California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:22-cv-00171
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2022
Terminated:Jun 14, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 06, 2022 1:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Symphonic Distribution, Inc.
Represented By
David Aronoff
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Joshua Aryeh-Lev Bornstein
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Danmark Music Group, Ltd.
Represented By
Timothy M Baumann
Russ August And Kabat LLP
contact info
Larry C Russ
Russ August And Kabat
contact info
Irene Y Lee
Russ August And Kabat
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen Romina Mendez Moltoni
Represented By
Timothy M Baumann
Russ August And Kabat LLP
contact info
Larry C Russ
Russ August And Kabat
contact info
Irene Y Lee
Russ August And Kabat
contact info
Plaintiff
Spanra APS
Represented By
Timothy M Baumann
Russ August And Kabat LLP
contact info
Larry C Russ
Russ August And Kabat
contact info
Irene Y Lee
Russ August And Kabat
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
20 20 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Tue 06/14 3:53 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lom)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
19 19 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 06/14 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Danmark Music Group, Ltd.. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Baumann, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
18 18 misc Settlement Agreement Fri 06/10 12:31 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (Notice of) filed by Defendant Symphonic Distribution, Inc.. (Aronoff, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
17 17 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/03 4:58 PM
ORDER RE SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (DKT.16 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Based on a review of the parties Second Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendants Time to Respond to Initial Complaint (the Stipulation (Dkt. 16)), sufficient good cause has been shown for the requested relief. Therefore, the Stipulation is APPROVED. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to June 27, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
16 16 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Fri 04/29 2:35 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 27, 2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Symphonic Distribution, Inc..(Aronoff, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 07, 2022
15 15 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Thu 04/07 1:20 PM
ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (DKT.14 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is APPROVED. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before 5/27/2022. (jp)
Related: [-]
14 14 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Thu 04/07 7:46 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5/27/22 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Symphonic Distribution, Inc..(Aronoff, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 10, 2022
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 03/10 4:00 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Symphonic Distribution, Inc. answer now due 4/27/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Waiver of Service Executed12 filed by Defendant Symphonic Distribution, Inc..(Attorney David Aronoff added to party Symphonic Distribution, Inc.(pty:dft))(Aronoff, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 02/02 9:40 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Danmark Music Group, Ltd.. upon Symphonic Distribution, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/26/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. Waiver of Service signed by David Aronoff. (Baumann, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 01/14 10:31 AM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (vv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
10 10 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Thu 01/13 4:53 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-00171 JAK(MARx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 01/12 3:16 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Symphonic Distribution, Inc. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 01/11 2:19 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 01/11 2:19 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 01/11 2:18 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
5 5 notice Summons Request Fri 01/07 5:33 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Danmark Music Group, Ltd., a UK private limited company, et al.. (Baumann, Timothy)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Fri 01/07 5:27 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Danmark Music Group, Ltd., a UK private limited company, et al.. (Baumann, Timothy)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 01/07 5:25 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Danmark Music Group, Ltd., a UK private limited company, et al., (Baumann, Timothy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 01/07 5:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Danmark Music Group, Ltd., a UK private limited company, et al.. (Baumann, Timothy)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 01/07 5:10 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32590465 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Danmark Music Group, Ltd., a UK private limited company, et al.. (Attorney Timothy M Baumann added to party Danmark Music Group, Ltd., a UK private limited company, et al.(pty:pla))(Baumann, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E