Delaware District Court
Judge:Leonard P Stark
Referred: Christopher J Burke
Case #: 1:14-cv-01063
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2014
Terminated:Jan 29, 2016
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 5:53 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Trusteer Inc.
Represented By
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Trusted Knight Corporation
Represented By
Denise Seastone Kraft
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Ryan W. Cobb
contact info
Paul R. Gupta
contact info
Laura D. Hatcher
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Brian A. Biggs
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Defendant
International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Defendant
Trusteer Inc.
Represented By
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Trusted Knight Corporation
Represented By
Gerard M. Donovan
contact info
Denise Seastone Kraft
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Brian M. Rostocki
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Ryan W. Cobb
contact info
Sharon A. Lai
contact info
Paul R. Gupta
contact info
Laura D. Hatcher
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Brian A. Biggs
Dla Piper LLP
contact info

GPO Nov 19 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/19/15. (ntl)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 13, 2017
96 96 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 04/13 10:49 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to92 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Trusted Knight Corporation. (ntl)
Related: [-]