Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen J Murphy, III
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:22-cv-10042
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2022
Terminated:Jun 21, 2022
Case in other court:Oakland County Circuit Court, 21-191037-CB
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 06, 2022 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
TG Missouri Corporation
Represented By
Katherine Lynn Pullen
Warner Norcross & Judd LLP
contact info
Homayune A. Ghaussi
Warner Norcoss Judd LLP
contact info
Zainab Sabbagh Hazimi
Warner Norcross & Judd LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lawrence Automotive Interiors, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas R. Waelchli
Waelchli Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, July 11, 2022
19 19 1 pgs order Order Mon 07/11 9:29 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case with Prejudice re18 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 07/08 1:34 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lawrence Automotive Interiors, Inc. (Waelchli, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
17 17 order Dismissing Case Tue 06/21 12:15 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without Prejudice, ( Closing Documents due by 7/22/2022 ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
16 16 order Stipulation and Order Mon 04/25 1:22 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Scheduling Order Dates re12 Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
15 15 2 pgs order Order Mon 04/04 12:10 PM
ORDER Referring Parties to Mediator. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
14 14 misc Report - Free Fri 04/01 10:03 AM
Joint Status REPORT by Lawrence Automotive Interiors, Inc. (Waelchli, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/14 9:36 AM
ORDER Requiring Joint Status Report, ( JSR due by 4/1/2022 ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
12 12 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/26 10:34 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/1/2022 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/30/2022 , Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2023 02:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III , Jury Trial set for 4/18/2023 09:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III . Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. Related [+] (DPar)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 01/26 10:30 AM
Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III: Scheduling Conference held on 1/26/2022. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (DPar)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
11 11 notice Appearance Fri 01/21 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Lynn Pullen on behalf of TG Missouri Corporation. (Pullen, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
10 10 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Thu 01/20 3:16 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Waelchli, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Jury Demand Thu 01/20 3:11 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs (Waelchli, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
8 8 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Thu 01/13 12:47 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Waelchli, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
7 7 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Wed 01/12 10:28 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by TG Missouri Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Toyoda Gosei Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Mitsui & Co. Ltd for TG Missouri Corporation. (Ghaussi, Homayune)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
6 6 notice Change of Address/Contact Information Mon 01/10 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Thomas R. Waelchli on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Waelchli, Thomas)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Mon 01/10 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Waelchli on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Waelchli, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
4 4 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/07 4:09 PM
ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference via ZOOM, ( Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Appearance Fri 01/07 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zainab Sabbagh Hazimi on behalf of TG Missouri Corporation. (Hazimi, Zainab)
Related: [-]
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/07 2:07 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by TG Missouri Corporation. (Ghaussi, Homayune)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Notice of Removal Fri 01/07 2:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TG Missouri Corporation from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2021-191037-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8747361 - Fee: $ 402 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Ghaussi, Homayune)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 29 pgs Exhibit A