PCT, Ltd. v. Auctus Fund LLC
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | William G Young |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-10053 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 14, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 13, 2022 4:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
Auctus Fund LLC
545 Boylston Street 2nd Floor
Boston, MA 02116 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PCT, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by PCT, Ltd.. (Afzali, Mara) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 02/14 2:21 PM
Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying25 Joint Motion to Modify and Extend Scheduling Order. (Paine, Matthew) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to July 19, 2023 to Complete Discovery by PCT, Ltd..(Afzali, Mara) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
![]() PCT, LTD's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Auctus Fund, LLC by PCT, Ltd..(Afzali, Mara) |
|
Friday, July 22, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against PCT, Ltd. by Auctus Fund LLC.(Bennett, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2022 | ||
notice
Notice Cancelling Hearing
Tue 07/19 9:39 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The scheduling conference set for 7/21/2022 at 11:00 AM is canceled, the Court having adopted the parties proposed joint schedule. (Gaudet, Jennifer) |
||
Thursday, July 14, 2022 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 07/14 9:52 AM
Judge William G. Young ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re20 JOINT STATEMENT is so ordered as the case management scheduling order. Discovery to be completed by April 21, 2023; Motions due by May 30, 2023. Ready for Trial on September 11, 2023 at 9:00AM in Courtroom 18 - 5th Floor (In person only) before Judge William G. Young.(Paine, Matthew) |
||
Wednesday, July 13, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
![]() JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Afzali, Mara) |
|
Tuesday, July 12, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
![]() STIPULATION re18 Amended Complaint Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time by PCT, Ltd.. (Afzali, Mara) |
|
Thursday, July 07, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against Auctus Fund LLC, filed by PCT, Ltd..(McConnell, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Mara D. Afzali on behalf of PCT, Ltd. (Afzali, Mara) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley A. Hoppe on behalf of PCT, Ltd. (Hoppe, Bradley) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Fri 07/01 9:52 AM
Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Bradley A. Hopp and Mara D. Afzali. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Paine, Matthew) |
||
Thursday, June 30, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mara D. Afzali Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9393496 by PCT, Ltd..(McConnell, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
13 | 13
![]() Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Bradley A. Hoppe Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9393470 by PCT, Ltd..(McConnell, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 29, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint by Auctus Fund LLC.(Bennett, Charles) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2022 | ||
10 | 10 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re9 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Extension is allowed to June 22, 2022. There shall be no further continuances. (Gaudet, Jennifer) | |
order
Order
Thu 05/19 10:28 AM
Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re9 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Extension is allowed to June 22, 2022. There shall be no further continuances. (Gaudet, Jennifer) |
||
Wednesday, May 18, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() STIPULATION re1 Complaint Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Auctus Fund LLC. (Bennett, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() STIPULATION re1 Complaint Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Auctus Fund LLC. (Bennett, Charles) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 03/21 1:18 PM
Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Auctus Fund LLC answer/response due 4/22/2022. (Paine, Matthew) |
||
Thursday, March 17, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to April 22, 2022 to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Auctus Fund LLC.(Bennett, Charles) |
|
Monday, January 31, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PCT, Ltd.. (McConnell, Joseph) |
|
Friday, January 21, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PCT, Ltd.. Auctus Fund LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (McConnell, Joseph) |
|
Friday, January 14, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to Auctus Fund LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
2 | 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) | |
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Auctus Fund LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9138780 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by PCT LTD.(McConnell, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 01/14 3:10 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) |