New York Southern District Court
Judge:Sarah L Cave
Referred: Sarah L Cave
Case #: 1:22-cv-00175
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2sx Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 06, 2022 5:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
Represented By
Mollie Melissa Kornreich
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Christine Barnes
Represented By
Edward Michael Tobin
Ballon Stoll
contact info
Marshall Benjamin Bellovin
Ballon, Stoll, Bader And Nadler
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
U.S. Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration
Terminated: 05/02/2022
Represented By
Mollie Melissa Kornreich
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
96 96 order Memo Endorsement Tue 04/29 10:48 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:95 Letter Case Status filed by Merrick B. Garland. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' request at ECF No. 95 is GRANTED, and the stay of discovery is EXTENDED to Friday, May 9, 2025, by which date the parties shall file a further status letter or stipulation of dismissal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave on 4/29/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
95 95 misc Letter Mon 04/28 1:53 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Mollie Kornreich dated April 28, 2025 re: Case Status. Document filed by Merrick B. Garland..(Kornreich, Mollie)
Related: [-]