Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referred: Julie S Sneed
Case #: 8:22-cv-00065
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2022
Terminated:Feb 24, 2022
Case in other court:Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, Hillsborough County, 21-CC-115597
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 06, 2022 5:02 AM EDT
Defendant
Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Dayle Marie Van Hoose
Sessions, Israel & Shartle LLC
contact info
Michael Schuette
Sessions, Israel & Shartle LLC
contact info
Defendant
Pendrick Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By
Dayle Marie Van Hoose
Sessions, Israel & Shartle LLC
contact info
Michael Schuette
Sessions, Israel & Shartle LLC
contact info
Mediator
Gregory P. Holder
Represented By
Gregory P. Holder
Zinober Diana And Monteverde PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Hatem Ali
Represented By
Thomas Martin Bonan
Seraph Legal P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, February 24, 2022
21 21 order *Order no pdf Thu 02/24 2:11 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: On the basis of the Notice of Settlement (Doc. # 20 ), this cause is hereby dismissed, without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within 60 days of the date hereof, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or request an extension of time, should they so choose or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause being shown. After that 60 day period, however, without further order, this dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice. Furthermore, the Court advises the parties that "good cause" exists to reopen an action when a settlement agreement has yet to be finalized because of various delays. But incomplete performance of an executed settlement agreement, such as the failure to disburse settlement funds, does not constitute good cause to reopen an action. This Court does not retain jurisdiction to ensure performance of a settlement agreement because such failure to perform should be addressed in a separate breach of contract action. The Clerk is directed to terminate any previously scheduled deadlines and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/24/2022. (DMD)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of settlement Thu 02/24 1:04 PM
NOTICE of settlement pending by Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc., Pendrick Capital Partners, LLC (Schuette, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 31, 2022
19 19 order *Order no pdf Mon 01/31 12:04 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to the amended notice of mediation (Doc. # 18 ), the parties' April 22, 2022 in-person mediation will now begin at 1:30pm. All rules outlined in the order appointing mediator (Doc. # 17 ) still apply. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/31/2022. (DMD)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Mon 01/31 11:04 AM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on April 22, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. before Gregory P. Holder.(Schuette, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
17 17 3 pgs order Order Thu 01/27 8:08 AM
ORDER appointing Gregory Holder as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for April 22, 2022, at 9:00 AM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/27/2022. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Wed 01/26 4:13 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on April 22, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. before Gregory P. Holder.(Schuette, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/26 2:23 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting the joint motion to extend the mediation deadline. (Doc. # 14 ). The mediation deadline is now April 22, 2022. Notice of mediation due January 26, 2022. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/26/2022. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 01/24 6:14 PM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Extend Mediation Deadline by Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc., Pendrick Capital Partners, LLC. (Schuette, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 01/14 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael Schuette on behalf of Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc., Pendrick Capital Partners, LLC. Lead Counsel: Michael P. Schuette. (Schuette, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 01/14 11:48 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc., Pendrick Capital Partners, LLC. Related case(s): No (Schuette, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/14 11:47 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Pendrick Capital Partners, LLC. (Schuette, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/14 11:45 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Pendrick Capital Partners, LLC.(Schuette, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/14 11:42 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc. (Schuette, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/14 11:42 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc. (Schuette, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
7 7 order Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order Tue 01/11 3:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are directed to adhere to the Court's Scheduling Order. This action is hereby referred to Gregory P. Holder, Esq., for mediation. The parties must mediate no later than April 11, 2022. Lead Counsel shall file a notice of mediation informing the Court as to the date, time, and location of mediation by January 24, 2022. Neither party may reschedule or cancel the mediation conference once it is set; leave of Court must be obtained before the mediation conference may be rescheduled or cancelled. The parties shall not mediate until the information exchange outlined in the Scheduling Order is completed. Absent compelling circumstances and leave of Court, lead counsel must appear at the mediation conference. Lead Counsel shall file a notice informing the Court as to the results of mediation within 24 hours of the mediation conference. In the event mediation results in an impasse, the parties must file their jointly-prepared fast-track case management report within 24 hours of the mediation conference. Upon review of the jointly-prepared case management report, the Court will determine whether a case management hearing is necessary. If a case management hearing is necessitated, the Court will set the hearing by separate notice. Furthermore, if mediation results in an impasse, the Court intends to schedule this action for trial within 90-120 days from the mediation conference. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/10/2022. (TWL)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 01/10 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 01/10 8:54 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 01/10 8:53 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 01/10 8:52 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/07 1:01 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:22-cv-0065-VMC-JSS. (SJB)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 01/07 12:24 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 21-CC-115597 filed in State Court on 12/1/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19097320 filed by Pendrick Capital Partners, LLC, Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc..(Schuette, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet