Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:22-cv-00011
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 06, 2022 3:48 AM CDT
Defendant
Bright Data Ltd.
Represented By
Ronald Wielkopolski
Cherian LLP
contact info
Gregory Blake Thompson
Mann Tindel & Thompson
contact info
Robert M Harkins, Jr
Cherian LLP
contact info
Elizabeth L DeRieux
Capshaw Derieux LLP
contact info
Colby Alexander Davis
Allen & Overy LLP
contact info
Stephanie R Wood
Cherian LLP
contact info
James Mark Mann
Mann Tindel & Thompson
contact info
Korula T Cherian
Ruyakcherian Llp - Berkley
contact info
Thomas M Dunham
Cherian LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Metacluster LT, UAB
Represented By
George T Scott
Charhon, Callahan, Robson & Garza PLLC
contact info
Brett Christopher Govett
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Christopher Thor Bovenkamp
Charhon, Callahan, Robson & Garza PLLC
contact info
Michael Charles Smith
Scheef & Stone, Llp - Marshall
contact info
Steven Chase Callahan
Charhon, Callahan, Robson & Garza PLLC
contact info
Daniel S Leventhal
Norton Rose Fulbright Us Llp - Houston
contact info
Mitchell Reed Sibley
Charhon, Callahan, Robson & Garza PLLC
contact info
John Charles Heuton
Charhon, Callahan, Robson & Garza PLLC
contact info

GPO Dec 20 2022
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 32 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO DISMISS METACLUSTER'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Bright Data Ltd., 47 MOTION for Sanctions PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. RULE 11 filed by Bright Data Ltd... Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/19/2022. (nkl, )
GPO Jan 25 2023
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 81 Report and Recommendations. Court OVERRULES Bright Data Ltd.s objections, ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation, and ORDERS that the Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement (Dkt. No. 32) and the Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 (Dkt. No. 47) are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/25/2023. (ch, )
GPO Mar 07 2024
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 114 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Metacluster LT, UAB. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/7/2024. (ch, )

Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
349 349 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/30 12:46 PM
ORDER Extending Stay- Status Conference set for 7/30/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 04/29/2025. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
348 348 misc Status Report Mon 04/28 4:18 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (JOINT NOTICE REGARDING MAY 1, 2025 STATUS CONFERENCE) by Metacluster LT, UAB. (Callahan, Steven)
Related: [-]