Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Susan K Lee
Referred: Susan K Lee
Case #: 1:22-cv-00005
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2022
Re-opened:Apr 29, 2022
Terminated:Aug 04, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jul 03, 2022 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Built By Logic, LLC
Represented By
Caroline Ross Williams
Hunter, Smith & Davis - Kingsport
contact info
Defendant
Janylyn Marks
Represented By
Caroline Ross Williams
Hunter, Smith & Davis - Kingsport
contact info
Plaintiff
Buffalo Lumber Company, Inc.
Represented By
Wesley Clark
Brazil Clark, PLLC
contact info
Frank Ross Brazil
Brazil Clark, PLLC
contact info

GPO Apr 29 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 30 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. The Clerk is DIRECTED to REOPEN this case. The parties are ORDERED to file a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) on or before June 27, 2022. If additional time is needed to file the required stipulation of dismissal, the parties may file a motion to request an extension. The parties are FOREWARNED the Court will NOT consider any requested extensions made after the June 27, 2022, deadline without a showing of substantial good cause.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 4/29/2022. (BJL)

Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Thursday, August 04, 2022
34 34 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/04 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case (Joint) by Buffalo Lumber Company, Inc. (Clark, Wesley)
Related: [-]
misc Public Docket Annotation Fri 08/05 8:31 AM
Case is Closed pursuant to34 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal of Case (Joint) by Buffalo Lumber Company, Inc. (BJL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 06/22 9:08 AM
Set Deadline: Status Report re: a stipulation of dismissal due by 8/4/2022 , pursuant to 33 TEXT ORDER. (BJL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 06/21 10:56 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties are ORDERED to file a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) on or before August 4, 2022. If additional time is needed to file the required stipulation of dismissal, the parties may file a motion to request an extension but they will be required to make a showing of extraordinary circumstances for any further extensions. If a stipulation of dismissal is not filed and an extension is not timely requested, the Court will dismiss this case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) and Local Rule 68.1 without further notice. This docket text entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court signed by United States Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee. (Lee, Susan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2022
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 06/20 11:00 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Buffalo Lumber Company, Inc.. (Clark, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment Fri 04/29 2:49 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 30 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. The Clerk is DIRECTED to REOPEN this case. The parties are ORDERED to file a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) on or before June 27, 2022. If additional time is needed to file the required stipulation of dismissal, the parties may file a motion to request an extension. The parties are FOREWARNED the Court will NOT consider any requested extensions made after the June 27, 2022, deadline without a showing of substantial good cause.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 4/29/2022. (BJL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2022
30 30 motion Set Aside Judgment Thu 04/28 4:32 PM
Joint MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by Buffalo Lumber Company, Inc.. (Clark, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
29 29 order Judgment Tue 04/26 8:46 AM
JUDGMENT ORDER: The April 21 deadline has passed and the parties have not filed a timely stipulation of dismissal or motion for an extension of the April 21 deadline. Accordingly, this action is hereby DISMISSED pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) and Local Rule 68.1. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 4/25/2022. ENTERED AS A JUDGMENT: by LeAnna R. Wilson, CLERK OF COURT. (BJL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
28 28 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 03/18 4:46 PM
ORDER: It is ORDERED that the parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal on or before April 21, 2022. If additional time is needed to file the required Stipulation of Dismissal, the parties may file a motion to request an extension. If a Stipulation of Dismissal is not filed and an extension is not requested timely, the Court will dismiss this case without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 3/18/2022. (BJL) Modified on 3/18/2022 (BJL)
Related: [-]
27 27 adr Report of Mediation Fri 03/18 3:32 PM
REPORT of Mediation (BJL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Settlement Fri 03/18 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Buffalo Lumber Company, Inc. Case Reported Settled By Attorney Wesley Clark; the parties participated in mediation. (BJL)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/11 8:21 AM
NOTICE CANCELLATION OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE The telephonic status conference in this matter previously scheduled to take place on Friday, February 11, 2022 at 5:00 p.m. [EASTERN] before U.S. Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee is CANCELLED. (BJL)
Related: [-]
25 25 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 02/11 8:18 AM
ORDER granting 23 Motion to Stay: All deadlines imposed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the local Rules for the Eastern District of Tennessee are hereby stayed until March 16, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 2/11/2022. (BJL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/09 1:10 PM
NOTICE by Buffalo Lumber Company, Inc. Notice of Filing(Brazil, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Staying Proceedings for ADR
23 23 motion Stay Wed 02/09 12:57 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for ADR by Buffalo Lumber Company, Inc.. (Brazil, Frank)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
22 22 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 02/07 2:26 PM
NOTICE TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 2/11/2022 05:00 PM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee. To access the telephonic status conference, the parties will dial 877-336-1274 and enteraccess code 7199789. Please call at least FIVE MINUTES in advance of the conference time. (DJH)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 02/04 4:28 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Emergency Temporary Restraining Order filed by Buffalo Lumber Company, Inc.. (Clark, Wesley)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Fri 02/04 3:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Status Conference held on 2/4/2022. Status conference was held in Chambers without a court reporter or courtroom deputy. (CNC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/03 5:32 PM
NOTICE TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE. A status conference will take place in this matter by telephone conference on Friday, February 4, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. [EASTERN] before U.S. Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee. To access the telephonic status conference, the parties will dial 877-336-1274 and enter access code 7199789. Please call at least FIVE MINUTES in advance of the conference time. (KRS)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Consent to Magistrate and Order of Reference Thu 02/03 4:58 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' Notice of Consent [Doc. 18], it is hereby ORDERED that this case be REFERRED to the Honorable Susan K. Lee, Chief United States Magistrate Judge, for all further proceedings and the entry of final judgment. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on February 3, 2022. (AYB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
18 18 notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Wed 02/02 2:00 PM
NOTICE OF CONSENT by Built By Logic, LLC, Janylyn Marks (Williams, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 31, 2022
17 17 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Mon 01/31 9:47 AM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/31/2022. (BJL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Consent/Non Consent
Friday, January 28, 2022
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/28 4:00 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Emergency Temporary Restraining Order filed by Built By Logic, LLC, Janylyn Marks.(Williams, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
15 15 10 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 01/28 3:45 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re14 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue and Forum Non Conveniens filed by Built By Logic, LLC, Janylyn Marks.(Williams, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
14 14 motion Dismiss Fri 01/28 3:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue and Forum Non Conveniens by Built By Logic, LLC, Janylyn Marks. (Williams, Caroline)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/28 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Ross Williams on behalf of Built By Logic, LLC, Janylyn Marks (Williams, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
12 12 misc Certificate of Corporate Interest Tue 01/11 8:57 AM
Certificate of Corporate Interest by Buffalo Lumber Company, Inc.. (Clark, Wesley)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Failure to File CCI Tue 01/11 8:36 AM
SECOND NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Buffalo Lumber Company, Inc.. (BJL)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
11 11 misc Patent and Trademark Notice Mon 01/10 9:48 AM
PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding 78790996 . (Clark, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
10 10 service Summons Issued Wed 01/05 1:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Built By Logic, LLC, Janylyn Marks. (BJL)
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Wed 01/05 12:59 PM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information, Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/5/2022. (BJL)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Wed 01/05 12:58 PM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss, Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/5/2022. (BJL)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Wed 01/05 12:58 PM
Order Governing Depositions, Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/5/2022. (BJL)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs notice Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac) Wed 01/05 12:54 PM
Administrative Notice to Counsel re:1 Complaint: requirements due by 1/10/2022 .(BJL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs AO 120 Report of Action re Trademark
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/05 8:56 AM
NOTICE by Buffalo Lumber Company, Inc. of filing Proposed Temporary Restraining Order(Clark, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Temporary Restraining Order
notice Notice of Failure to File CCI Wed 01/05 12:56 PM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Buffalo Lumber Company, Inc.. (BJL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
4 4 11 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 01/04 8:04 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Emergency Temporary Restraining Order filed by Buffalo Lumber Company, Inc.. (Clark, Wesley)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 01/04 8:02 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Emergency Temporary Restraining Order by Buffalo Lumber Company, Inc..(Clark, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Attorney Wesley Clark pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1),
Att: 2 Affidavit of Chris Buffaloe,
Att: 3 Affidavit of Graham Miller,
Att: 4 Affidavit of Natalie Krul
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/04 7:53 PM
NOTICE by Buffalo Lumber Company, Inc. (Civil Coversheet and Summons)(Clark, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Janylyn Marks,
Att: 2 Summons Built By Logic, LLC
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/04 7:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Built By Logic, LLC, Janylyn Marks ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4936054.), filed by Buffalo Lumber Company, Inc..(Clark, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit I - Nevada Corporate Filings,
Att: 2 Exhibit II - Feb 23i Minutes,
Att: 3 Exhibit III - Feb 23ii Minutes,
Att: 4 Exhibit IV - Subcontractor Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit V - Oct 20 Email Buffaloe to Marks,
Att: 6 Exhibit VI - Oct 23 Email Marks to Buffaloe,
Att: 7 Exhibit VII - Graham to Marks,
Att: 8 Exhibit VIII - Marks to Graham,
Att: 9 Exhibit IX - Nov 29 Email Krul to Marks,
Att: 10 Exhibit X - Nov 30 Email Marks to Krul,
Att: 11 Exhibit XI - Dec 17 Microsoft Alert,
Att: 12 Exhibit XII - Trademark Info
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 01/05 12:20 PM
District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BJL)
Related: [-]