California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:22-bk-10061
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
12th & K St. Mall Partners, LLC
4910 W 1st St
Los Angeles, CA 90004-3944
Represented By
Matthew D. Resnik
Resnik Hayes Moradi
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Ron Maroko
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/05/2022 4:00 PM PST
Thursday, January 06, 2022
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 01/06 1:10 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:22-bk-10061] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A53772140. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Thu 01/06 2:41 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Related [+] Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 1/20/2022. (Lewis, Litaun)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 12th & K St. Mall Partners, LLC
1 1 17 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 01/06 1:09 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by 12th & K St. Mall Partners, LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 01/20/2022. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/20/2022. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/20/2022. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/20/2022. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/20/2022. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/20/2022. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 01/20/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/20/2022. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 01/20/2022. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 01/20/2022. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/20/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 01/20/2022. Related [+]
Related: [-] snik, Matthew
2 2 misc Deficiency Notice (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (manual - def) (BNC) Thu 01/06 2:51 PM
Notice of Case Deficiency Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 1007 (BNC) to include deficiency re: List of Equity Security Holders due 01/20/2022. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/20/2022. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/20/2022. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/20/2022. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/20/2022. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/20/2022. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 01/20/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/20/2022 Related [+] (Lewis, Litaun)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 12th & K St. Mall Partners, LLC
3 3 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Thu 01/06 2:52 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Debtor(s) street address was entered in the system instead of the mailing address. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (Lewis, Litaun)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 12th & K St. Mall Partners, LLC