Bergman v. AutoZone Parts, Inc.
Illinois Southern District Court | |
Judge: | David W Dugan |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00007 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 04, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2023 |
Case in other court: | St. Clair County, 21-L-1110 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 03, 2022 4:06 AM CDT |
Defendant
AutoZone Parts, Inc.
d/b/a AutoZone Auto Parts-Cahokia 123 South Front Street
Memphis, TN 38103 |
Represented By
|
Mediator
Eugene C Menges
6400 West Main Street Suite 1G
Belleville, IL 62223 |
|
Plaintiff
Robyn Bergman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
![]() JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. Approved by Judge David W. Dugan on 12/20/2023. (dmw2) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order 60 Day
Wed 10/18 2:04 PM
60 DAY ORDER. Having been advised by counsel (Notice of Settlement at Doc. 28) that the parties have settled the above-captioned action in its entirety and that they need 60 days to finalize settlement documents, the undersigned DIRECTS the Clerk of Court, 60 days after this Order is docketed , to ENTER JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs, unless otherwise provided in the settlement documents. If the parties fail to finalize the settlement within the 60-day period, they may -- before that period expires -- move to postpone entry of judgment. Due to the settlement, the Court CANCELS all settings herein. Responses due by 12/18/2023. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 10/18/2023. (dmw2) |
|
28 | 28
![]() NOTICE of Settlement by AutoZone Parts, Inc. (Veath, Beth) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
![]() AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting26 Joint MOTION to Continue filed by AutoZone Parts, Inc. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 7/18/2024 at 10:00 AM and Jury Trial RESET for 7/29/2024 at 9:00 AM both in the East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge David W. Dugan. Discovery due by 2/21/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 3/22/2024. Mandatory Mediation Session to be completed by 1/22/2024. Mandatory Mediation Program Completion due by 3/7/2024. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 9/26/2023. (dmw2) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Joint MOTION to Continue by AutoZone Parts, Inc.. (Veath, Beth) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 09/13 4:08 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time. On August 7, 2023, Defendant AutoZone Parts, Inc. filed its motion for summary judgment (Doc. 22). Plaintiff Robyn Bergman now seeks an additional 30 days to file a response to Defendant's motion (Doc. 24). Plaintiff represents that the parties are engaging in settlement discussions and Plaintiff requests additional time to respond to Defendant's motion to further explore the opportunity for potential resolution. Defendant's counsel consents to this request. For good cause shown, Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. 24) is GRANTED . Plaintiff may file her response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by October 13, 2023 . . Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 9/13/2023. (arm) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to22 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,23 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, by Robyn Bergman. (Mahoney, Ryan) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() MEMORANDUM in Support re22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AutoZone Parts, Inc..(Veath, Beth) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
22 | 22
![]() MOTION for Summary Judgment by AutoZone Parts, Inc.. (Veath, Beth) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2023 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 02/23 10:00 AM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Mandatory Mediation Session to be completed by 8/25/2023. Mandatory Mediation Program Completion due by 10/10/2023. (adh) |
||
Wednesday, February 22, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
![]() AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 2/22/2023. (dmw2) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2023 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 02/10 3:38 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Continue Trial Date. By Motion dated February 9, 2023, Defendant seeks to continue the current trial setting and amend corresponding deadlines in the Court's scheduling order. Defendant represents that the parties have been working diligently in discovery, but only recently received Plaintiff's medical records. The parties further anticipate needing additional expert discovery and will be unable to complete this discovery within the current deadlines. The Motion indicates that Defendant consents to this request. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED . The following deadlines are RESET: Discovery due by 9/25/2023 ; Dispositive Motions due by 10/24/2023 ; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2024 at 10:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 2/26/2024 at 9:00 AM both in the East St. Louis Courthouse. The parties are reminded that they may stipulate to certain discovery deadlines without the Court's intervention so long as those stipulations do not interfere with the Cour's deadlines for completing discovery, hearing a motion, or for trial. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 29. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 2/10/2023. (dmw2) |
||
Thursday, February 09, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() MOTION to Continue Trial Date by AutoZone Parts, Inc.. (Veath, Beth) |
|
Tuesday, November 08, 2022 | ||
order
Order
Tue 11/08 4:09 PM
ORDER re17 Stipulation Modifying Scheduling Order. On November 7, 2022, the parties filed a joint stipulation purporting to modify certain discovery deadlines in the Court's Scheduling and Discovery Order. Fed. R. Civ. P. 29 provides that the parties may mutually agree to modify discovery dates set in the scheduling order by written stipulation so long as the modification does not impact the deadline for the completion of all discovery, the deadline for filing dispositive motions, or the date of any court appearance. Accordingly, the parties do not need to file these stipulations with the Court. Nevertheless, the parties have agreed to take certain expert witness depositions by February 27, 2023. This date is after the current discovery deadline in this matter, which is currently set for February 21, 2023 (Doc. 11). If the parties seek to amend or modify this discovery deadline, they must do so by separate motion. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 11/8/2022. (arm) |
||
Monday, November 07, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
![]() STIPULATION Modifying Scheduling Order by Robyn Bergman. (Mahoney, Ryan) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2022 | ||
notice
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Mon 05/23 12:01 PM
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Status Conference set for 6/9/2022 is CANCELLED and will be reset at a later date, if necessary. (dmw2) |
||
Tuesday, March 15, 2022 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 03/15 12:52 PM
ORDER granting14 Joint Motion to Appoint Private Mediator. The Court approves the private mediator selected by the parties. The parties are directed to review § 3.2 of the Court's Mediation Plan which states that when the selected mediator is not on the Court's Mediation Panel List, the parties will be responsible for filing the mediation report with the Court. See also § 3.10. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to add the selected mediator, Eugene Menges, to the docket using the contact information in the parties' Attestation (Doc. 14-1). Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 3/15/2022. (arm) |
||
Monday, March 14, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Joint MOTION to Appoint Private Mediator by AutoZone Parts, Inc..(Veath, Beth) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 10, 2022 | ||
notice
Notice Striking Electronically Filed Documents
Thu 03/10 2:37 PM
NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking12 Stipulation Selecting Mediator. The selected mediator is not a Court-approved mediator for the Courts Mandatory Mediation Program. A list of Court-approved mediators for the Program is available at http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/Mediation/MediationList.aspx. If the parties would like to use a mediator other than from the Courts Mediation Panel List, please consult Sec. 3.2 of the Courts Mandatory Mediation Plan. (adh) |
||
Wednesday, March 09, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Gene Menges has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. Signed by Beth Kamp Veath on behalf, and with consent, of all Counsel of Record on 3/9/2022. (Veath, Beth) |
|
Wednesday, February 09, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery due by 2/21/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 3/23/2023. Stipulation Selecting Mediator to be filed by 3/15/2022. Mandatory Mediation Session to be completed by 1/23/2023. Mandatory Mediation Program Completion due by 3/8/2023. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 2/9/2022.(dmw2) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
order
Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 02/09 9:07 AM
ORDER. The Court adopts the Joint Report of the Parties as submitted, with the modification of the Discovery deadline in accordance with local rules. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2022 is CANCELLED . Should the parties seek to amend the trial date, a written motion will be required. A Status Conference is set for 6/9/2022 at 3:00 PM via Zoom video conference before Judge David W. Dugan. The Parties will receive the appropriate Zoom invitation via email from the Court. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 2/9/2022. (dmw2) |
||
Friday, January 14, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 1/14/2022. (dmw2) |
|
8 | 8
![]() ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 3:30 PM via Zoom video conference before Judge David W. Dugan. The Parties will receive the appropriate Zoom invitation via email from the Court. The Joint Report of the Parties is due on or before 2/8/2022 and shall be submitted via email to DWDpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov. The Parties are instructed to use the correct form for the Joint Report of the Parties which can be found attached to this Order. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 1/14/2022. (dmw2) |
|
7 | 7
![]() CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2023 at 10:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 7/10/2023 at 9:00 AM both in the East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge David W. Dugan. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 1/14/2022. (dmw2) |
|
Tuesday, January 11, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ANSWER to Complaint by AutoZone Parts, Inc..(Veath, Beth) |
|
Tuesday, January 04, 2022 | ||
5 | 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:22-cv-00007-DWD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (clt) | |
4 | 4
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by AutoZone Parts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AutoZone, Inc. for AutoZone Parts, Inc.. (Veath, Beth) |
|
3 | 3
![]() SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal re1 Notice of Removal, by AutoZone Parts, Inc.. .(Veath, Beth) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Kamp Veath on behalf of AutoZone Parts, Inc. (Veath, Beth) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County, case number 21-L-1110 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4670872), filed by AutoZone Parts, Inc..(Veath, Beth) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
utility
Case Opening Notification
Tue 01/04 3:07 PM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:22-cv-00007-DWD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (clt) |