Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Camille L Velez-Rive
Referred: Marcos E Lopez
Case #: 3:22-cv-01001
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jul 02, 2022 4:26 AM AST
Defendant
Puerto Rico Telephone Company
PO Box 360998
San Juan, PR 00936
Represented By
Johanelle Gonzalez-Rodriguez
Aldarondo & Lopez-Bras Psc
contact info
Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Aldarondo & Lopez Bras, Psc
contact info
Plaintiff
Mastec North America, Inc.
800 Douglas Road #1200
Coral Gables, FL 33134
Represented By
Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz
O'Neill & Borges, LLC
contact info
Antonio L. Roig-Lorenzo
O'Neill & Borges
contact info
Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera
O'Neill & Borges, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
182 182 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 03/19 10:28 AM
ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part Docket Nos. 174, 175 and 178. The request for sanctions is denied. The parties are allowed until April 30, 2025 to conduct limited discovery only as to the documents recently produced by Mastec. The depositions of the witnesses Claro wishes to depose as to these documents shall be taken during the above established deadline and shall be limited to questions as no request for further production of documents or third party subpoenas will be allowed. The following NEW deadlines are set as follows: expert reports now due May 30, 2025; rebuttal reports due June 30, 2025; expert discovery deadline July 30, 2025; dispositive motions due September 2, 2025; and oppositions thereto October 2, 2025. The Court expects the parties' compliance with these deadlines, as this case is again reportable for the three-year threshold in September 2025. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on March 19, 2025. (ASE)
Related: [-]
181 181 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 03/19 10:23 AM
ORDER: GRANTING Docket No.179 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Puerto Rico Telephone Company; and NOTING Docket No.180 MOTION Submitting Confidential Exhibit 2 of ECF 178 filed by Puerto Rico Telephone Company. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on March 19, 2025. (ASE)
Related: [-]
180 180 motion Submitting Wed 03/19 9:59 AM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION Submitting Confidential Exhibit 2 of ECF 178 filed by Johanelle Gonzalez-Rodriguez on behalf of Puerto Rico Telephone Company, Mastec North America, Inc.. Responses due by 4/2/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Johanelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2
179 179 motion Restrict Wed 03/19 9:48 AM
MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Johanelle Gonzalez-Rodriguez on behalf of Puerto Rico Telephone Company. Responses due by 4/2/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Johanelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
178 178 motion In Compliance Tue 03/18 9:54 PM
Motion In Compliance with Order and Response in Opposition to Motion Requesting Order as to 176 Order, filed by Johanelle Gonzalez-Rodriguez on behalf of Puerto Rico Telephone Company. Responses due by 4/1/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Gonzalez-Rodriguez, Johanelle)
Related: [-] 176
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 3,
Att: 3 Exhibit 4,
Att: 4 Exhibit 5,
Att: 5 Exhibit 6,
Att: 6 Exhibit 7,
Att: 7 Exhibit 8
177 177 respm Response to Motion Tue 03/18 6:04 PM
RESPONSE to Motion REQUESTING RECONSIDERATION OF PRTC/CLAROS URGENT MOTION [DOCKET NO. 175] filed by Mastec North America, Inc. Re:175 MOTION for Reconsideration re 172 Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,, Order on Informative Motion,,, filed by Puerto Rico Telephone Company filed by Mastec North America, Inc.. (Almonte-Veloz, Alvaro)
Related: [-]