GRAY v. 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00391 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 06, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 10, 2022 5:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
CARLYNE GRAY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, May 06, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (erl) |
|
Tuesday, January 11, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE Notice of Designated Forum - United States District Court, District of Delaware by CARLYNE GRAY re1 Complaint (KUYKENDALL, FREDERICK) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KUYKENDALL, FREDERICK) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6621883.), filed by CARLYNE GRAY. (KUYKENDALL, FREDERICK) |