Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:20-bk-00319

Iowa Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Anita L Shodeen
Case #: 4:22-ap-30001
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2022
Terminated:Aug 03, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jon Linder
544 78th Street
West Des Moines, IA 50266
Represented By
Jon Linder
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Smith
25 Main Place Suite 200
Council Bluffs, IA 51503
Represented By
Charles L Smith
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:06 PM CDT
Thursday, August 03, 2023
court Close Case - Adversary Thu 08/03 11:37 AM
Adversary Case Closed 22-30001 jmk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
31 31 notice Trustee Notice of Dismissal Pursuant to Completed Compromise Wed 08/02 1:44 PM
Trustee Notice of Dismissal Pursuant to Completed Compromise Filed by Charles Smith on behalf of Charles Smith. (Smith, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
30 30 notice Trustee Notice of Pending Motion to Compromise Controversy Fri 05/26 11:34 AM
Trustee Notice of Pending Motion to Compromise Controversy related to chapter case docket event # 114 Filed by Charles Smith on behalf of Charles Smith. (Smith, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
29 29 order Summary Judgment - Order Thu 04/13 12:20 PM
Memorandum of Decision and Order Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 11 12 Brief/Memorandum filed by Defendant Jon Linder,13 Support Document filed by Defendant Jon Linder,14 Support Document filed by Defendant Jon Linder,19 Objection filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith,20 Support Document filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith,21 Support Document filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith,22 Support Document filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
27 27 court Hearing Continued or Rescheduled Wed 02/22 12:31 PM
Hearing Rescheduled Related [+] Hearing scheduled 3/9/2023 at 02:00 PM at Telephonic Hrg with Judge Shodeen.(jmk)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Jon Linder,12 Brief/Memorandum filed by Defendant Jon Linder,13 Support Document filed by Defendant Jon Linder,14 Support Document filed by Defendant Jon Linder,19 Objection filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith,20 Support Document filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith,21 Support Document filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith,22 Support Document filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith
Friday, February 17, 2023
26 26 court Judge Shodeen Hearing Fri 02/17 4:51 PM
Hearing Scheduled Related [+] Hearing scheduled 3/7/2023 at 02:00 PM at Telephonic Hrg with Judge Shodeen.(jmk)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Jon Linder,12 Brief/Memorandum filed by Defendant Jon Linder,13 Support Document filed by Defendant Jon Linder,14 Support Document filed by Defendant Jon Linder,19 Objection filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith,20 Support Document filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith,21 Support Document filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith,22 Support Document filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith
Thursday, November 17, 2022
24 24 order Extend Time - Order Thu 11/17 9:58 AM
Docket Text Order Regarding Motion to Extend Time Before Expiration of Specified Period. Having reviewed the motion and having found that it sets forth cause for the relief requested as required by Rule 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Court hereby Orders that: The motion is granted. The deadline for the parties to submit a Consent Order disposing of the case or a Trial Stipulation is extended to a date 60 days after the Courts Order resolving the Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs Objection thereto. As required by any applicable federal rule or statute, the filer shall serve this order on all appropriate parties (except those parties who will receive notice of electronic filing). This order has been entered on the docket as directed by the Judge assigned to the case. Related [+]. (mrw)
Related: [-] 23
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
23 23 motion Extend Time Wed 11/16 9:59 AM
Motion to Extend Time for Trial Stipulation Deadline Filed by John Arnvig Flaten on behalf of Charles Smith (Flaten, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
22 22 misc Support Document Mon 10/31 10:32 AM
Support Document Filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith Related [+]. (Flaten, John)
Related: [-] 19 Objection filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith
21 21 misc Support Document Mon 10/31 10:27 AM
Support Document Filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith Related [+]. (Flaten, John)
Related: [-] 19 Objection filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith
20 20 misc Support Document Mon 10/31 10:23 AM
Support Document Filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith Related [+]. (Flaten, John)
Related: [-] 19 Objection filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith
19 19 objectio Objection Mon 10/31 10:06 AM
Objection Filed by Charles Smith Related [+](Flaten, John
Related: [-] related documents(s)11 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Jon Linder
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/05 11:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/05/2022. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
17 17 order Extend Time - Order Wed 10/05 9:54 AM
Docket Text Order Regarding Motion to Extend Time Before Expiration of Specified Period. Having reviewed the motion and having found that it sets forth cause for the relief requested as required by Rule 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Court hereby Orders that: The motion is granted. The Plaintiff shall file his objection to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by October 31, 2022. As required by any applicable federal rule or statute, the filer shall serve this order on all appropriate parties (except those parties who will receive notice of electronic filing). This order has been entered on the docket as directed by the Judge assigned to the case. Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 16
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
16 16 motion Extend Time Tue 10/04 11:16 AM
Motion to Extend Time for Filing Objections to Motion for Summary Judgment Until 10/31/22 Filed by Charles Smith on behalf of Charles Smith. (Smith, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
15 15 court Notice of Bar Date - 14 day Mon 10/03 4:03 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 10/17/2022.(jmk)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Jon Linder
Friday, September 30, 2022
14 14 misc Support Document Fri 09/30 2:49 PM
Support Document Filed by Defendant Jon Linder Related [+]. (Gainer, Robert)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Jon Linder
13 13 misc Support Document Fri 09/30 2:48 PM
Support Document Filed by Defendant Jon Linder Related [+]. (Gainer, Robert)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Jon Linder
12 12 misc Brief/Memorandum Fri 09/30 2:46 PM
Brief/Memorandum Filed by Defendant Jon Linder Related [+]. (Gainer, Robert)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Jon Linder
11 11 motion Summary Judgment Fri 09/30 2:45 PM
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Robert C Gainer on behalf of Jon Linder (Gainer, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
10 10 order Stipulation Re: Scheduling - Order Mon 03/21 10:12 AM
Docket Text Order Regarding Stipulation Re: Scheduling. Having reviewed the stipulation and having determined the document contains the information required by the relevant federal rules, the Court hereby approves the Stipulation Re: Scheduling. As required by any applicable federal rule or statute, the filer shall serve this order on all appropriate parties (except those parties who will receive notice of electronic filing). This order has been entered on the docket as directed by the Judge assigned to this proceeding Related [+]. Trial Stipulation Re: Facts, Issues, Exhibits and Witnesses due by 11/30/2022. (jmk)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, March 18, 2022
9 9 motion Stipulation Re: Scheduling Fri 03/18 11:20 AM
Stipulation Re: Scheduling Filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith. Trial Stipulation Re: Facts, Issues, Exhibits and Witnesses due by 11/30/2022. (Smith, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
8 8 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/03 2:42 PM
Order Canceling Scheduling Conference Related [+]. Follow Up Courtroom Deputy Deadline due by 3/21/2022.(jmk)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith,5 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Jon Linder,6 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 02/09 1:58 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by John Arnvig Flaten on behalf of Charles Smith. (Flaten, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference (Judge Shodeen) Wed 02/09 11:39 AM
Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2022 at 02:30 PM. (jmk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/04 1:45 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Jon Linder. (Gainer, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 01/18 7:23 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Robert C Gainer on behalf of Jon Linder. (Gainer, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 01/12 2:25 PM
Summons Service Executed On Jon Linder 1/12/2022 (Smith, Charles)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (Judge Shodeen) Wed 01/12 11:45 AM
Summons and Notice Issued On Jon Linder Answer Due 02/11/2022. Execution of Summons Due 01/19/2022. No Answer Deadline: 03/23/2022. No Answer/Execution Deadline: 05/12/2022. (amcn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/12 10:22 AM
Adversary case 22-30001 Complaint by Charles Smith against Jon Linder. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Lead Case No. 4:20-bk-319 (Smith, Charles)
Related: [-]