Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Henry T Wingate
Referred: Lakeysha Greer Isaac
Case #: 3:22-cv-00002
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2022
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Case in other court:Madison County Circuit Court, MS, 45CI1:21-cv-322-JM
Last checked: Monday Jul 04, 2022 4:38 AM CDT
Defendant
John Does 1-5
Defendant
Geico Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By
Amber Lynn Kipfmiller
Jones Walker, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Kaytie M. Pickett
Jones Walker, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Adam Stone
Jones Walker, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By
Amber Lynn Kipfmiller
Jones Walker, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Kaytie M. Pickett
Jones Walker, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Adam Stone
Jones Walker, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Plaintiff
Sims Agency LLC
Represented By
William Polk Thomas
Butler Snow Llp-Ridgeland
contact info
Margaret Z. Smith
Butler Snow Llp-Ridgeland
contact info


Docket last updated: 63 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
82 82 appeal Transcript Request - Appeal Wed 05/07 7:44 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Sims Agency LLC Court Reporter/Transcriber Candice Crane, Telephone Number : 601-608-4187, E-mail : candice_crane@mssd.uscourts.gov. (Greenlee, Robert)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Sent to USCA Wed 05/07 12:10 PM
Electronically Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals in re80 Notice of Appeal. (ND)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
81 81 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 05/06 12:40 PM
USCA Letter to Robert V. Greenlee in re USCA Case Number 25-60226 for80 Notice of Appeal filed by Sims Agency LLC. (ND)
Related: [-]