Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Manish S Shah
Case #: 1:22-cv-00223
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2022
Terminated:Jan 21, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 12, 2022 3:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Bright Haven Behavioral Health Center, Ltd.
Represented By
Michael Paul Adams
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Richard B. Polony
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Samira Jimenez
Represented By
Michael Paul Adams
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Richard B. Polony
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Anne Prevenas
Represented By
Justin M Penn
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Katherine Georgia Schnake
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jason Whiteside
Represented By
Justin M Penn
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Katherine Georgia Schnake
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Whiteside & Goldberg, Ltd.
Represented By
Justin M Penn
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Katherine Georgia Schnake
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Clarity Clinic, LLC
Represented By
Laura Lefkow-Hynes
Prinz Law Firm
contact info
Amit Singh Bindra
The Prinz Law Firm
contact info
Kristen E. Prinz
The Prinz Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/13/2022 6:20 PM CST
Thursday, January 13, 2022
1 1 3 pgs NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit, case number (2021CH000474) filed by Bright Haven Behavioral Health Center, Ltd., an Illinois corporation, Samira Jimenez, individual Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19055637.(Polony, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 392 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bright Haven Behavioral Health Center, Ltd., an Illinois corporation, Samira Jimenez, individual by Richard B. Polony (Polony, Richard)
Related: [-]