New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Lashann Dearcy Hall
Referred: Peggy Kuo
Case #: 1:22-cv-00042
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2022
Terminated:Mar 31, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jul 03, 2022 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Emanuel Mizrahi, D.D.S., P.C.
Represented By
Laleh Hawa
Cox Padmore Skolnik & Shakarchy LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
New York Orthodontic Group, PLLC
Represented By
Ashly Erin Sands
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Jason M. Drangel
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Kerry Brenae Brownlee
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Danielle S. Futterman
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, April 01, 2022
19 19 notice Notice of Report Patent or Trademark AO120 Fri 04/01 9:30 AM
Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Hong, Loan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Electronic entry terminating civil case
Thursday, March 31, 2022
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 03/31 5:26 PM
Civil Case Terminated per18 . (Layne, Monique)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/30 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by New York Orthodontic Group, PLLC with prejduice (Brownlee, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 03/28 9:33 AM
ORDER: The initial conference by telephone previously scheduled for April 8, 2022 is canceled. The parties are directed to file a joint proposed discovery plan within seven (7) days of a decision on any anticipated motion to dismiss, if the motion is not fully granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 3/28/2022. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
17 17 misc Letter Wed 02/23 9:42 AM
Letter in Opposition to Defendant's Request for Pre-Motion Conference (Docket Entry No. 16) by New York Orthodontic Group, PLLC (Brownlee, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
16 16 motion Pre Motion Conference Thu 02/17 10:08 PM
First MOTION for pre motion conference re1 Complaint,15 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, for leave to file Motion to Dismiss by Emanuel Mizrahi, D.D.S., P.C.. (Hawa, Laleh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Supreme Court Decision
Friday, February 04, 2022
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/04 10:27 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Emanuel Mizrahi, D.D.S., P.C. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to February 17, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/4/2022. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 02/03 5:42 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint stipulated by all parties by Emanuel Mizrahi, D.D.S., P.C.. (Hawa, Laleh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/25 1:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by New York Orthodontic Group, PLLC. Emanuel Mizrahi, D.D.S., P.C. served on 1/13/2022, answer due 2/3/2022. (Futterman, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/20 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle S. Futterman on behalf of New York Orthodontic Group, PLLC (aty to be noticed) (Futterman, Danielle)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/20 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry Brenae Brownlee on behalf of New York Orthodontic Group, PLLC (aty to be noticed) (Brownlee, Kerry)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/20 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ashly Erin Sands on behalf of New York Orthodontic Group, PLLC (aty to be noticed) (Sands, Ashly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Report Patent or Trademark AO120 Wed 01/05 11:11 AM
Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Rocco, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 complaint
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
8 8 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/04 4:24 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held by telephone in this case on April 8, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.) Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By April 1, 2022 , the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: [LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf] Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that Defendant is aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 1/4/2022. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 01/04 2:57 PM
Summons Issued as to Emanuel Mizrahi, D.D.S., P.C.. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 01/04 2:55 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 01/04 2:54 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 01/04 2:33 PM
Proposed Summons. by New York Orthodontic Group, PLLC (Drangel, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/04 2:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by New York Orthodontic Group, PLLC (Drangel, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 01/04 2:31 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by New York Orthodontic Group, PLLC (Drangel, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/04 2:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Emanuel Mizrahi, D.D.S., P.C. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15162280 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by New York Orthodontic Group, PLLC. (Drangel, Jason)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/04 2:54 PM
Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]