Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-00431
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jul 10, 2022 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
2345 Rice Street Suite 230
Roseville, MN 55113
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETLY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
KEVIN KOSS
Represented By
RICHARD M PAUL, III
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, January 14, 2022
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/14 12:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 01/13 12:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
2 2 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 01/11 6:06 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - District of Minnesota by KEVIN KOSS (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/11 6:05 PM
COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6622397.), filed by KEVIN KOSS. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]