Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Referred: Alicia O Valle
Case #: 0:22-cv-60052
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause07:2023a Food Stamp Program
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2022
Terminated:Jan 20, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 06, 2022 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Kelsi R. Romero
contact info
Mediator
Steven R Jaffe
Upchurch Watson White & Max 900 South Pine Island Road Suite 410
Plantation, FL 33324
Plaintiff
Neil W. Rodin
Represented By
Andrew Zachary Tapp
contact info
Plaintiff
American Gold Label Foods, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Zachary Tapp
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, March 14, 2024
47 47 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment Order on Motion to Reopen Case Thu 03/14 10:53 AM
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REOPEN CASE. ORDER denying as moot37 Motion to Enforce Judgment; denying35 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/14/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
34 34 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 01/23 10:31 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case / Closing Case. (With Prejudice) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 1/20/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Fri 01/20 11:33 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by American Gold Label Foods, Inc., Neil W. Rodin (Tapp, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
32 32 2 pgs adr Mediation Report Wed 12/28 12:38 PM
MEDIATOR'S NOTICE OF ADJOURNMENT by James R. Betts. Disposition: Adjourned.(ebz)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
31 31 3 pgs trial Witness List Fri 12/09 1:40 PM
Witness List Defendant's by United States of America.. (Romero, Kelsi)
Related: [-]
30 30 4 pgs trial Witness List Fri 12/09 11:03 AM
Witness List Plaintiffs' Witness List by American Gold Label Foods, Inc., Neil W. Rodin.. (Tapp, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/21 2:34 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting28 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Hold Mediation Via Zoom. The parties may attend the December 19, 2022 mediation via Zoom. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/21/2022. (cbn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
28 28 4 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 11/17 10:20 AM
Unopposed MOTION Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Hold Mediation Via Zoom by American Gold Label Foods, Inc., Neil W. Rodin. (Tapp, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
27 27 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 11/08 4:17 PM
ORDER: ORDERED that the parties' Stipulation to Hold Mediation Via Zoom [DE 26], which the Court deems a motion, is DENIED. All parties shall appear at mediation in person. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Stipulation Tue 11/08 2:23 PM
STIPULATION to Hold Mediation Via Zoom by American Gold Label Foods, Inc., Neil W. Rodin (Tapp, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
25 25 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Fri 10/28 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Amended Stipulation-Notice of Selection of Mediator Selected/Added James Betts as Mediator. (Tapp, Andrew)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/28 9:16 AM
NOTICE by American Gold Label Foods, Inc., Neil W. Rodin re19 Stipulation,21 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Notice of Cancellation of Mediation (Tapp, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
23 23 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective/Confidentiality Order Thu 07/21 5:34 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 7/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (sd01)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
22 22 motion Protective/Confidentiality Order Fri 07/01 1:31 PM
MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated Protective Order by American Gold Label Foods, Inc., Neil W. Rodin. (Tapp, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
21 21 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Thu 06/02 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Notice of Mediation Selected/Added Steven R Jaffe as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 11/9/2022 at 10:00 a.m.. (Jaffe, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
19 19 misc Stipulation Tue 05/31 4:47 PM
STIPULATION re18 Order Referring Case to Mediation Stipulation - Notice of Selection of Mediator by American Gold Label Foods, Inc., Neil W. Rodin (Tapp, Andrew)
Related: [-]
notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Wed 06/01 11:32 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re19 Stipulation. Mediator Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional mediator. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 05/16 2:53 PM
Reset Hearing re: DE17 **TIME CORRECTION** Jury Trial set for 6/20/2023 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith. (mf)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
18 18 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 05/09 12:54 PM
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Mediation Deadline 1/6/2023. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 05/09 12:51 PM
ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 6/20/2020 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 6/13/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 5/13/2022., Expert Discovery due by 12/30/2022., Fact Discovery due by 12/30/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 5/13/2022., Mediation Deadline 1/6/2023., In Limine Motions due by 5/12/2023., Dispositive Motions due by 1/20/2023., Motions due by 5/12/2023., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/12/2023.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
16 16 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Wed 04/06 9:21 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by American Gold Label Foods, Inc., Neil W. Rodin(Tapp, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order Setting Civil Trial Date and Pretrial Schedule
15 15 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/06 9:11 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement of Plaintiffs by American Gold Label Foods, Inc., Neil W. Rodin identifying Other Affiliate United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service for American Gold Label Foods, Inc., Neil W. Rodin (Tapp, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
14 14 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/05 4:35 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States of America identifying Other Affiliate USDA, Other Affiliate Food and Nutrition Service for United States of America (Romero, Kelsi)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/05 9:14 AM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States of America (Romero, Kelsi)
Related: [-]
notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Tue 04/05 4:03 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered ; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
11 11 7 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/21 3:16 PM
DEFENDANTS ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by United States of America. Attorney Kelsi R. Romero added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Romero, Kelsi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
10 10 7 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Thu 03/10 12:33 PM
ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 4/8/2022 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
9 9 service Certificate of Service Tue 03/08 6:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Gold Label Foods, Inc., Neil W. Rodin re1 Complaint,5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement,4 Notice of Attorney Appearance,6 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion for Preliminary Injunction , 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment,, Notice and Certificate of Service(Tapp, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-PS Form(s) 3811
8 8 2 pgs service Summons (Affidavit) Returned EXECUTED AS TO USA DFTS Tue 03/08 6:56 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by American Gold Label Foods, Inc., Neil W. Rodin. United States of America served on 1/18/2022, response/answer due 3/21/2022.(Tapp, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Service
Thursday, January 27, 2022
7 7 1 pgs misc Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Thu 01/27 10:49 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by American Gold Label Foods, Inc., Neil W. Rodin re6 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by American Gold Label Foods, Inc., Neil W. Rodin Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of Expedited Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Tapp, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
6 6 3 pgs motion Expedite Preliminary Injunction Fri 01/21 2:33 PM
MOTION to Expedite , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion for Preliminary Injunction by American Gold Label Foods, Inc., Neil W. Rodin.(Tapp, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit List,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Exhibit G,
Att: 10 Exhibit H,
Att: 11 Exhibit I,
Att: 12 Exhibit J,
Att: 13 Exhibit K,
Att: 14 Exhibit L
Friday, January 07, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/07 4:53 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by American Gold Label Foods, Inc., Neil W. Rodin (Tapp, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 01/07 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Zachary Tapp on behalf of American Gold Label Foods, Inc., Neil W. Rodin (Tapp, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 01/07 4:32 PM
Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(ebz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Summon(s)
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/07 3:36 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15301144, filed by American Gold Label Foods, Inc., a Florida Corporation, Neil W. Rodin.(Tapp, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 16 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summon(s) Proposed Summons-US Attorney's Office-Southern District of Florida,
Att: 5 Summon(s) Proposed Summons-Attorney General of the United States,
Att: 6 Summon(s) Proposed Summons-USDA-FNS
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 01/07 4:26 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
Related: [-]