Ohio Southern District Court
Case #: 1:22-cr-00004
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2022
Last checked: Friday Jan 14, 2022 2:36 AM EST
Defendant
Robert Debaun (1)
Represented By
Patrick John Hanley
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ebunoluwa A. Taiwo
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/14/2022 3:09 AM EST
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Robert Debaun (1). (art) Modified Docket Text on 9/8/2021 (km). [1:21-mj-00635-KLL]
Related: [-]
3 3 Order Granting USA's Motion to Seal Case as to Robert Debaun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/31/2021. (art) [1:21-mj-00635-KLL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Initial Appearance as to Robert Debaun held on 9/8/2021. Proceedings conducted by video conferencing with the consent of the Defendant. Defendant present with retained counsel Patrick Hanley. Complaint as to this case and all related cases unsealed upon oral motion of the United States. Defendant informed of charges and potential penalties. Defendant informed of his rights and provided copy of charging document (counsel for Defendant previously provided copy). Defendant is released on an O.R. with pretrial supervision and the following special conditions of release: (1) no contact with any potential witness or victim, to include all co-defendants; (2) shall not use alcohol excessively; (3) shall not possess any narcotic drug unless prescribed by a physician. Medical marijuana is excluded from this condition, subject to Defendant providing valid medical marijuana card to Pretrial Services. Defendant waives preliminary hearing on the record in open Court. Defendant and counsel to execute waiver and return to the Court for filing. Case to proceed to the grand jury. Related [+] (km) [1:21-mj-00635-KLL]
Related: [-] corded By: CourtSmart, Session ID #1759
6 6 Order Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing as to Robert Debaun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/8/2021. (km) [1:21-mj-00635-KLL]
Related: [-]
7 7 Due Process Protections Act Order as to Robert Debaun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/8/2021. (km) [1:21-mj-00635-KLL]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Robert Debaun (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/8/2021. (km) [1:21-mj-00635-KLL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
9 9 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Robert Debaun. (km) [1:21-mj-00635-KLL]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
10 10 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 9/8/2021 in case as to Robert Debaun. (eh) [1:21-mj-00635-KLL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
12 12 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Indictment or Information New date requested 12/16/2021 by USA as to Robert Debaun. (km) [1:21-mj-00635-KLL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver of Timely Indictment/Information
Friday, October 08, 2021
13 13 ORDER granting12 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Indictment or Information as to Robert Debaun (1). The time period specified in 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(b), within which the United States must file an indictment or information relative to the current charges in this matter, is extended for a period of 65 days, up to and including Thursday, 12/16/2021. The time period from the date when an indictment or information must have been filed originally, namely, Tuesday, 10/12/2021, up to and including Thursday, 12/16/2021, shall be excluded in computing the time within which an indictment or information relative to the charge(s) in this matter must be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/8/2021. (km) [1:21-mj-00635-KLL]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
14 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict. New date requested 1/27/2022 by USA as to Robert Debaun. (art) [1:21-mj-00635-KLL]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Robert Debaun (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/17/2021. (art) [1:21-mj-00635-KLL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
16 16 INFORMATION as to Robert Debaun (1) count(s) 1. (km)
Related: [-]
17 17 PLEA AGREEMENT (WITH STATEMENT OF FACTS) as to Robert Debaun. (km)
Related: [-]