Maryland District Court
Judge:Lydia Kay Griggsby
Case #: 1:22-cv-00064
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2022
Terminated:Jun 13, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jul 09, 2022 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Baltimore County, Maryland
Represented By
Peter Woodward Sheehan
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Deborah K St Lawrence Thompson
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP
contact info
Thurman W Zollicoffer, Jr
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Suzanne Berger
Represented By
Rignal Woodward Baldwin, V
Baldwin | Seraina, LLC
contact info

GPO Jun 13 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Baltimore County, Maryland; dismissing the complaint. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 6/13/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago
Friday, March 17, 2023
22 22 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 03/17 10:56 AM
MANDATE of USCA issued as to18 Notice of Appeal filed by Suzanne Berger (av4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
21 21 appeal USCA Judgment Thu 02/23 10:35 AM
JUDGMENT of USCA "Affirming" the district court's decision as to18 Notice of Appeal filed by Suzanne Berger(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USCA Unpublished Opinion
Friday, July 15, 2022
20 20 appeal USCA Case Number Fri 07/15 12:39 PM
USCA Case Number 22-1752 for18 Notice of Appeal filed by Suzanne Berger - Case Manager - Taylor Barton. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
19 19 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Thu 07/14 12:03 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re18 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
18 18 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 07/13 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to17 Memorandum and Order, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Suzanne Berger. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMDDC-10048002.(Baldwin, Rignal)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
17 17 11 pgs order Memorandum and Order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 06/13 1:29 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Baltimore County, Maryland; dismissing the complaint. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 6/13/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 03/30 3:49 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim In Further Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by Baltimore County, Maryland.(Zollicoffer, Thurman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 17, 2022
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/17 2:25 PM
NOTICE by Suzanne Berger re13 Response in Opposition to Motion and Proposed Order(Baldwin, Rignal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Service
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 03/17 9:19 AM
QC NOTICE:13 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Suzanne Berger was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Order. To correct this problem, file Proposed Order using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Order to 13 . (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/16 5:08 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Suzanne Berger.(Baldwin, Rignal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 02/22 1:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Baltimore County, Maryland(Zollicoffer, Thurman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, January 24, 2022
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/24 1:59 PM
NOTICE by Baltimore County, Maryland Certification of Filing of State Court Documents(Zollicoffer, Thurman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint (State Court),
Att: 2 Civil Non-Domestic Case Information Report (State Court),
Att: 3 Writ of Summons (State Court),
Att: 4 Notice to State Court (State Court)
10 10 order Scheduling Order Mon 01/24 11:40 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re8 Notice. Defendant's motion to dismiss due by 2/23/2022. Plaintiff's response due by 3/16/2022. Defendant's reply due by 3/30/2022. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 1/24/2022. (rs7s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Response Mon 01/24 11:36 AM
RESPONSE re6 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Statement Regarding Removal filed by Baltimore County, Maryland.(Zollicoffer, Thurman)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/19 4:29 PM
NOTICE by Baltimore County, Maryland of Intention to File Motion (Zollicoffer, Thurman)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
7 7 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 01/14 3:12 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Baltimore County, Maryland (Zollicoffer, Thurman)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Thu 01/13 7:34 AM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/12 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah K St Lawrence Thompson on behalf of Baltimore County, Maryland (St Lawrence Thompson, Deborah)
Related: [-]
4 4 5 pgs order Order Wed 01/12 11:33 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 1/12/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/12 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Woodward Sheehan on behalf of Baltimore County, Maryland (Sheehan, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 01/12 9:40 AM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Baltimore County, Maryland, filed by Suzanne Berger.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Lower Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 4 pgs notice Notice of Removal Mon 01/10 4:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, case number C-03-cv-21-004274. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9692068), filed by Baltimore County, MD.(Zollicoffer, Thurman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Docket & Complaint
utility Remark Wed 01/12 9:49 AM
The above document #2 is a copy of filings in the Circuit Court for Baltimore County. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]