Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Patti B Saris
Case #: 1:22-cv-10032
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2022
Terminated:Aug 26, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jul 09, 2022 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By
Ian H. Morrison
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
John T. Ayers-Mann
Seyfarth Shaw
contact info
Jacob F.M. Oslick
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Mediator
Judge Judith G. Dein
United States District Court United States Courthouse 1 Courthouse Way
Boston, MA 02210
Plaintiff
Kevin C. Ivanoski
Represented By
Jonathan M. Feigenbaum
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, August 26, 2022
34 34 order Settlement Order of Dismissal Fri 08/26 3:18 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (60 Days). (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
32 32 adr Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider Thu 08/25 3:57 PM
REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. (Thomson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Cancelling Hearing Thu 08/25 4:00 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE CANCELLING HEARING entered. (Thomson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Fri 08/12 5:22 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting as moot25 Motion or Leave to File MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 08/12 5:29 PM
RESET DEADLINES pursuant to Order 29 entered: Motions regarding the scope of the administrative record and discovery due by 8/31/2022; Plaintiff's Motion to dismiss or strike Defendants Amended Answer due by 8/31/2022. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 07/18 2:20 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion regarding scope of the record and discovery. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
28 28 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Thu 07/14 6:28 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Ayers-Mann, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
27 27 motion Extension of Time Wed 07/13 3:53 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/31/2022 to to file motion regarding scope of the record and discovery by Kevin C. Ivanoski.(Feigenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
26 26 15 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 07/06 1:56 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re25 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Ayers-Mann, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
25 25 motion Leave to File Document Wed 07/06 1:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Ayers-Mann, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 06/15 4:15 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re23 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Pleadings. Amended Pleadings due by 7/6/2022. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
23 23 motion Extension of Time Tue 06/14 2:18 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 6, 2022 to File Amended Pleadings by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Oslick, Jacob)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/14 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob F.M. Oslick on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Oslick, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
notice Notice of ADR Conference Fri 05/27 4:38 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF AND ORDER REGARDING ADR CONFERENCE: Mediation before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein set for Monday, August 29, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. by remote video conference and invitation issued by the clerk. Counsel, clients or representatives thereof with full settlement authority must all participate. It shall be understood (a) that all parties and counsel will participate in this court-sponsored mediation in good faith and with the interest of settling the matter on mutually acceptable terms, (b) that the entire mediation process, including all communications during any in-person, video or audio part thereof, is confidential, (c) that all statements made during the course of mediation are privileged settlement discussions, made without prejudice to any party's legal position, and inadmissible for any purpose in any legal proceeding, (d) that no party, participant, or representative shall seek in any proceeding to hereafter compel the mediator to testify and/or produce any document with respect to the mediation, and (e) that all parties, counsel and other participants agree that, by participating in this court-sponsored mediation, they are bound by these conditions and shall keep confidential all communications exchanged during the mediation process. No later than Friday, August 12, 2022, each party shall submit by email to Katherine_Thomson@mad.uscourts.gov a brief Memorandum marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing" addressing the party's position on the merits of the case and on settlement as well as email contact information to be included on the video conference invitation. If you use a standard form settlement agreement, please send it by email. If you believe the case is not ripe for mediation at this time, please notify opposing counsel and the court as soon as possible. (Thomson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of ADR Conference Fri 05/27 4:39 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING ADR: Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein will hold a telephone conference with counsel for each party separately prior to the mediation. A telephone conference is scheduled with plaintiff's counsel Friday, August 26, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. and with defense counsel Friday, August 26, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. The clerk will provide the call-in information to the parties via email. (Thomson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
utility Notice of Assignment to ADR Provider Wed 05/18 9:40 AM
Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Judith G. Dein appointed for a date in September/October 2022.(Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Mon 05/16 1:13 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ian H. Morrison and Jacob Oslick. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Mon 05/16 5:38 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Scheduling Conference held on 5/16/2022 by VIDEO. Joint Statement 11 - ADOPTED. ORDERED: Matter referred to ADR in the Fall 2022. Parties to notify the Court by Friday, May 20, 2022 if want to be referred to Magistrate Judge Dein for mediation. (Attorneys present: Jonathan M. Feigenbaum, for Plaintiff; Jacob Oslick and John T. Ayers-Mann, for Defendant)(Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 05/16 5:47 PM
SET SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES: Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2022; Administrative Record due by 6/1/2022; Any Response to the Administrative Record due by 6/22/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 11/10/2022; Oppositions due by 12/12/2022, Replies due by 1/4/2023. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to ADR Mon 05/16 5:50 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution late SEPTEMBER/OCTOBER 2022. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
14 14 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Fri 05/13 10:27 AM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3) . (Ayers-Mann, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/11 2:18 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ian H. Morrison and Jacob Oslick Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number AMADC-9317116 by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Ayers-Mann, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Monday, May 09, 2022
12 12 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Mon 05/09 10:40 AM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Feigenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2022
11 11 misc Joint statement of counsel Thu 05/05 2:51 PM
JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Ayers-Mann, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 04/04 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY VIDEO: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/16/2022 02:00 PM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/25 10:02 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Ayers-Mann, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/25 10:01 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Ayers-Mann, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 03/11 1:37 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer due 3/25/2022. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/10 11:33 AM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 25, 2022 to File Answer re1 Complaint,, by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Ayers-Mann, John)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/10 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Ayers-Mann on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Ayers-Mann, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2022
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Fri 03/04 7:59 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Kevin C. Ivanoski. The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 2/18/2022, answer due 3/11/2022. Acknowledgement filed by Kevin C. Ivanoski. (Feigenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 01/11 8:55 AM
Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 01/11 8:52 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/10 6:07 PM
COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9131637 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Kevin C. Ivanoski.(Feigenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Local category form,
Att: 3 Exhibit A (Harvesting the claim management benefits of emerging neuropsychological assessment practices by David Fisher, Ph.D., of Psybar, LLC).,
Att: 4 Exhibit B PsyBar materials,
Att: 5 Exhibit C BORIM Opinion,
Att: 6 Exhibit D Prudential Goal to Increase Profitability,
Att: 7 Exhibit E Disability is the failure to adapt.,
Att: 8 Exhibit F Sample financial reserve to claims department,
Att: 9 Exhibit G Supplmental Compensation Sample