Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-00298
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2022
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jul 09, 2022 5:00 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
HAROLD COONS
Represented By
FREDERICK THURMAN KUYKENDALL, III
The Kuykendall Law Group Llc - Fairhope Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 06, 2022
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Sun 05/15 9:03 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 01/10 12:01 PM
NOTICE Notice of Designated Forum - United States District Court, District of Delaware by HAROLD COONS re1 Complaint (KUYKENDALL, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 01/10 11:55 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KUYKENDALL, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/10 11:52 AM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6617619.), filed by HAROLD COONS. (KUYKENDALL, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]