Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-00509
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2022
Terminated:Jan 12, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jul 11, 2022 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
SCOTT RUSSELL CHERNEY
Represented By
BASIL E ADHAM
Johnson Law Group - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 12, 2023
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 01/17 11:07 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/12/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 01/12 12:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ADHAM, BASIL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/12 12:18 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6623632.), filed by SCOTT RUSSELL CHERNEY. (ADHAM, BASIL)
Related: [-]