Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-23895

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kathryn C Ferguson
Case #: 3:22-ap-01015
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2022
Terminated:Dec 18, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Srikanth Velaga
302 Saratoga Ct.
Somerville, NJ 08876
Represented By
Srikanth Velaga
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrea Dobin
McManimon, Scotland & Baumann, Esq. 427 Riverview Plaza
Trenton, NJ 08611
Represented By
Joseph R Zapata, Jr
Mcmanimon Scotland & Baumann, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
32 32 misc Warrant to Satisfy Judgment Wed 04/02 10:32 AM
Warrant to Satisfy Judgment against Srikanth Velaga Related [+]. Filed by Joseph R Zapata Jr on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Zapata, Joseph)
Related: [-] 28 Money Judgment
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
court Receipt - Generic - Adversary - Court Use Only Wed 01/17 2:01 PM
Receipt of Exemplification Fee Amount $24.00, Receipt Number 40000157. Related [+]. Fee received from McManimon, Scotland & Baumann, LLC (mrm)
Related: [-] 30 Order (Generic)
Friday, December 22, 2023
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 12/23 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/22/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
30 30 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 12/20 8:19 AM
Order Dismissing the First Count of the Complaint without Prejudice Related [+].. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/20/2023 (cmf)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01015 Complaint by Andrea Dobin against Srikanth Velaga. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A) (Zapata, Joseph) RECEIPT NUMBER Modified on 4/12/2022 . filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
Monday, December 18, 2023
utility Close Adversary Case Mon 12/18 1:52 PM
Adversary Case (3:22-ap-1015) Closed. (def)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
court Hearing Held Tue 12/05 3:19 PM
Minute of 12/5/2023 Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Request for Default Judgment filed. Related [+]
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Hearing for: STATUS HEARING (related document:1 Adversary case 22-01015 Complaint by Andrea Dobin against Srikanth Velaga. The following parties were served: Joseph R. Zapata, Jr. and Srikanth Velaga. Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 at 02:00 PM at ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden.) (as
Monday, December 04, 2023
29 29 trustee Status Report Mon 12/04 12:56 PM
Status Report Related [+] filed by Joseph R Zapata Jr on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Zapata, Joseph)
Related: [-] Hearing Held and Continued
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
28 28 order Money Judgment Wed 11/29 3:13 PM
Money Judgment in favor of ANDREA DOBIN, Chapter 7 Trustee and against SRIKANTH VELAGA in the amount of $ $10,000.00 Related [+] . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/29/2023. (har)
Related: [-] 27 Request to Enter Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
27 27 misc Request to Enter Default Judgment Tue 11/21 4:42 PM
Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Srikanth Velaga filed by Joseph R Zapata Jr on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Zapata, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Memorandum of Law
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
court Hearing Held and Continued Tue 10/17 3:40 PM
Minute of 10/17/2023 Hearing Held and Continued. OUTCOME: Status provided to Court; Adjourned to 12/5/2023 at 2:00 PM. Related [+]
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Hearing for: STATUS HEARING (related document:1 Adversary case 22-01015 Complaint by Andrea Dobin against Srikanth Velaga. The following parties were served: Joseph R. Zapata, Jr. and Srikanth Velaga. Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 at 02:00 PM at ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden.) Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 at 02:00 PM at ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden. (as
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
26 26 misc Document Tue 10/10 2:40 PM
Document re: Status Report Related [+] filed by Joseph R Zapata Jr on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Zapata, Joseph)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Hearing - (Generic)
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, September 22, 2023
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 09/23 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/22/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
24 24 court Notice of Hearing - (Generic) Wed 09/20 3:55 PM
Notice of Hearing for: STATUS HEARING Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01015 Complaint by Andrea Dobin against Srikanth Velaga. The following parties were served: Joseph R. Zapata, Jr. and Srikanth Velaga. Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 at 02:00 PM at ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden. (har
Sunday, September 17, 2023
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 09/18 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/17/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 09/18 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/17/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
21 21 court Entry of Default Fri 09/15 9:36 AM
Entry of Default against Srikanth Velaga Related [+] The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant. (mef)
Related: [-] 20 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
20 20 misc Request to Enter Default Tue 09/05 2:26 PM
Request to Enter Default Against Srikanth Velaga filed by Joseph R Zapata Jr on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Zapata, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
utility Case Reassigned Wed 08/09 10:14 AM
Judge Andrew B. Altenburg, Jr. added to case. Involvement of Judge Jerrold N. Poslusny, Jr. Terminated (mrm)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
court Order Authorizing Case Reassignment from KCF to JNP Mon 08/07 2:32 PM
Text Order Authorizing Case Reassignment effective August 7, 2023: Judge Kathryn C. Ferguson removed from the case. Judge Jerrold N. Poslusny added to the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Michael B. Kaplan on 8/7/2023.. (mjb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
19 19 misc Document Fri 06/23 5:00 PM
Document re: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Related [+] filed by Joseph R Zapata Jr on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Zapata, Joseph)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 04/06 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
17 17 misc Document Tue 04/04 4:34 PM
Document re: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer to June 30, 2023 Related [+] filed by Joseph R Zapata Jr on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Zapata, Joseph) TEXT Modified on 4/5/2023 (ghm)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Monday, April 03, 2023
16 16 court Notice of Hearing - (Generic) Mon 04/03 1:51 PM
Notice of Hearing for: Pretrial Conference Related [+]. The following parties were served: Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant. Hearing scheduled for 12/12/2023 at 02:15 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (ghm)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01015 Complaint by Andrea Dobin against Srikanth Velaga. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A) (Zapata, Joseph) RECEIPT NUMBER Modified on 4/12/2022 . filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
Friday, March 31, 2023
15 15 court Document Fri 03/31 1:34 PM
Copy of SECOND FORBEARANCE AGREEMENT AND AMENDMENT TO STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT RESOLVING POTENTIAL AVOIDANCE CLAIMS AGAINST MULTIPLE PARTIES AS PART OF A GLOBAL SETTLEMENT AND ORDER APPROVING THE SAME Related [+] (ghm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
Monday, January 09, 2023
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Mon 01/09 1:01 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Joseph R Zapata Jr on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Zapata, Joseph)
Related: [-] 12 ORDER VACATING STAY OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS (related document:1 Adversary case 22-01015 Complaint by Andrea Dobin against Srikanth Velaga. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A) (Zapata, Joseph) RECEIPT NUMBER Modified on 4/12/2022. filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin).. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/6/2023 (ghm)
Sunday, January 08, 2023
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 01/09 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/08/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
12 12 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 01/06 2:54 PM
ORDER VACATING STAY OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS Related [+].. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/6/2023 (ghm)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01015 Complaint by Andrea Dobin against Srikanth Velaga. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A) (Zapata, Joseph) RECEIPT NUMBER Modified on 4/12/2022 . filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
11 11 court Document Wed 12/07 2:38 PM
COPY OF FORBEARANCE AGREEMENT AND AMENDMENT TO STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT RESOLVING POTENTIAL AVOIDANCE CLAIMS AGAINST MULTIPLE PARTIES AS PART OF A GLOBAL SETTLEMENT AND ORDER APPROVING THE SAME Related [+] (ghm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
utility Remark Wed 12/07 2:40 PM
Remark: Per Forbearance Agreement and Order above, this adversary proceeding will remain open until April 3, 2023. A follow up deadline to review for closing has been set. (ghm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
utility Remark Thu 11/03 9:22 AM
Remark: The adversary proceeding is settled. A notice of proposed compromise/settlement of controversy and a motion to approve compromise was filed in the main case. The motion is returnable 12/6/2022 Related [+]. (ghm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
Friday, September 23, 2022
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 09/24 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/23/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
9 9 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 09/21 9:57 AM
COPY OF JUDGMENT FOR SUM CERTAIN AGAINST VENKATARAMANA MANNAM AND GEETHA MANNAN AND REINSTATING ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/21/2022 (ghm)
Related: [-]
utility Reopen AP Case Wed 09/21 9:56 AM
Adversary Case Reopened Administratively. (ghm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
8 8 court Document Tue 08/30 2:16 PM
COPY OF STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT RESOLVING POTENTIAL AVOIDANCE CLAIMS AGAINST MULTIPLE PARTIES AS PART OF A GLOBAL SETTLEMENT AND ORDER APPROVING THE SAME FROM MAIN CASE 19-23895 Related [+] (ghm) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2022 (ghm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
utility Close Adversary Case Tue 08/30 2:46 PM
Adversary Case (3:22-ap-1015) Closed. (ghm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
court Hearing Held Tue 07/12 3:43 PM
Minute of 7/12/22; OUTCOME: NOTICE OF PROPOSED COMPROMISE OR SETTLEMENT OF CONTROVERSY FILED; MOTION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE FILED; STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT SUBMITTED Related [+] (km)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 06/07 3:47 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 6/27/2022 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2022 at 02:15 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (ghm)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 06/07 3:57 PM
AMENDED MINUTE: Hearing Rescheduled from 6/7/2022 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2022 at 02:15 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (ghm)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Friday, June 03, 2022
7 7 court Determination of Adjournment Request Fri 06/03 1:10 PM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 7/12/2022 at 2:15 p.m.. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (ghm)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Wed 05/11 10:54 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 5/10/22 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2022 at 02:15 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (km)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Monday, May 09, 2022
6 6 court Determination of Adjournment Request Mon 05/09 9:04 AM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 6/7/2022 at 2:15 p.m.. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (ghm)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Wed 04/20 9:16 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 4/19/22 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2022 at 02:15 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (km)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Monday, April 11, 2022
court Receipt - Generic - Adversary - Court Use Only Tue 04/12 9:01 AM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee Amount $ 350.00, Receipt Number 624781. Fee received from Andrea Dobin (mrg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 03/15 2:30 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 3/15/2022 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 04/19/2022 at 02:15 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (ghm)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Friday, March 11, 2022
5 5 court Determination of Adjournment Request Fri 03/11 8:11 AM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 4/19/2022 at 2:15 p.m.. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (ghm)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Friday, January 14, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/14 11:25 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Joseph R Zapata Jr on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Zapata, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01015 Complaint by Andrea Dobin against Srikanth Velaga. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A) filed by Plaintiff Andrea Dobin
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 01/12 12:24 PM
Summons Issued to Andrea Dobin for Service on Srikanth Velaga Answer due on 2/14/2022 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 3/15/2022 at 02:15 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (mrg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
2 2 misc Certification and Agreement to Pay Filing Fee Tue 01/11 11:27 AM
Certification and Agreement to Pay Filing Fee filed by Joseph R Zapata Jr on behalf of Andrea Dobin. (Zapata, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/11 11:25 AM
Adversary case 22-01015 Complaint by Andrea Dobin against Srikanth Velaga. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Zapata, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule A