California Central District Court
Judge:Mark C Scarsi
Referred: Gail J Standish
Case #: 2:22-cv-00106
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2022
Re-opened:Jan 11, 2023
Terminated:Jul 12, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 05, 2022 1:33 AM PDT
Defendant
City of Azusa
Represented By
Mildred K O'Linn
Manning And Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Garros Chan
Manning And Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Officer R. Martinez
Represented By
Mildred K O'Linn
Manning And Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Garros Chan
Manning And Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph F. Iniguez
Represented By
Michael H Artan
Law Office Of Michael Artan PC
contact info
Glen T Jonas
Jonas And Driscoll LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
34 34 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 08/30 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Joseph F. Iniguez. (Artan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
33 33 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held Wed 07/12 3:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Order of Dismissal (JS6) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. re: Notice of Settlement32 . (smo)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Settlement Wed 07/12 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Of Entire Action filed by Defendants City of Azusa, R. Martinez(Officer of the Azusa Police Department), R. Martinez(an individual). (O'Linn, Mildred)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2023
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 06/19 8:55 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Garros Chan counsel for Defendants City of Azusa, R. Martinez, R. Martinez. Garros Chan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Officer R. Martinez and City of Azusa. (Chan, Garros)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
30 30 3 pgs order Order Thu 06/15 2:44 PM
ORDER DENYING THE STIPULATION FOR MODIFICATIONS TO THE CASE SCHEDULING ORDER28 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 06/14 3:04 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney G Craig Smith counsel for Defendants City of Azusa, R. Martinez, R. Martinez. Adding G. Craig Smith as counsel of record for OFFICER R. MARTINEZ, an individual and Officer of the Azusa Police Department, CITY OF AZUSA, a public entity for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants G. Craig Smith. (Attorney G Craig Smith added to party City of Azusa(pty:dft), Attorney G Craig Smith added to party R. Martinez(pty:dft), Attorney G Craig Smith added to party R. Martinez(pty:dft))(Smith, G)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
28 28 stip Continue Tue 06/13 2:14 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial from January 9, 2024 to May 8, 2024 Re: Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only23 filed by defendants City of Azusa, R. Martinez(Officer of the Azusa Police Department), R. Martinez(an individual).(Chan, Garros)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 09, 2023
27 27 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Thu 02/09 8:12 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Richard Copeland has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
26 26 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Wed 02/08 4:12 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Richard Copeland may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Defendants City of Azusa, R. Martinez, R. Martinez(Chan, Garros)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/11 4:16 PM
Notice Of Status Re Department Of Justice's Investigation filed by defendants City of Azusa, R. Martinez(Officer of the Azusa Police Department), R. Martinez(an individual). (Chan, Garros)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Wed 01/11 4:16 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than October 2, 2023. (smo)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Wed 01/11 4:13 PM
ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2023 at 2:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 1/9/2024 at 8:30 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. See document for additional pretrial dates and deadlines. (smo)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Case Reopened ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 01/11 4:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: On January 10, 2023, Plaintiff's counsel notified the Court that "the Department of Justice investigation... has concluded, with the governing statutes of limitationshaving expired."21 . Pursuant to the completion of the federal criminal investigation, the Court lifts the stay and directs the Clerk to reopen the case. Additionally, the Court has reviewed the parties' Rule 26(f) joint report and will issue a separate order setting the discovery schedule and trial date. (Case reopened. MD JS-5.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/10 4:43 PM
Notice Re Status of DOJ Investigation filed by plaintiff Joseph F. Iniguez. (Artan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
20 20 order Staying Case Wed 11/23 3:06 PM
ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION FOR FURTHER CONTINUANCE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING COMPLETION OF DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE INVESTIGATION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Pursuant to the Status Report and Joint Stipulation of the parties, and Good Cause appearing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Court hereby continues the stay of all proceedings in this matter including all non-expert and expert discovery, discovery and dispositive motions, and trial of the civil matter for 120 days or until the pending criminal investigation by the Department of Justice has been completed, whichever occurs first. Additionally, this matter shall remain removed from the active case calendar as previously ordered. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
19 19 stip Stay Case Tue 11/22 9:18 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Completion of Department of Justice Investigation filed by Defendants City of Azusa, R. Martinez(Officer of the Azusa Police Department), R. Martinez(an individual).(Chan, Garros)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 25, 2022
18 18 order Stipulation and Order Mon 07/25 12:19 PM
ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING COMPLETION OF DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE INVESTIGATION (ECF No.17 ) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Court hereby continues the stay of all proceedings in this matter including all non-expert and expert discovery, discovery and dispositive motions, and trial of the civil matter for 120 days or until the pending criminal investigation by the Department of Justice has been completed, whichever occurs first. Additionally, this matter shall remain removed from the active case calendar as previously ordered. See order for further details. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
17 17 stip Stay Case Fri 07/22 9:57 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Completion of Department of Justice Investigation filed by defendants City of Azusa, R. Martinez(Officer of the Azusa Police Department), R. Martinez(an individual).(Chan, Garros)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
16 16 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 03/29 3:10 PM
ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING COMPLETION OF DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE INVESTIGATION (ECF No.14 ) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Court hereby stays all further proceedings in this matter - including all non-expert and expert discovery, discovery and dispositive motions, and trial of the civil matter - for 120 days or until the pending criminal investigation by the Department of Justice has been completed, whichever occurs first. 2. If the criminal investigation is still ongoing after the expiration of 120 days from the entry of this order, the parties shall jointly issue a report to the Court on the status of the criminal investigation. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
15 15 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 03/28 1:55 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendants City of Azusa, R. Martinez, R. Martinez..(Chan, Garros)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet
14 14 stip Stay Case Mon 03/28 1:40 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending COMPLETION OF DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE INVESTIGATION filed by defendants City of Azusa, R. Martinez(Officer of the Azusa Police Department), R. Martinez(an individual).(O'Linn, Mildred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
13 13 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 02/16 3:31 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 02/16 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants City of Azusa, R. Martinez(Officer of the Azusa Police Department), R. Martinez(an individual), identifying 1. JOSEPH F. INIGUEZ (Plaintiff); 2. OFFICER R. MARTINEZ (Defendant); and 3. CITY OF AZUSA (Defendant). (Attorney Garros Chan added to party City of Azusa(pty:dft), Attorney Garros Chan added to party R. Martinez(pty:dft), Attorney Garros Chan added to party R. Martinez(pty:dft))(Chan, Garros)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/16 1:47 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition10 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendants City of Azusa, R. Martinez(Officer of the Azusa Police Department), R. Martinez(an individual).(Attorney Mildred K O'Linn added to party City of Azusa(pty:dft), Attorney Mildred K O'Linn added to party R. Martinez(pty:dft), Attorney Mildred K O'Linn added to party R. Martinez(pty:dft))(O'Linn, Mildred)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
10 10 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Wed 01/12 4:28 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Joseph F. Iniguez(Artan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 01/10 4:03 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants City of Azusa, R. Martinez(Officer of the Azusa Police Department), R. Martinez(an individual). (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 01/10 3:29 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 01/10 3:22 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 01/10 3:22 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 01/10 3:21 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 01/06 10:51 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Joseph F. Iniguez. (Artan, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 01/06 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joseph F. Iniguez, (Artan, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 01/06 10:37 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph F. Iniguez. (Artan, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 01/06 10:34 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32577249 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Joseph F. Iniguez. (Attorney Michael H Artan added to party Joseph F. Iniguez(pty:pla))(Artan, Michael)
Related: [-]