Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Marc T Treadwell
Case #: 5:18-cv-00382
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2018
Last checked: Friday Jan 07, 2022 10:09 PM EST
Defendant
ECLINICAL WORKS LLC
Represented By
JULIA B STONE
Caplan Cobb
contact info
JAMES W COBB
contact info
Plaintiff
ALEX PERMENTER
Represented By
MARY BETH HAND
Adams Law Firm
contact info
RAMSEY B PRATHER
contact info
BRIAN P ADAMS
contact info
BRANDON LEE PEAK
contact info
RORY A WEEKS
contact info
ROBERT H SNYDER
contact info
Plaintiff
ERIC RODIGHIERO
Represented By
MARY BETH HAND
Adams Law Firm
contact info
RAMSEY B PRATHER
contact info
BRIAN P ADAMS
contact info
BRANDON LEE PEAK
contact info
RORY A WEEKS
contact info
ROBERT H SNYDER
contact info
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
TODD P SWANSON
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRIS WHEELER
Represented By
MARY BETH HAND
Adams Law Firm
contact info
RAMSEY B PRATHER
contact info
BRIAN P ADAMS
contact info
BRANDON LEE PEAK
contact info
RORY A WEEKS
contact info
ROBERT H SNYDER
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2022
ORDER DENYING 49 Motion to Transfer Case. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 3/28/2022. (kat)
GPO Dec 06 2022
ORDER DENYING 69 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; GRANTING 86 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Evidence in Opposition to ECW's Motion to Dismiss. The relators shall file their second amended complaint, submitting their revised paragraph 104, by December 16, 2022. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 12/6/2022. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1 - Relators' Proposed Redlines to Paragraph 104). (kat) Text modified on 12/6/2022 to change attachment text from exhibit to attachment (kat).
GPO Aug 10 2023
ORDER granting 115 Consent Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 08/10/2023 (elp) Title of order modified on 8/11/2023 (kat).

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
329 329 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Tue 05/06 9:14 AM
***TIME CHANGE ONLY*** NOTICE OF RESETTING HEARING ON MOTIONS re205 MOTION in Limine regarding Relators Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Kyle Meadors,209 MOTION in Limine regarding Relators Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Oren Wortman,201 MOTION in Limine regarding Relators Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Lisa J. Pino,193 MOTION in Limine regarding Certain Putative Expert Opinions of Eric Cole, Ph.D.,195 MOTION in Limine regarding Certain Putative Expert Opinions of Relators Christopher Wheeler and Eric Rodighiero,297 MOTION to Exclude Relators' Second Supplemental Response and Objections to Defendant eClinicalWorks' Amended First Interrogatories,207 MOTION in Limine regarding Relators' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Laurence Baker and David Grabowski,211 MOTION in Limine regarding Relators Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Nainil Chheda,191 MOTION in Limine regarding the Opinions of Emily Wolfston,213 MOTION in Limine regarding Relators' Omnibus Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Putative Experts Su Kim, Dr. Jamie Skipper and Sean M. Weiss,199 MOTION in Limine regarding the Opinions of Mr. Michael Arrigo,203 MOTION in Limine regarding Relators Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Bryson Bort,197 MOTION in Limine regarding Relators' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Robert Knake. Motion Hearing RESET for 6/4/2025 at 9:30 AM in Macon before US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL. (kat)
Related: [-]