Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-00466
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jul 10, 2022 4:41 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
COTY MORRIS
Represented By
RICHARD M PAUL, III
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, January 14, 2022
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/14 12:11 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 01/13 12:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
2 2 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 01/11 7:02 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - District of Minnesota by COTY MORRIS (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/11 7:02 PM
COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6622543.), filed by COTY MORRIS. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]