Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation v. Melendez et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia M Hernandez Covington |
Referred: | Julie S Sneed |
Case #: | 8:22-cv-00080 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 08, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 09, 2022 5:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
Harley Busse
|
|
Defendant
Michelle Melendez
|
|
Plaintiff
Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, July 08, 2022 | ||
order
*Order no pdf
Fri 07/08 8:12 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). The Clerk shall terminate any pending motions or deadlines and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/8/2022. (SGM) |
||
Thursday, July 07, 2022 | ||
42 | 42
notice
Notice of voluntary dismissal
Thu 07/07 1:44 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation (Bishop, Carol) |
|
Tuesday, June 21, 2022 | ||
41 | 41
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 06/21 9:45 AM
NOTICE by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation of Pending Settlement and Motion to Stay Action and/or Time for Filing Motion for Final Default Judgement as To Defendant Michelle Melendez (Bishop, Carol) |
|
Monday, June 13, 2022 | ||
40 | 40
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Service by Publication
Mon 06/13 1:49 PM
ORDER: The Second Motion to Extend Time for Service of Process as to Defendant Harley Busse and for Permission to Serve by Publication, filed by Plaintiff Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation (Doc. # 37 ) is GRANTED. The Plaintiff has until September 8, 2022, in which to effect service of process by publication upon Defendant Harley Busse in accordance with the requirements of this Order and the applicable Florida Statutes. Plaintiff must file proof of publication in accordance with Florida law. The Court approves and hereby directs the Clerk to issue the Notice of Action forthwith. The Court directs Plaintiff to inform the Clerk once the first date of publication occurs. The Court directs the Clerk to then fill in the appropriate date on the Notice and thereafter mail a copy of the Notice of Action and the Amended Complaint (Doc. # 14) to Mr. Busse at 4304 E. Regnas Avenue, Tampa, Florida 33617, and note the date of mailing on the docket.Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/13/2022. (SGM) |
|
Thursday, June 02, 2022 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Affidavit
Thu 06/02 3:24 PM
AFFIDAVIT Non-Return of Service for Defendant, Harley Busse by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation.(Bishop, Carol) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Return of Non-Service of Harley Busse | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 06/02 9:32 AM
NOTICE by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation of Action (Bishop, Carol) |
|
37 | 37
motion
Service by Publication
Thu 06/02 9:30 AM
Verified MOTION for Service by Publication by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation. (Bishop, Carol) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Affidavit
Thu 06/02 9:23 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Kendall Mabry in Support of Request for Service by Publication by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation. (Bishop, Carol) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2022 | ||
35 | 35
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 05/24 11:36 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michelle Melendez (BES) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2022 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Declaration
Mon 05/23 10:55 AM
DECLARATION of Counsel by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation. (Bishop, Carol) |
|
33 | 33
motion
Clerks Default
Mon 05/23 10:55 AM
Proposed MOTION for Clerk's Default against Michelle Melendez by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation.(Bishop, Carol) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Counsel | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 05/23 10:06 AM
NOTICE by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation(Bishop, Carol) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Compliance with the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act | ||
Thursday, May 05, 2022 | ||
31 | 31
service
Proof of service
Thu 05/05 11:22 AM
PROOF of service by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation(Mabry, Kendall) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit | ||
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
30 | 30
service
Summons issued
Thu 04/21 3:36 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Michelle Melendez. (BES) |
|
29 | 29
service
Proposed summons
Thu 04/21 11:04 AM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation. (Mabry, Kendall) |
|
Friday, April 01, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 04/01 3:35 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time for Service of Process (Doc. # 27 ). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), the Court will grant Plaintiff an additional 60 days in which to effect service of process on the Defendants. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/1/2022. (SGM) |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time to File
Thu 03/31 3:55 PM
Verified MOTION for Extension of Time to File for Service of Process by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation.(Mabry, Kendall) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
26 | 26
service
Summons returned unexecuted
Thu 03/31 3:43 PM
SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation as to Harley Busse. (BES) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/31 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Non-Service for Harley Busse by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation(Mabry, Kendall) Modified on 3/31/2022 (BES) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Thursday, March 10, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
service
Summons issued
Thu 03/10 10:10 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Harley Busse. (BES) |
|
23 | 23
service
Summons issued
Thu 03/10 10:10 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Michelle Melendez. (BES) |
|
Wednesday, March 09, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
service
Proposed summons
Wed 03/09 8:33 AM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation. (Bishop, Carol) |
|
21 | 21
service
Proposed summons
Wed 03/09 8:32 AM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation. (Bishop, Carol) |
|
20 | 20
service
Summons returned unexecuted
Wed 03/09 8:29 AM
SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation as to Harley Busse. (Bishop, Carol) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/09 8:28 AM
NOTICE by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation of Filing Verified Non-Return of Service as to Harley Busse (Bishop, Carol) |
|
18 | 18
service
Summons returned unexecuted
Wed 03/09 8:27 AM
SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation as to Michelle Melendez. (Bishop, Carol) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/09 8:25 AM
NOTICE by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation of Filing Verified Non-Return of Service as to Michelle Melendez (Bishop, Carol) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Status report
Wed 03/02 1:27 PM
STATUS report on Efforts to Effect Service of Process on Defendants by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation. (Mabry, Kendall) |
|
Tuesday, March 01, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Tue 03/01 1:10 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff filed the instant lawsuit on January 10, 2022. (Doc. # 1). To date, Plaintiff has not filed any documents evidencing proof of service of process on either Defendant. Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to file, by March 8, 2022, a status report explaining its efforts to effect service of process in this case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/1/2022. (SGM) |
|
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 03/01 9:04 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation.(Bishop, Carol) Modified on 3/1/2022 (BES) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Friday, January 14, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Amended document (NOT Motion)
Fri 01/14 2:32 PM
AMENDED document by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation. Amendment to1 Complaint - Amended Exhibit A . (Bishop, Carol) |
|
Wednesday, January 12, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 01/12 8:25 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Carol M. Bishop on behalf of Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation. Lead Counsel: Carol M. Bishop. (Bishop, Carol) |
|
Tuesday, January 11, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons issued
Tue 01/11 10:32 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Harley Busse, Michelle Melendez. (BD) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 01/11 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 01/11 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 01/11 10:14 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 01/11 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 01/11 10:14 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: The Court is aware of the notice entered in this case, explaining that Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the filing of a uniform case management report with forty or seventy days, depending on the circumstances of the case. However, under Local Rule 1.01(b), a judge can modify or suspend for all or part of an action the application of any rule, except Rule 1.05(a). This Court finds it beneficial to enter a fast-track scheduling order in certain categories of cases before entry of a case management and scheduling order. Additionally, in cases that are not fast-tracked, this Court finds it efficient to have the parties confer and file case management reports within 14 days after the defendant's responsive pleading is due or within 14 days after a case is removed to this Court. In light of this, the Court hereby suspends Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) in this case. At a time the Court deems appropriate, the Court will enter a further order in this case setting either a deadline to file a completed uniform case management report or various fast-track deadlines for the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/11/2022. (MEJ) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 01/11 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ) |
|
Monday, January 10, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 01/10 3:25 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:22-cv-0080-VMC-JSS. (SJB) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 01/10 2:23 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation, Other Affiliate Carol M Bishop, Other Affiliate Michelle Melendez, Other Affiliate Harley Busse, Other Affiliate Kendall S Mabry for Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation.. (Bishop, Carol) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 01/10 2:19 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Sentry Insurance for Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation.. (Bishop, Carol) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/10 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Harley Busse, Michelle Melendez with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19103692) filed by Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation.(Bishop, Carol) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons Summons to Michelle Melendez, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons Summons to Harley Busse |