South Carolina District Court
Case #: 6:22-cr-00023
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Jan 13, 2022 2:21 AM EST
Defendant
Glenn Joseph Rogers (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Winston Irwin Marosek
Us Attorneys Office (gville)
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/13/2022 2:47 AM EST
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
2 2 INDICTMENT (Sealed Grand Jury Ballot attached) as to Glenn Joseph Rogers (1) count(s) 1. (jtho, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 GJ Ballot
5 5 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF INDICTMENT WARRANT as to Glenn Joseph Rogers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/11/22.(jtho, )
Related: [-]
7 7 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Glenn Joseph Rogers for as needed from Greenville County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/11/22.(jtho, )
Related: [-]
8 8 STANDING ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY as to Glenn Joseph Rogers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/11/22.(jtho, )
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Glenn Joseph Rogers: Arraignment set for 1/27/2022 09:45 AM in Greenville #3100, Carroll A Campbell Jr Courthouse, 250 East North St, Greenville before Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald. (jtho, )
Related: [-]