New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Hector Gonzalez
Referred: James R Cho
Case #: 1:22-cv-00174
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2022
Terminated:Jun 01, 2022
Case in other court:NYS Supreme Court - Queens, 530974-2021
Last checked: Monday Jul 11, 2022 4:42 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By
Patricia Rauh
Hurwitz Fine P.C.
contact info
Agnieszka Anna Wilewicz
Hurwitz Fine P.C.
contact info
Eric Thomas Boron
Hurwitz Fine P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Meyer Kaufman
Represented By
Jack Glanzberg
Aboulafia Law Firm
contact info
Matthew S. Aboulafia
Aboulafia Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company
139 STATE STREET
MONTPELIER, VT 05601
Represented By
Agnieszka Anna Wilewicz
Hurwitz Fine P.C.
contact info
Eric Thomas Boron
Hurwitz Fine P.C.
contact info
Mediator
Kenneth J. Balkan
Plaintiff
Meyer Kaufman
Represented By
Jack Glanzberg
Aboulafia Law Firm
contact info
Matthew S. Aboulafia
Aboulafia Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
order Order Dismissing Case Wed 06/01 12:13 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE as per the Stipulation of Dismissal filed at docket entry No.15 . Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 6/1/2022. (Neptune, Pierre)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 05/31 4:26 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal request to so order by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Boron, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/09 10:43 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Hector Gonzalez. Judge William F. Kuntz, II no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
order Status Report Order Mon 05/02 5:16 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Mediation reports this matter has settled. Parties to file a stipulation of dismissal or joint status report letter by 5/24/2022 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 5/2/2022. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
adr Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled) Fri 04/29 1:17 PM
REPORT of Mediation settled. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report due by 5/13/2022. (Weinstein, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/26 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Agnieszka Anna Wilewicz on behalf of Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Wilewicz, Agnieszka)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/26 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Thomas Boron on behalf of Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Boron, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
12 12 motion Contempt Tue 04/12 2:01 PM
Letter MOTION for Contempt against Institute for Community Living by Meyer Kaufman. (Glanzberg, Jack)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Pleadings,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 12-6-21 Subpoena,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- 2/10/22 Subpoena with Affidavit of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4- 3/4/22 Letter
Thursday, February 24, 2022
adr Selection of Mediator Thu 02/24 10:48 AM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Kenneth J. Balkan selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place remotely on April 29, 2022 at 10:00am. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms.The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session. (Weinstein, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
11 11 misc Letter Wed 02/23 1:34 PM
Letter Advising of Selected Mediator by Meyer Kaufman (Glanzberg, Jack)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 10, 2022
10 10 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 02/10 11:00 AM
Plaintiff Reply to Counterclaim ANSWER to6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Meyer Kaufman. (Glanzberg, Jack)
Related: [-]
minutes Initial Conference Hearing Thu 02/10 10:50 AM
Minute Entry: Initial Conference Hearing held on 2/10/2022 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Appearances by Jack Glanzberg for plaintiff and Patricia Rauh for defendant. Case discussed. Plaintiff granted leave until 2/10/2022 to respond to defendant's counterclaim. The Court entered the following pretrial schedule: parties to exchange automatic disclosures by 2/17/2022; no amendment of the pleadings or joinder of additional parties permitted after 3/31/2022; and parties to complete fact discovery by 8/10/2022. Parties do not anticipate retaining liability experts. Parties to commence dispositive motion practice in accordance with the assigned District Judge's Individual Rules. Parties expressed an interest in mediation or early settlement conference after engaging in limited discovery as to the two non-profit renters at the subject property. The case is referred to Court-annexed mediation. Parties to select a mediator by 2/24/2022 and complete mediation by 5/19/2022. Parties to submit a joint status letter two weeks after the mediation, but no later than 5/24/2022, whichever date is earlier. (AT&T Conference Bridge.) (Cho, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
9 9 misc Case Management Statement Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 02/08 1:13 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT , REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Aboulafia, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
8 8 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/20 9:08 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic-Initial Conference will be held at 10:30 a.m. on 2/10/2022 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel for defendants' is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with plaintiff's counsel. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than 2/8/2022 . Each party is directed to call toll free (888) 808-6929 and use access code 1065334 . Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 1/20/2022. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Chamber's Individual Rules
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/19 11:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Rauh, Patricia)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 01/19 11:10 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Meyer Kaufman by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Rauh, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/14 12:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Aboulafia on behalf of Meyer Kaufman (notification declined or already on case) (Aboulafia, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/14 12:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Glanzberg on behalf of Meyer Kaufman (aty to be noticed) (Glanzberg, Jack)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 01/12 12:50 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 01/12 12:49 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 01/12 11:57 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company from Kings County Supreme Court, case number 530974/2021. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-15187142) (Rauh, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Affidavit of Service
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/12 12:48 PM
Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)
Related: [-]
misc ECF Admission and Registration Notification - Removal Wed 01/12 12:49 PM
This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Neptune, Pierre)
Related: [-]