. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 7/11/2022. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Mon 05/16 11:00 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 7/12/2022. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 5/13/2022. (ld, )
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Settlement (aty) Fri 05/13 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by DEBORAH ZUCKERBROD (SAKS, YAAKOV)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
9 9 discov Joint Discovery Plan Mon 04/18 11:10 AM
Joint Discovery Plan by DEBORAH ZUCKERBROD.(SAKS, YAAKOV)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
8 8 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 04/01 5:55 PM
ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 5/17/2022 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/1/2022. (spc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 03/03 8:39 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CELENTANO, STADTMAUER & WALENTOWICZ, LLP (SCHWARTZ, ANDREW) Modified on 3/3/2022 (ams, )
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Statement 7.1.1 Third Party Funding Thu 03/03 8:38 AM
Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by CELENTANO, STADTMAUER & WALENTOWICZ, LLP. (SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/03 8:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW MICHAEL SCHWARTZ on behalf of CELENTANO, STADTMAUER & WALENTOWICZ, LLP (SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 25, 2022
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/25 7:07 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by CELENTANO, STADTMAUER & WALENTOWICZ, LLP.(BARTEL, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/25 9:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DEBORAH ZUCKERBROD. CELENTANO, STADTMAUER & WALENTOWICZ, LLP served on 1/18/2022, answer due 2/8/2022. (SAKS, YAAKOV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 01/04 10:37 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CELENTANO, STADTMAUER & WALENTOWICZ, LLP. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/03 11:29 AM
COMPLAINT against CELENTANO, STADTMAUER & WALENTOWICZ, LLP ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13078494) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DEBORAH ZUCKERBROD.(SAKS, YAAKOV)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/03 4:04 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (ak, )
Related: [-]