Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 0:21-cr-60346
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jan 15, 2022 2:32 AM EST
Defendant
Carolina F. Herrera Soriano (2)
Represented By
Jan Christopher Smith, II
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Eric Martin Cohen
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Noticing FPD-FTL
contact info
Defendant
Dante Uriel Oliva (3)
Represented By
Russell Jay Williams
contact info
Defendant
Marcos Rene Soto (1)
Represented By
Silvia Beatriz Pinera-Vazquez
Pinera-Vazquez Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Deric Zacca
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Sep 19 2023
Order Denying Motion for Compassionate Release denying 177 MOTION to Reduce Sentence - (2018) First Step Act as to Marcos Rene Soto (1). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/18/2023. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
GPO Jan 31 2024
Order Denying Motion for Sentence Reduction denying 183 MOTION for reduction of sentence pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3582(c)(2) as to Marcos Rene Soto (1). Signed by Senior Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 1/31/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
GPO May 07 2024
ORDER denying 189 Renewed Motion for Compassionate Release as to Marcos Rene Soto (1). Signed by Senior Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 5/7/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
GPO Jun 13 2024
Order Denying 195 Renewed Motion for Reconsideration of Motion for Compassionate Release as to Marcos Rene Soto. Signed by Senior Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
GPO Jun 14 2024
Amended Order Denying Renewed 195 Motion for Reconsideration of Motion for Compassionate Release as to Marcos Rene Soto. Signed by Senior Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/14/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn)
GPO Apr 03 2025
ORDER denying 202 Motion as to Marcos Rene Soto (1). Signed by Senior Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/3/2025. See attached document for full details. (ar24)

Docket last updated: 01/15/2022 3:23 AM EST
Thursday, December 02, 2021
Arrest of Marcos Rene Soto (dd) [0:21-mj-06665-PMH]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Carolina F. Herrera Soriano (at) [0:21-mj-06664-PMH]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 03, 2021
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 2 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dd) [0:21-mj-06663-PMH]
Related: [-]
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 2 restricted/sealed until further notice. (tw) [0:21-mj-06664-PMH]
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs COMPLAINT as to Marcos Rene Soto (1). (dd) [0:21-mj-06665-PMH]
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs COMPLAINT as to Dante Uriel Oliva (1). (dd) [0:21-mj-06663-PMH]
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs COMPLAINT as to Carolina F. Herrera Soriano (1). (dd) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/13/2021) (tw). [0:21-mj-06664-PMH]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION TO SEAL by USA as to Marcos Rene Soto. (dd) [0:21-mj-06665-PMH]
Related: [-]
3 3 PETITION/ MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Dante Uriel Oliva. Responses due by 12/17/2021 (dd) [0:21-mj-06663-PMH]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION/Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Carolina F. Herrera Soriano. Responses due by 12/17/2021 (tw) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/13/2021) (tw). [0:21-mj-06664-PMH]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion TO SEAL as to Marcos Rene Soto (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 12/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (dd) [0:21-mj-06665-PMH]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Dante Uriel Oliva (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 12/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (dd) [0:21-mj-06663-PMH]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Carolina F. Herrera Soriano (1). Initial Appearance set for 12/6/2021 01:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 12/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (tw) [0:21-mj-06664-PMH]
Related: [-]
5 5 PAPERLESS NOTICE OF HEARING as to Dante Uriel Oliva Initial Appearance set for 12/6/2021 01:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (dd) [0:21-mj-06663-PMH]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
Arrest of Dante Uriel Oliva (at) [0:21-mj-06663-PMH]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Marcos Rene Soto Initial Appearance set for 12/6/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (dd) [0:21-mj-06665-PMH]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow: Initial Appearance as to Carolina F. Herrera Soriano held on 12/6/2021.. Arraignment set for 12/20/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 12/13/2021 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Attorney added: Noticing FPD-FTL for Carolina F. Herrera Soriano (Digital 13:36:22) (tw) [0:21-mj-06664-PMH]
Related: [-]
6 6 CORRECTED NOTICE OF HEARING as to Marcos Rene Soto Initial Appearance set for 12/6/2021 01:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (dd) [0:21-mj-06665-PMH]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Russell Jay Williams appearing for Dante Uriel Oliva. (tw) [0:21-mj-06663-PMH]
Related: [-]
6 6 Notice of Assignment of Assistant Federal Public Defender as to Carolina F. Herrera Soriano. Attorney Jan Christopher Smith, II added. Attorney Noticing FPD-FTL terminated.. Attorney Jan Christopher Smith, II added to party Carolina F. Herrera Soriano(pty:dft). (Smith, Jan) [0:21-mj-06664-PMH]
Related: [-]
7 7 Order to Unseal as to Marcos Rene Soto Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 12/6/2021. (dd) Modified on 12/6/2021 (dd). [0:21-mj-06665-PMH]
Related: [-]
7 7 Invocation of Right to Silence and Counsel by Carolina F. Herrera Soriano (Smith, Jan) [0:21-mj-06664-PMH]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow: Initial Appearance as to Marcos Rene Soto held on 12/6/2021.. Arraignment set for 12/20/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 12/13/2021 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Spanish Interpreter present. Attorney added: Silvia Beatriz Pinera-Vazquez for Marcos Rene Soto for Criminal CJA representation. Date attorney was appointed CJA: 12/06/21. (Digital 13:36:22) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 12/6/2021. (tw) [0:21-mj-06665-PMH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
7 7 Minute for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow: Initial Appearance as to Dante Uriel Oliva held on 12/7/2021. Arraignment set for 12/20/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 12/13/2021 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 12/20/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (Digital 13:36:22) (tw) [0:21-mj-06663-PMH]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
Terminate Hearing as to Marcos Rene Soto (Detention Hearing set by error) (at) [0:21-mj-06665-PMH]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Detention Hearing as to Dante Uriel Oliva NOT held on 12/13/2021. Bond set: Dante Uriel Oliva (1) $250,000 PSB & $50,000 10% WITH NEBBIA. Per Court the defendant to be released upon signing and posting the ordered bond amount. The Nebbia is to be satisfied by COB 12/15/2021. (Digital 10:06:57) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 12/13/2021). (at) [0:21-mj-06663-PMH]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Detention Hearing as to Carolina F. Herrera Soriano held on 12/13/2021. Witness Robert Delahanty testified. The court finds that the government has met burden of proof on risk of flight and danger to community and Orders defendant detained pending trial. Written order to follow. (Digital 10:06:57) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 12/13/2021). (at) [0:21-mj-06664-PMH]
Related: [-]
9 9 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Status Re Detention Hearing as to Marcos Rene Soto held on 12/13/2021., ( Status RE Bond Agreement RESET for 12/17/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate., Detention Hearing set for 12/17/2021 before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt.). Spanish Interpreter present. (Digital 10:06:57) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 12/13/2021). (at) [0:21-mj-06665-PMH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
9 9 $250,000.00 PSB Bond Entered as to Dante Uriel Oliva Approved by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (tw) (tw). [0:21-mj-06663-PMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (12/15/2021) Restricted Bond with 7th Page
9 9 DETENTION ORDER as to Carolina F. Herrera Soriano. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 12/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (js06) [0:21-mj-06664-PMH]
Related: [-]
10 10 $50,000.00 10% PSB Bond Entered as to Dante Uriel Oliva Receipt # 14997. Approved by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (tw) (tw). [0:21-mj-06663-PMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (12/15/2021) Restricted Bond with 7th Page
Thursday, December 16, 2021
11 11 8 pgs INDICTMENT as to Marcos Rene Soto (1) count(s) 1, 2-3, 4, Carolina F. Herrera Soriano (2) count(s) 1, 2-3, 4, Dante Uriel Oliva (3) count(s) 1, 4. FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS. (at) (at).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (12/17/2021) Restricted Unredacted Indictment