Kansas District Court
Judge:Julie A Robinson
Referred: Teresa J James
Case #: 2:22-cv-02018
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2022
Terminated:Apr 26, 2022
Case in other court:District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, 21CV06087
Last checked: Sunday Jul 10, 2022 4:13 AM CDT
Defendant
Kansas Department of Labor
Defendant
United States Department of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By
Christopher Allman
Office Of United States Attorney - Kcks
contact info
Plaintiff
Cherry Park Properties, LLC
212 S. Cherry St.
Olathe, KS 66061

GPO Mar 07 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claim against the United States is dismissed without prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 3/7/2022. Mailed to pro se party Cherry Park Properties, LLC by regular mail. (heo)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
13 13 order Judgment Tue 04/26 3:35 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/26/2022. (ca)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Dismissing Case Tue 04/26 3:34 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice against Defendant Kansas Department of Labor. This case is closed in its entirety. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/26/2022. (ca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
11 11 order Show Cause Wed 04/13 4:37 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff is required to show good cause in writing to the Honorable Julie A. Robinson, United States District Judge, on or before April 25, 2022, why service of the summons and Complaint was not made in this case upon defendant Kansas Department of Labor within 90 days from removal, and shall further show good cause why Plaintiff's claims against defendant Kansas Department of Labor should not be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/13/2022. Mailed to pro se party Cherry Park Properties, LLC by regular mail. (ts)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/07 2:19 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting7 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claim against the United States is dismissed without prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 3/7/2022. Mailed to pro se party Cherry Park Properties, LLC by regular mail. (heo)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
9 9 order Show Cause Fri 02/18 10:40 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/4/2022. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 2/18/2022. Mailed to pro se party Cherry Park Properties, LLC by regular mail. (hw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
8 8 11 pgs support Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 01/19 9:02 AM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant United States Department of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service(Allman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit-A
7 7 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 01/19 9:00 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Response deadline 2/9/2022) by Defendant United States Department of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service (Allman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
6 6 misc State Court Records Thu 01/13 11:18 AM
STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Johnson County. (Allman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
5 5 order Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer Tue 01/11 11:04 AM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 2/8/2022 for Defendant United States Department of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/11/2022. (lb)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/11 9:38 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Designation of Trial by United States Department of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service re1 Notice of Removal,3 Designation of Place of Trial. (Allman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Designation of Place of Trial Tue 01/11 9:37 AM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant United States Department of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Allman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 01/11 9:36 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant United States Department of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. (Allman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 01/11 9:34 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 21CV6087 Trial location of Kansas City, filed by United States Department of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service.(Allman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Tue 01/11 10:45 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
Related: [-]