Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-00441
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jul 10, 2022 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETLY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
STEVEN CLARK
Represented By
RICHARD M PAUL, III
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, January 14, 2022
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/14 11:13 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 01/13 2:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
2 2 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 01/11 6:20 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - District of Minnesota by STEVEN CLARK (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/11 6:20 PM
COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6622435.), filed by STEVEN CLARK. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]