Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-00239
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2022
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 05, 2022 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JASON ARNHART
Represented By
BUFFY K MARTINES
Laminack Pirtle & Martines - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 06, 2022
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/12 6:55 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (lsd)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/10 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BUFFY K MARTINES on behalf of JASON ARNHART (MARTINES, BUFFY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 01/06 1:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MARTINES, BUFFY)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/06 1:30 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6614131.), filed by JASON ARNHART. (MARTINES, BUFFY)
Related: [-]