Kansas District Court
Judge:John W Broomes
Referred: Angel D Mitchell
Case #: 6:22-cv-01004
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2022
Terminated:Jan 29, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 05, 2022 3:44 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Luis Alfaro
Represented By
David O. Alegria
The Law Office Of David O. Alegria
contact info
Counter Claimant
Jose Alvaro de Leon
Represented By
David O. Alegria
The Law Office Of David O. Alegria
contact info
Counter Claimant
Sergio Delgado
Represented By
David O. Alegria
The Law Office Of David O. Alegria
contact info
Counter Claimant
Los Cocos Mexican Restaurant, Inc.
Represented By
David O. Alegria
The Law Office Of David O. Alegria
contact info
Counter Defendant
United States Department of Labor
Represented By
Elaine M. Smith
Us Department Of Labor, Office Of The Solicitor
contact info
Traci Elizabeth Martin
U.S. Department Of Labor - Office Of The Solicitor - Kcmo
contact info
Defendant
Luis Alfaro
Represented By
David O. Alegria
The Law Office Of David O. Alegria
contact info
Defendant
Jose Alvaro de Leon
Represented By
David O. Alegria
The Law Office Of David O. Alegria
contact info
Defendant
Sergio Delgado
Represented By
David O. Alegria
The Law Office Of David O. Alegria
contact info
Defendant
Los Cocos Mexican Restaurant, Inc.
Represented By
David O. Alegria
The Law Office Of David O. Alegria
contact info
Plaintiff
United States Department of Labor
Represented By
Elaine M. Smith
Us Department Of Labor, Office Of The Solicitor
contact info
Traci Elizabeth Martin
U.S. Department Of Labor - Office Of The Solicitor - Kcmo
contact info

GPO Jun 16 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 6/16/2022. (sz)
GPO Nov 01 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 19 Motion for Judgment, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 11/1/2022. (ca)
GPO Nov 30 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 43 MOTION for extension of time to File Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/30/2022. (kas)
GPO Nov 17 2023
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 80) is hereby granted in part and denied in part, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, and judgment shall be entered in favor of Plaintiff on particular issues and claims accordingly. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. 83) is hereby denied. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 11/17/2023. (jal)
GPO Aug 28 2024
MEMORANDUM DECISION: This matter is before the court on Plaintiff's motion for partial summary. (Doc. 143.) On August 26, 2024 prior to the start of trial, the court granted Plaintiff's motion in part and denied it in part on the record. This order details the court's reasoning for that decision. The court also made rulings on evidentiary issues. (See order for details.) Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on August 28, 2024. (mls)
GPO Jan 29 2025
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND INJUNCTION. Plaintiff is awarded $974,057.83 in liquidated damages. Pursuant to section 17 of the FLSA, Defendants, their officers, agents, servants, and all persons acting or claiming to act on their behalf and interest are permanently enjoined and restrained from violating the provisions of sections 3(m)(2)(B), 6, 7, 11(c), 15(a)(2), 15(a)(3), and 15(a)(5) of the FLSA. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 1/29/2025. (mam)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
201 201 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 05/13 1:21 PM
ORDER granting200 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 05/13/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
200 200 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 05/12 10:15 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Luis Alfaro, Jose Alvaro de Leon, Sergio Delgado, Los Cocos Mexican Restaurant, Inc.(Alegria, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Counsel Affidavit,
Att: 2 Ex Certified Mail Return Receipts,
Att: 3 Ex Certified Mail Receipt